Supreme Home Health Services Inc et al v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Supreme Home Health Service, Emily Winston and Supreme Home Health Services Inc
Defendant: ALEX M AZAR II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, Palmetto G B A L L C, Seema Verma and Alex M Azar, II
Case Number: 3:2018cv01370
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:2345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY Vacating the briefing schedule set in #15 Minutes of Status Conference. Once service is perfected on the United States Attorney General, the parties shall confer and file a proposed briefing schedule with the Court. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/11/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Terry A Doughty: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/26/2018. Defendants' opposition to 1 EMERGENCY MOTION and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief due by 12/10/2018. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 12/17/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 20, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: Telephone Status Conference is set for 11/26/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Terry A Doughty. Counsel for the Government shall provide call-in information. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/20/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY: Vacating previous briefing schedule and instructing counsel to contact the court to schedule a second telephone status conference. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/16/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Supreme Home Health Services Inc, Emily Winston identifying other affiliates, Emily Winston and Carolyn Benjamin for Supreme Home Health Services Inc. (aty,Jones, Frederick) Modified on 11/16/2018 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #4 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Frederick Douglass Jones on behalf of Supreme Home Health Services Inc. Show Cause Response due by 11/28/2018. (crt,Mitchell, P)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Seal Exhibit D to 1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/13/2018. (crt,Crick, S)
November 13, 2018 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Frederick Douglass Jones on behalf of Supreme Home Health Services Inc, Emily Winston regarding #8 MOTION to Seal Exhibit D to 1 Complaint with consent. Action taken: Terminated #8 Motion to Seal. #9 Motion to Seal resubmitted in its entirety. (crt,Crick, S)
November 12, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Seal Exhibit D to 1 Complaint with consent by Supreme Home Health Services Inc, Emily Winston. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (aty,Jones, Frederick) Modified on 11/13/2018 to reflect proposed order included within pdf of main document and to create docket entry relationship. (Crick, S).
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 FILED IN ERROR. Counsel resubmitted motion in its entirety. MOTION to Seal Exhibit D to Complaint with consent by Supreme Home Health Services Inc, Emily Winston. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (aty,Jones, Frederick) Modified on 11/9/2018 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). Modified on 11/13/2018 to indicate #9 Motion to Seal resubmitted in its entirety. (Crick, S).
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Terry A Doughty: Telephone STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/30/2018 re: 1 EMERGENCY MOTION and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief. Plaintiff was instructed to serve all papers on Defendants. Defendants' response due by by 11/12/2018. Plaintiff's reply brief due by 11/19/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY setting a Telephone Status Conference for 10/30/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Terry A Doughty re 1 EMERGENCY MOTION and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief, filed by Emily Winston, Supreme Home Health Services Inc. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 10/26/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ENTRY: re 1 EMERGENCY MOTION and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief filed by Emily Winston, Supreme Home Health Services Inc. Plaintiffs' counsel shall confer with Defendants' counsel and provide their mutually available dates and times for a status conference to the Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 10/23/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: 1 Complaint sent to Frederick Douglass Jones on behalf of Supreme Home Health Services Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/5/2018. (crt,Putch, A)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Palmetto G B A L L C (crt,Putch, A)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Alex M Azar, II, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, Seema Verma, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (crt,Putch, A)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 EMERGENCY MOTION and Application for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Supreme Home Health Services Inc, Emily Winston. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading electronically filed as Attachment #2 to 1 Complaint. Counsel is reminded that multiple pleadings should not be combined into one document, but should be filed separately. (crt,Putch, A)
October 19, 2018 Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes added. (crt,Putch, A)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M Azar, II, Seema Verma, Palmetto G B A L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3785113) filed by Supreme Home Health Service, Emily Winston. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Emergency Motion and Application for TRO and Injunctive Relief, #3 Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Sealed Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Frederick Douglass Jones added to party Supreme Home Health Services Inc (pty:pla))(aty,Jones, Frederick) Modified on 10/22/2018 to replace pdf of Attachment 15 & 16 in proper format and to more accurately identify the pleading submitted (Putch, A). Modified on 11/9/2018 to modify document security setting on Attachment 7 (Proposed Sealed Exhibit D). See #8 Motion to Seal. (Crick, S). Modified on 11/13/2018 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Supreme Home Health Services Inc et al v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supreme Home Health Service
Represented By: Frederick Douglass Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Winston
Represented By: Frederick Douglass Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supreme Home Health Services Inc
Represented By: Frederick Douglass Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmetto G B A L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?