Pham v. University of Louisiana at Monroe et al

Plaintiff: Dung Quoc Pham
Defendant: University of Louisiana at Monroe, Benny Blaylock, Keith Jackson, Tibb Jacobs, Michael Cockerham, Khalid El Sayed, Eric A Pani and Sherrye Carradine
Case Number: 3:2016cv00467
Filed: April 6, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the Reasons set forth in the Court's Ruling 39 , IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Enforce F.R.A.P. Rule 10 [Doc. No. 35] is GRANTED. Further, Phams Motion to Amend the Notice of Appeal [Doc. No. 36], to the extent he seeks to add this Courts orders dated April 8, 2016 and June 6, 2016 to his Notice of Appeal, is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Pham shall have fourteen (14) days to either order a full transcript of the July 7 & 8, 2016, hearing or, in the alternative, file a statement of the limited issues that he intends to present on appeal and must serve on the Defendants a copy of the statement of issues in compliance with FED. R. APP. P. 10(b)(3)(A). Finally, Pham shall have fourteen (14) days to either ord er a full transcript of such parts of the proceedings that are necessary to this Courts April 8th and June 6th decisions or, in the alternative, file a statement of the limited issues that he intends to present on appeal and must serve on the Defendants a copy of the statement of issues in compliance with FED. R. APP. P. 10(b)(3)(A). Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/12/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
July 13, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Dung Quoc Pham, and 11 MOTION to Dismiss University of Louisiana at Monroe, Ethics Board, Breach of Contract and Defamation Claims and Prospective and Retroactive Injunctive Relief filed by University of Louisiana at Monroe, Sherrye Carradine, Khalid El Sayed, Benny Blaylock, Michael Cockerham, Eric A Pani, Tibb Jacobs, Keith Jackson. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 7/13/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
June 6, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by Dung Quoc Pham, and 11 MOTION to Dismiss University of Louisiana at Monroe, Ethics Board, Breach of Contract and Defamation Claims and Prospective and Retroactive Injunctive Relief filed by University of Louisiana at Monroe, Sherrye Carradine, Khalid El Sayed, Benny Blaylock, Michael Cockerham, Eric A Pani, Tibb Jacobs, Keith Jackson. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 6/6/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
April 8, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 2 Motion for TRO. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a telephone status conference is SET for April 18, 2016 at 1:30 p.m., to discuss the preliminary injunction hearing. The Court will provide counsel with the call in information. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 4/8/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pham v. University of Louisiana at Monroe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dung Quoc Pham
Represented By: Daniel Clay Wirtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Louisiana at Monroe
Represented By: Linda Law Clark
Represented By: Winston G DeCuir, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Blaylock
Represented By: Linda Law Clark
Represented By: Winston G DeCuir, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Jackson
Represented By: Linda Law Clark
Represented By: Winston G DeCuir, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tibb Jacobs
Represented By: Linda Law Clark
Represented By: Winston G DeCuir, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cockerham
Represented By: Linda Law Clark
Represented By: Winston G DeCuir, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khalid El Sayed
Represented By: Linda Law Clark
Represented By: Winston G DeCuir, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A Pani
Represented By: Linda Law Clark
Represented By: Winston G DeCuir, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherrye Carradine
Represented By: Linda Law Clark
Represented By: Winston G DeCuir, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?