Webb v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Alphonso Dewayne Webb
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv01058
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Alphonso Dewayne Webb. U S Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 9/13/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Osterhout, Karl)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Karl E Osterhout for Alphonso Dewayne Webb. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/17/2018. (crt,Leday, A)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Leday, A)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/17/2018. (crt,Leday, A)
August 16, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Karl Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3729406) by Alphonso Dewayne Webb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing re Karl Osterhout, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Lane, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alphonso Dewayne Webb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Lane, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Alphonso Dewayne Webb. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Matthew David Lane, Jr added to party Alphonso Dewayne Webb(pty:pla))(aty,Lane, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonso Dewayne Webb
Represented By: Matthew David Lane, Jr
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?