Bradford v. Morehouse Parish et al
Plaintiff: Charles H Bradford
Defendant: David Gray, Gary Jones, LA Board of Elementary & Secondary Education, Karen Diel, Richard Hixon, Chasity Kennedy, Leland Rawls, John White, Colby Daniels, Louis Melton, School Board Morehouse Parish, Rose Thompson, Chip, Stephen J Katz and Rick
Case Number: 3:2018cv01536
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, #10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Karen Diel, David Gray, Richard Hixon, Stephen J Katz, Chasity Kennedy, Louis Melton, School Board Morehouse Parish, Leland Rawls, Rose Thompson. (aty,Katz, Stephen) Modified on 1/11/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles H Bradford. Stephen J Katz served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 7, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Charles H Bradford as to LA Board of Elementary & Secondary Education, School Board Morehouse Parish, John White. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; #10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim; #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, filed by Charles H Bradford. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Certificate of Service)(crt,Miletello, A)
December 27, 2018 Filing 14 RE-NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint For Failure to State a Claim (Lack Of Standing) by Karen Diel, David Gray, Richard Hixon, Stephen J Katz, Chasity Kennedy, Louis Melton, School Board Morehouse Parish, Leland Rawls, Rose Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(Attorney Stephen J Katz added to party Stephen J Katz(pty:dft))(aty,Katz, Stephen) Modified on 12/19/2018 to edit filers and text (FinnSld, P).
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by LA Board of Elementary & Secondary Education, Gary Jones, John White. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(Attorney Patricia H Wilton added to party LA Board of Elementary & Secondary Education, Gary Jones, John White(pty:dft))(aty,Wilton, Patricia) Modified on 12/17/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stephen J Katz (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Colby Daniels, Karen Diel, LA Board of Elementary & Secondary Education, David Gray, Richard Hixon, Gary Jones, Chasity Kennedy, Louis Melton, School Board Morehouse Parish, Leland Rawls, Rose Thompson, Stephen J Katz filed by Charles H Bradford.(crt,FinnSld, P)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Responses due by 12/27/2018 (crt,Bunting, M)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Karen Diel, David Gray, Richard Hixon, Chasity Kennedy, Louis Melton, School Board Morehouse Parish, Leland Rawls, Rose Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(Attorney Stephen J Katz added to party Karen Diel(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen J Katz added to party David Gray(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen J Katz added to party Richard Hixon(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen J Katz added to party Chasity Kennedy(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen J Katz added to party Louis Melton(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen J Katz added to party School Board Morehouse Parish(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen J Katz added to party Leland Rawls(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen J Katz added to party Rose Thompson(pty:dft))(aty,Katz, Stephen)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles H Bradford. Colby Daniels, Karen Diel, David Gray, Richard Hixon, Chasity Kennedy, Louis Melton, School Board Morehouse Parish, Leland Rawls, and Rose Thompson, all served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/26/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Colby Daniels, Karen Diel, LA Board of Elementary & Secondary Education, David Gray, Richard Hixon, Gary Jones, Chasity Kennedy, Louis Melton, School Board Morehouse Parish, Leland Rawls, Rose Thompson, John White (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 26, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 26, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Charles H Bradford. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Colby Daniels, Karen Diel, LA Board of Elementary & Secondary Education, David Gray, Richard Hixon, Gary Jones, Chasity Kennedy, Louis Melton, School Board Morehouse Parish, Leland Rawls, Rose Thompson, John White (Receipt number 34635003314, filing fee $400) filed by Charles H Bradford. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford v. Morehouse Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gray
Represented By: Stephen J Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Jones
Represented By: Robert Christopher Fruge
Represented By: Patricia H Wilton
Represented By: Joan E Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Board of Elementary & Secondary Education
Represented By: Robert Christopher Fruge
Represented By: Patricia H Wilton
Represented By: Joan E Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Diel
Represented By: Stephen J Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hixon
Represented By: Stephen J Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chasity Kennedy
Represented By: Stephen J Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland Rawls
Represented By: Stephen J Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John White
Represented By: Robert Christopher Fruge
Represented By: Patricia H Wilton
Represented By: Joan E Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colby Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Melton
Represented By: Stephen J Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School Board Morehouse Parish
Represented By: Stephen J Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Thompson
Represented By: Stephen J Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chip
Represented By: Stephen J Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J Katz
Represented By: Stephen J Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick
Represented By: Stephen J Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles H Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?