Guillory Jr v. Starr Indemnity & Liability Co et al
Plaintiff: Duffy Guillory
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Transportation and Development, Adam Reed, Gulf Relay, LLC, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co, LA Dept of Transportation & Development and Gulf Relay L L C
Case Number: 3:2018cv01634
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Duffy Guillory. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(aty,Hemmer, Matthew)
February 11, 2019 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Duffy Guillory as to LA Dept of Transportation & Development served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (aty,Hemmer, Matthew)
February 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #22 MOTION to Strike #12 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,FinnSld, P)
February 11, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Jennifer Ann O'Connell on behalf of Gulf Relay L L C, Adam Reed, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co regarding #21 MOTION to Strike #12 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees . Action taken: Marked "Filed in Error" and refiled as Document #22 . (crt,FinnSld, P)
February 11, 2019 Filing 24 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike filed by Gulf Relay L L C, Adam Reed, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co regarding #22 MOTION to Strike #12 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees . (aty,O'Connell, Jennifer)
February 8, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Gulf Relay L L C, Adam Reed, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,O'Connell, Jennifer)
February 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Strike #12 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees by Gulf Relay L L C, Adam Reed, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit)(aty,O'Connell, Jennifer) Modified on 2/11/2019 to indicate SEE #24 Corrective Document for Memorandum/Brief wrong pdf uploaded with filing (FinnSld, P).
February 8, 2019 Filing 21 FILED IN ERROR MOTION to Strike #12 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees by Gulf Relay L L C, Adam Reed, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memo in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Memo in Opposition to Pl's Motion to Remand)(aty,O'Connell, Jennifer) Modified on 2/8/2019 to indicate filed in error, refiled in its entirety as Document #22 (FinnSld, P).
February 6, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Duffy Guillory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service request)(aty,Hemmer, Matthew)
January 31, 2019 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED #1 Notice of Removal by Gulf Relay L L C, Adam Reed, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. (crt,Leday, A)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Amend/Correct Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 1/31/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
January 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend Notice of Removal with consent by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co, Gulf Relay L L C, Adam Reed. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Affidavit)(aty,O'Connell, Jennifer) Modified on 1/30/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gulf Relay L L C. (aty,O'Connell, Jennifer)
January 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #14 Answer to Complaint, sent to Jennifer Ann O'Connell on behalf of Gulf Relay L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/5/2019. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 21, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gulf Relay L L C, Adam Reed.(aty,O'Connell, Jennifer)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #12 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Duffy Guillory. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Table of Authorities, #3 Table of Contents, #4 Exhibit 1 Photo of potholes, #5 Exhibit 2 Photo of repairs, #6 Exhibit 3 Statement, #7 Exhibit 4 City Court Records, #8 Exhibit 5 Stipulation offer, #9 Exhibit 6 Stipulation refusal)(aty,Hemmer, Matthew). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 1/18/2019 (FinnSld, P). Modified on 1/18/2019 to add Motion (FinnSld, P).
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by LA Dept of Transportation & Development. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Racer, Charles)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 2/27/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/3/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 MANUAL ATTACHMENT received from Jennifer Ann O'Connell on behalf of Gulf Relay L L C, Adam Reed and Starr Indemnity & Liability Co regarding #1 Notice of Removal. The original manual attachments will be maintained in the division of the presiding judge, until expiration of appeal delays. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/21/2018. (crt,Leday, A)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 20, 2018 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #3 EXHIBIT.(crt,Thigpen, M)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal,,, Exhibit 1-1 Corrected by Gulf Relay L L C, Adam Reed, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. (aty,O'Connell, Jennifer)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co identifying Corporate Parent Starr Insurance Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Starr Global Financial Inc for Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. (aty,O'Connell, Jennifer)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Compliance with Removal Procedure by Gulf Relay L L C, Adam Reed, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Index, #2 Exhibit 2 Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 3 Process Service, #4 Exhibit 4 Docket Sheet)(aty,O'Connell, Jennifer)
December 19, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Gulf Relay, LLC, Adam Reed, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. (aty,O'Connell, Jennifer)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 6th JDC Madison Parish, Case Number 18-225 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3834802) filed by Adam Reed, Gulf Relay, LLC, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. (Attachments: #1 FILED IN ERROR-Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Notice of manual attachment, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Affidavit)(Attorney Jennifer Ann O'Connell added to party Gulf Relay, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Ann O'Connell added to party Adam Reed(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Ann O'Connell added to party Starr Indemnity & Liability Co(pty:dft))(aty,O'Connell, Jennifer) Modified on 12/20/2018 to indicate Attachment #1 as filed in error; counsel requested to refile (Putch, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guillory Jr v. Starr Indemnity & Liability Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Transportation and Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Reed
Represented By: Jennifer Ann O'Connell
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Relay, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Ann O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Co
Represented By: Jennifer Ann O'Connell
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Dept of Transportation & Development
Represented By: Charles Bryan Racer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Relay L L C
Represented By: Jennifer Ann O'Connell
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duffy Guillory
Represented By: Matthew Donald Hemmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?