Craig v. CenturyLink Inc et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Craig, Amalgamated Bank, Laborers Pension Trust Fund - Detroit & Vicinity, State of Oregon, K B C Asset Management N V and City of Detroit Police & Fire Retirement System
Defendant: Glen F Post, III, R Stewart Ewing, Jr and CenturyLink Inc
Petitioner: Tae Yi, Mark D Alger, Essex Lacy, Art Kleppen, Allen Feldman and Sona Andresian
Respondent: Inter-Marketing Group U S A Inc
Consolidated Plaintiff: Amarendra Thummeti and Don J Scott
Consolidated Defendant: David D Cole
Case Number: 3:2017cv01005
Filed: August 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Monroe Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2018 DISTRICT COURT TRANSFER Record Received electronically by District of Minnesota on 2/5/2018, assigned case number 0:18-cv-00296. (crt,Whidden, C)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER directing transfer to District of Minnesota, In Re: CenturyLink Sales Practices and Securities Litigation (formerly CenturyLink Residential Customer Billing Disputes Litigation), MDL # 2795. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C)
February 1, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Transfer Order in MDL No.2795, IN RE: CenturyLink Sales Practices and Securities Litigation (formerly CenturyLink Residential Customer Billing Disputes Litigation) advising case shall be transferred to the District of Minnesota upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C)
January 18, 2018 Filing 99 REPLY to Response to Motion re #95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. filed by State of Oregon. (aty,Sartor, Fred)
January 15, 2018 Filing 98 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Inter-Marketing Group U S A Inc. (aty,Federman, William)
January 15, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bernard Federman on behalf of Inter-Marketing Group U S A Inc (aty,Federman, William)
January 11, 2018 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of William B. Federman)(aty,Federman, William)
December 21, 2017 Filing 95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Declaration of F. Williams Sartor, Jr., #3 Exhibit A - Notice of pendency of IMG action, #4 Exhibit B - Proposed Corrected Notice, #5 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brandon Wade Creekbaum terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/21/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
December 20, 2017 Filing 93 MOTION to Withdraw Brandon W Creekbaum as Attorney by CenturyLink Inc, David D Cole, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F Post, III. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Hayes, Thomas)
November 24, 2017 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge Hicks filed by K B C Asset Management N V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MissPERS Reply Lead Pl Brief in Goldman Sachs case, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defs Brief re Appointment of Lead Pl in Kaplan case, #3 Exhibit 3 - Reply LP Brief in Kaplan case, #4 Exhibit 4 - KBC Brief in Oppn to Mot to Vacate CTO-1, #5 Exhibit 5 - Oregon Brief in Oppn to Motion to Vacate CTO-1)(aty,Levin, Gregg)
November 17, 2017 Filing 91 RESPONSE to Motion re #87 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge filed by CenturyLink Inc, David D Cole, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F Post, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lyle Roberts, #2 Exhibit A - List of Cases)(aty,Roberts, Lyle)
November 17, 2017 Filing 90 RESPONSE to Motion re #87 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge S. Maurice Hicks, Jr. filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of F. Williams Sartor, Jr., #2 Exhibit A - S.A.C. Capital LP Order)(aty,Sartor, Fred)
November 13, 2017 Filing 89 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE AND COMPLAINTS by State of Oregon, CenturyLink Inc, David D Cole, R Stewart Ewing Jr, Glen F Post III. (aty,Sartor, Fred) Modified to add filers on 11/13/2017. (ThomasSld, T)
November 3, 2017 Filing 88 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #87 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
November 3, 2017 Filing 87 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 80 Order on Motions to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by K B C Asset Management N V . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Roy, James) Modified to correct event type, remove docket entry relationship and edit docket text on 11/3/2017. (ThomasSld, T)
November 3, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE of Deficiency to Gregg S Levin on behalf of K B C Asset Management N V regarding #85 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 80 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Reason: For attorneys admitted pro hac vice, signature or endorsement of local counsel is required. Please refer to LR83.2.6 for more specific requirements. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
November 3, 2017 Filing 85 DEFICIENT APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 80 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by K B C Asset Management N V. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit Dube v Signet Jewelers Ltd)(aty,Levin, Gregg) Modified to reflect deficient status on 11/3/2017. (ThomasSld, T) Modified to indicate document corrected and resubmitted in its entirety as document #87 on 11/3/2017.(ThomasSld, T)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michael M Mathai for State of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/25/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
October 24, 2017 Filing 83 MOTION for Michael M. Mathai to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3494653) by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Timothy S DeJong for State of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/20/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
October 20, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE of Consolidation by Clerk. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying #75 Motion to Continue. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture court ruling. See document 80 to view PDF image. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/20/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) Modified to add document number on 10/20/2017 (ThomasSld, T).
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting granting #25 Motion to Consolidate Cases; #26 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting #28 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting #29 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Lead Case Number: 3:17-cv-1005. Member Case Number(s): 3:17-cv-1033, 3:17-cv-1065. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/19/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
October 19, 2017 Filing 78 MOTION for Timothy S. DeJong to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3491564) by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred)
October 16, 2017 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #75 Joint MOTION to Continue October 25, 2017 Motion Hearing filed by CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F Post, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lyle Roberts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(aty,Roberts, Lyle) Modified on 10/16/2017 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
October 11, 2017 Filing 76 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: Any joinder or opposition to the #75 Motion to Continue must be filed no later than 10/17/2017. No replies will be allowed. Compliance Deadline set for 10/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/11/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
October 10, 2017 Filing 75 Joint MOTION to Continue October 25, 2017 Motion Hearing with opposition by State of Oregon, K B C Asset Management N V. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of F. Williams Sartor, Jr., #2 Exhibit A - JPML Transfer Brief, #3 Exhibit B - JPML Transfer Order, #4 Exhibit C - JPML CTO-1, #5 Exhibit D - JPML Transfer Reply, #6 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred) Modified to add filer on 10/11/2017. (ThomasSld, T)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #71 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michael D Blatchley for State of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/10/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Avi Josefson for State of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/10/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Gerald H Silk for State of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/10/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
October 5, 2017 Filing 71 MOTION for Michael D. Blatchley to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3481549) by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred)
October 5, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION for Avi Josefson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3481533) by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred)
October 5, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION for Gerald H. Silk to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3481510) by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred)
October 5, 2017 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by State of Oregon. (aty,Sartor, Fred)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Keil M Mueller for State of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/5/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Keith S Dubanevich for State of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/5/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
October 4, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION for Keil M. Mueller to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3480047) by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred)
October 4, 2017 Filing 64 MOTION for Keith S. Dubanevich to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3480017) by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Gregg S Levin for K B C Asset Management N V. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/22/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of James M Hughes for K B C Asset Management N V. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/22/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Andrew P Arnold for K B C Asset Management N V. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/22/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of William H Narwold for K B C Asset Management N V. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/22/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 21, 2017 Filing 59 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 9/21/2017 granting 58 Motion to Continue. Motion Hearing on #25 is RESET for 10/25/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 3rd floor courtroom, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Court Reporter: LCR, Alexandria - 3rd Floor) (crt,Tice, Y)
September 21, 2017 Filing 58 Joint Oral MOTION to Continue Motion Hearing. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Tice, Y)
September 21, 2017 Filing 57 MOTION for Gregg S. Levin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3468987) by K B C Asset Management N V. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing Gregg Levin, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Roy, James)
September 21, 2017 Filing 56 MOTION for James M. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3468977) by K B C Asset Management N V. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing James Hughes, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Roy, James)
September 21, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION for Andrew P. Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3468968) by K B C Asset Management N V. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing Andrew Arnold, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Roy, James)
September 21, 2017 Filing 54 MOTION for William H. Narwold to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3468941) by K B C Asset Management N V. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing William H. Narwold, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Roy, James)
September 21, 2017 Filing 53 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Telephone Conference is set for 9/21/2017 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes.. Each party is to call our AT&T conference number at 877-336-1829. When you are prompted for an access code, enter 2670431. You will be placed on hold and will not hear anything except silence. However, the Clerk will join the call shortly thereafter. Only counsel of record may participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/21/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
September 18, 2017 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Case and in Opposition to the Competing Motion filed by K B C Asset Management N V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Roy, James)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Hearing. Motion day set for 10/4/2017 at 1:30 PM in Alexandria Court House before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/18/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 18, 2017 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Fred W Sartor, Jr on behalf of State of Oregon regarding #49 Notice of Deficiency. Action taken: Modified to reflect document withdrawn. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 13, 2017 Filing 50 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT Granting Oral Argument on Motion of KBC Asset Management NV for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel and Opposition to Competing Motions by K B C Asset Management N V re 44 Motion for Hearing,. (aty,Roy, James)
September 12, 2017 Filing 49 (WITHDRAWN) NOTICE of Deficiency to Fred W Sartor, Jr on behalf of State of Oregon regarding 47 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion. Reason: Replies to response to motion are limited to 7 pages for Magistrate Judge Perez-Montes. (crt,ThomasSld, T) Modified to indicate document withdrawn on 9/18/2017 (ThomasSld, T).
September 12, 2017 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by K B C Asset Management N V re 44 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (aty,Roy, James)
September 11, 2017 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #25 MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Case, #21 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-cv-01033, 17-cv-04695MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Choice of Counsel, #24 MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs MOTION for Approval of Counsel of Choice, #29 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel, #26 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-1033, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by State of Oregon. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture filing event. See document 47 to view PDF image. (crt,ThomasSld, T) Modified to add document number on 9/12/2017 (ThomasSld, T).
September 11, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION/REQUEST for Oral Argument re #25 MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Case by K B C Asset Management N V. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture filing event. See document 44 to view PDF image. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,ThomasSld, T) Modified to add document number on 9/12/2017 (ThomasSld, T).
September 11, 2017 Filing 47 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Appointment of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation and in Opposition to Competing Motions filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of F. Williams Sartor, Jr., #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Brian de Haan, #3 Exhibit B - Chart of Oregon's Recoverable Losses, #4 Exhibit C - Chart of KBC's Recoverable Losses, #5 Exhibit D - Teva LP Order)(aty,Sartor, Fred) Modified to more accurately reflect document filed and to indicate deficient status on 9/12/2017. (ThomasSld, T) Modified to remove deficient status and to edit docket text on 9/18/2017 (ThomasSld, T).
September 11, 2017 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #25 MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Case, #28 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel, #21 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-cv-01033, 17-cv-04695MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Choice of Counsel, #24 MOTION to Consolidate CaseMOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs MOTION for Approval of Counsel of Choice, #26 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-1033MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Amalgamated Bank. (aty,Lemmon, Andrew)
September 11, 2017 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #25 MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Case, #28 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel, #29 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by City of Detroit Police & Fire Retirement System, Laborers Pension Trust Fund - Detroit & Vicinity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Burge, Jason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/12/2017) (YocumSld, M). (Main Document 45 replaced on 9/12/2017) (YocumSld, M).
September 11, 2017 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #28 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel, #21 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-cv-01033, 17-cv-04695MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Choice of Counsel, #24 MOTION to Consolidate CaseMOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs MOTION for Approval of Counsel of Choice, #29 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel, #26 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-1033MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel and Memorandum in Further Support of the Motion of KBC Asset Management NV for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by K B C Asset Management N V. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James P. Roy, #2 Exhibit A - Amalgamated Bank LIFO Loss Chart)(aty,Roy, James) Modified to indicate certificate of service filed as document #48 on 9/12/2017 (ThomasSld, T).
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Withdraw #24 MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, MOTION for Approval of Counsel of Choice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/5/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 31, 2017 Filing 42 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Proposed Order filed by Mark D Alger, Allen Feldman, Art Kleppen, Essex Lacy, Tae Yi regarding #41 MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel. (aty,Houck, Tracy)
August 31, 2017 Motions Transferred regarding #41 MOTION to Withdraw. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 30, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION to Withdraw re #24 MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, MOTION for Approval of Counsel of Choice, styled as "Notice of Withdrawal" by Mark D Alger, Allen Feldman, Art Kleppen, Essex Lacy, Tae Yi. (aty,Houck, Tracy) Modified to correct event type and edit docket text on 8/31/2017. (ThomasSld, T) Modified to indicate proposed order filed as document #42 on 8/31/2017 (ThomasSld, T).
August 29, 2017 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CenturyLink Inc. (aty,Hayes, Thomas)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Withdraw #21 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-cv-01033, 17-cv-04695, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION for Approval of Choice of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/28/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 25, 2017 Filing 38 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Notice of Consent to Motion of Consolidation filed by City of Detroit Police & Fire Retirement System, Laborers Pension Trust Fund - Detroit & Vicinity regarding #26 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-1033MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel . (aty,Burge, Jason)
August 25, 2017 Filing 37 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Proposed Order (Motion to Withdraw Motion) filed by Sona Andresian regarding #35 MOTION to Withdraw . (aty,Pendley, Patrick)
August 24, 2017 Motions Transferred regarding #35 MOTION to Withdraw. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 24, 2017 Filing 36 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Certificate of Consent to Motion for Consolidation filed by K B C Asset Management N V regarding #25 MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Case . (aty,Roy, James) Modified to remove duplicate docket text on 8/25/2017 (ThomasSld, T).
August 24, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION to Withdraw re #21 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-cv-01033, 17-cv-04695 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Choice of Counsel , styled as NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Sona Andresian (aty,Pendley, Patrick) Modified to correct event type and edit docket text on 8/25/2017 (ThomasSld, T).
August 24, 2017 Filing 34 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Certificate of Consent filed by State of Oregon regarding #28 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel . (aty,Sartor, Fred)
August 24, 2017 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks. Judge Robert G James no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. (crt,Whidden, C) Modified on 8/24/2017 to modify docket text (Whidden, C).
August 23, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE by Amalgamated Bank of Consent to Motion for Consolidation re #29 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel (aty,Lemmon, Andrew)
August 23, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Deficiency to Andrew Allen Lemmon on behalf of Amalgamated Bank, Patrick W Pendley on behalf of Sona Andresian; Tracy W Houck on behalf of CenturyLink Investor Group; Jason W Burge on behalf of City of Detroit Police & Fire Retirement System, Laborers Pension Trust Fund - Detroit & Vicinity; James Parkerson Roy on behalf of K B C Asset Management N V; Fred W Sartor, Jr on behalf of State of Oregon regarding #21 DEFICIENT? MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-cv-01033, 17-cv-04695 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff; #24 DEFICIENT? MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, MOTION for Approval of Counsel of Choice; #25 DEFICIENT? MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff; #26 DEFICIENT? MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-1033, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel; #28 DEFICIENT? MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel; #29 DEFICIENT? MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel. Reason: You do not indicate whether opposing counsel consent to the granting of this ex parte motion (i.e. Motion to Consolidate). Please refer to LR7.4.1, 7.6, or 7.9 for specific instructions regarding statements of consent. (crt,Williams, L)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, I hereby disqualify myself from the handling of the above-captioned matter. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that this matter is referred to Chief Judge Dee Drell for reassignment to another judge in accordance with the Courts Standing Order 1.62. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 8/22/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 21, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Consolidate by Amalgamated Bank, . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Affidavit / Declaration of Andrew Lemmon, #3 Exhibit A - News Wire, #4 Exhibit B - Certification, #5 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #6 Exhibit D - Firm Resume, #7 Proposed order)(Attorney Andrew Allen Lemmon added to party Amalgamated Bank(pty:mov))(aty,Lemmon, Andrew) Modified on 8/23/2017 to add motion event, and to reflect submission as Deficient (Williams, L). Added MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief on 8/23/2017 (Williams, L). Modified to remove deficient status on 8/24/2017. See document #32 for consent statement. (ThomasSld, T)
August 21, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Appointment of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Declaration of F Williams Sartor Jr, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Proposed order)(Attorney Fred W Sartor, Jr added to party State of Oregon (pty:mov))(aty,Sartor, Fred) Modified on 8/23/2017 to add motion events for multiple relief requested and to reflect submission as Deficient (Williams, L). Added MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief on 8/23/2017 (Williams, L). Modified to remove deficient status on 8/24/2017. See document #34 for consent statement. (ThomasSld, T)
August 21, 2017 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by K B C Asset Management N V identifying Corporate Parent K B C Group N V. (aty,Roy, James) Modified to edit docket text on 8/23/2017 (ThomasSld, T).
August 21, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-1033, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit, Laborers Pension Trust Fund - Detroit and Vicinity. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Affidavit of Jason W. Burge, #4 Exhibit A - Certifications, #5 Exhibit B - Loss Analysis, #6 Exhibit C - Joint Declaration, #7 Exhibit D - Notice, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E - Labaton Sucharow Firm Resume, #9 Exhibit F - Kirby McInerney Firm Resume, #10 Exhibit G - Fishman Haygood Firm Resume)(Attorney Jason W Burge added to party Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit(pty:mov), Attorney Jason W Burge added to party Laborers Pension Trust Fund - Detroit and Vicinity(pty:mov))(aty,Burge, Jason) Modified on 8/23/2017 to edit text, modify and add motion events, and to reflect submission as Deficient - consent language removed as not included within actual pleading (Williams, L). Added MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel on 8/23/2017 (Williams, L). Modified to remove deficient status on 8/25/2017. See document #38 for consent statement. (ThomasSld, T)
August 21, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by K B C Asset Management N V. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Declaration of James P. Roy, #3 Exhibit A - KBC's sworn Certification, #4 Exhibit B - Chart of KBC's Estimated Losses, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of pendency of class action, #6 Exhibit D - Motley Rice's firm resume, #7 Exhibit E - KBC's Declarations of Assignment, #8 Proposed order)(Attorney James Parkerson Roy added to party KBC Asset Management NV(pty:pla))(aty,Roy, James) Modified on 8/22/2017 to edit text, modify and add motion events (Williams, L). Added MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff on 8/22/2017 (Williams, L). Modified on 8/23/2017 to reflect submission as Deficient (Williams, L). Modified to remove deficient status on 8/25/2017. See document #36 for consent statement. (ThomasSld, T)
August 21, 2017 Filing 24 (WITHDRAWN) DEFICIENT? MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Mark D Alger, Allen Feldman, Art Kleppen, Essex Lacy, Tae Yi. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Affidavit Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Proposed order)(aty,Houck, Tracy) Modified on 8/22/2017 to edit text, modify and add motion events - remove consent language not included within actual pleading (Williams, L). Added MOTION for Approval of Counsel of Choice on 8/22/2017 (Williams, L). Modified on 8/23/2017 to reflect submission as Deficient(Williams, L). Modified to correct filers on 8/23/2017 (ThomasSld, T). Modified to indicate document withdrawn on 9/6/2017. (ThomasSld, T)
August 21, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy W Houck on behalf of Mark D Alger, Allen Feldman, Art Kleppen, Essex Lacy, Tae Yi (Attorney Tracy W Houck added to party CenturyLink Investor Group(pty:mov)) (aty,Houck, Tracy) Modified to correct filers on 8/23/2017 (ThomasSld, T).
August 21, 2017 Filing 22 (ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy W Houck on behalf of Mark D Alger, Allen Feldman, Art Kleppen, Essex Lacy, Tae Yi (Attorney Tracy W Houck added to party Benjamin Craig(pty:pla)) (aty,Houck, Tracy) Modified to indicate document electronically filed in error and to remove counsel Tracy W Houck as attorney for plaintiff Benjamin Craig on 8/23/2017 (ThomasSld, T). Modified to correct filers on 8/23/2017 (ThomasSld, T).
August 21, 2017 Filing 21 (WITHDRAWN) DEFICIENT MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-cv-01033, 17-cv-04695, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by Sona Andresian. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Gregory M. Edleston, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(Attorney Patrick W Pendley added to party Sona Andresian(pty:pla))(aty,Pendley, Patrick) Modified on 8/22/2017 to edit text and modify and add motion event(s), and to remove consent language not included within actual pleading (Williams, L). Added MOTION for Approval of Choice of Counsel on 8/22/2017 (Williams, L). Modified to indicate document withdrawn on 8/28/2017 (ThomasSld, T).
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Lyle Roberts for CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr and Glen F Post, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/21/2017. (crt,FinnSld, P)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Brandon Wade Creekbaum for CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr and Glen F Post, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/17/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of George Edward Anhang for CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr and Glen F Post, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/16/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 15, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice sent to Thomas M Hayes, III on behalf of CenturyLink Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/29/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 15, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Brandon W Creekbaum to Enroll as Counsel by CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F Post, III. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Hayes, Thomas)
August 14, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION for George Anhang to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3438421) by CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F Post, III. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Hayes, Thomas)
August 14, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Lyle Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3438409) by CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F Post, III. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Hayes, Thomas)
August 14, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Hayes, III on behalf of CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F Post, III (Attorney Thomas M Hayes, III added to party CenturyLink Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M Hayes, III added to party R Stewart Ewing, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M Hayes, III added to party Glen F Post, III(pty:dft)) (aty,Hayes, Thomas)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRANSFER ORDER: Considering the transfer to this Court of the above-captioned action on August 9, 2017, formerly Case No. 1:17-cv-4740, United States District Court, Southern District of New York, IT IS ORDERED that within twenty (20) days any attorney appearing as counsel of record in this action who is not presently admitted to practice before the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana exercise one of the following options: (1) File an Application to Practice in this Court; (2) File a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice pursuant to Local Rule 83.2.6; or (3) Secure substitute counsel admitted to practice in this court for the party presently being represented. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/11/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 11, 2017 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/11/2017. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
August 10, 2017 Filing 10 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 9, 2017 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert G James and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 9, 2017 Filing 9 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:17-cv-04740. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) TO THE MONROE DIVISION OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF LOUISIANA: This Action could have been brought in the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, Monroe Division, and all of the parties consent to this Action proceeding in such District; and this action is transferred to the Monroe Division of the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk of Court is requested to transfer the above-captioned Action and close it on the books of this Court. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/8/2017) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
August 8, 2017 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the Monroe Division of the United States District Court - District of Western District of Louisiana (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
July 24, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Adam M. Apton, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (laq) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
June 23, 2017 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Glen F. Post, III. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
June 23, 2017 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to R. Stewart Ewing, Jr.. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
June 23, 2017 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CenturyLink, Inc.. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
June 23, 2017 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul G. Gardephe as possibly related to 17-cv-4695. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
June 23, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Adam M. Apton. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 12:22;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:78;. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
June 23, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Adam M. Apton. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Benjamin Craig. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
June 23, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Adam M. Apton, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
June 23, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Adam M. Apton to RE-FILE Civil Cover Sheet attached to Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
June 23, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
June 23, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Glen F. Post, III, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Benjamin Craig. (Apton, Adam) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to R. Stewart Ewing, Jr., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Benjamin Craig. (Apton, Adam) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CenturyLink, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Benjamin Craig. (Apton, Adam) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CenturyLink, Inc., R. Stewart Ewing, Jr., Glen F. Post, III. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13817431)Document filed by Benjamin Craig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Apton, Adam)[Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig v. CenturyLink Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Craig
Represented By: Adam M Apton
Represented By: Nicholas Ian Porritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amalgamated Bank
Represented By: Andrew Allen Lemmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Pension Trust Fund - Detroit & Vicinity
Represented By: Jason W Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Avi Josefson
Represented By: Michael M Mathai
Represented By: Keith S Dubanevich
Represented By: Keil M Mueller
Represented By: Fred W Sartor, Jr
Represented By: Michael D Blatchley
Represented By: Timothy Shawn DeJong
Represented By: Gerald H Silk
Represented By: George M Snellings, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K B C Asset Management N V
Represented By: James M Hughes
Represented By: Gregg S Levin
Represented By: William H Narwold
Represented By: John Parkerson Roy
Represented By: Andrew P Arnold
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Detroit Police & Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Jason W Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen F Post, III
Represented By: Lyle Roberts
Represented By: George Edward Anhang
Represented By: Brandon Wade Creekbaum
Represented By: Thomas M Hayes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Stewart Ewing, Jr
Represented By: Lyle Roberts
Represented By: George Edward Anhang
Represented By: Brandon Wade Creekbaum
Represented By: Thomas M Hayes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink Inc
Represented By: Lyle Roberts
Represented By: George Edward Anhang
Represented By: Brandon Wade Creekbaum
Represented By: Thomas M Hayes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tae Yi
Represented By: Tracy W Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark D Alger
Represented By: Tracy W Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Essex Lacy
Represented By: Tracy W Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Art Kleppen
Represented By: Tracy W Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allen Feldman
Represented By: Tracy W Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sona Andresian
Represented By: Patrick W Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Amarendra Thummeti
Represented By: Patrick V Dahlstrom
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Don J Scott
Represented By: Matthew E Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Inter-Marketing Group U S A Inc
Represented By: William Bernard Federman
Represented By: Ravi Kishan Sangisetty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: David D Cole
Represented By: Lyle Roberts
Represented By: George Edward Anhang
Represented By: Brandon Wade Creekbaum
Represented By: Thomas M Hayes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?