Isaac v. Bowlin et al

Plaintiff: Tammie Isaac
Defendant: Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co, John Doe, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA and Barney Bowlin
Intervenor Plaintiff: Continental Indemnity Co
Case Number: 3:2019cv00466
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 REMAND RECORD RECEIVED by 6th JDC-Madison Parish on 5/24/2019, assigned case number 19-00025-A. (crt,JonesSld, P)
May 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 6th Judicial District Court for Madison Parish. (crt,JonesSld, P)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 JUDGMENT OF REMAND to the 6th JDC, Parish of Madison, State of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/21/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM ORDER that the #8 MOTION to Remand is GRANTED and the MOTION for Oral Argument DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/21/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group Inc for Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co. (aty,Garbarino, Joseph)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes for trial. Judge Terry A Doughty no longer assigned to case as presiding judge. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 5/17/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Oral Argument filed by National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA. (aty,Clement, Tara)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #12 Rule 26(f) Report, sent to Joseph H Garbarino, Julie Eustis Vaicius on behalf of Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/30/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 26(f) Report by Tammie Isaac, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA, Barney Bowlin, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co, Continental Indemnity Co. (aty,Armistad, Alvin) Modified on 5/16/2019 to add filers (JonesSld, P).
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Clement, Tara) Modified on 5/14/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Continental Indemnity Co identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc for Continental Indemnity Co. (aty,Sczesny, Danielle)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #8 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Oral Argument. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Putch, A)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Oral Argument by Tammie Isaac. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit B - Removal, #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Tammie Isaac, #5 Exhibit D - Driver's License of Tammie Isaac)(aty,Armistad, Alvin). Modified on 4/29/2019 to capture all reliefs requested in pleading; Added MOTION for Hearing (Putch, A).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 5/8/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 4/18/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA.(aty,Worsley, William)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/15/2019. (crt,Miletello, A)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA identifying the following corporate parent and other affiliates A I G Property Casualty Inc., A I U H L L C, A I G Property Casualty U S Inc., American International Group Inc, Audubon Indemnity Co, Audubon Insurance Co, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Louisiana, Landmark Insurance Co. (aty,Worsley, William) Modified on 4/15/2019 to edit corporate parents and other affiliates (JonesSld, P).
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Tara Elizabeth Clement, William Prescott Worsley on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/29/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 12, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 12, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Barney Bowlin, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co.(Attorney Joseph H Garbarino, Attorney Julie Eustis Vaicius added to party Barney Bowlin, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co, (crt,Thigpen, M) ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).
April 12, 2019 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Continental Indemnity Co.(Attorney Lyon H Garrison added to party Continental Indemnity Co(pty:intvp), Attorney Travis L Garrison added to party Continental Indemnity Co(pty:intvp), Attorney Danielle Mikel Sczesny added to party Continental Indemnity Co(pty:intvp))(crt,Thigpen, M)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 6th JDC Parish of Madison, Case Number 19-25 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3924154) filed by National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney William Prescott Worsley added to party National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA(pty:dft))(aty,Worsley, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaac v. Bowlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Continental Indemnity Co
Represented By: Travis L Garrison
Represented By: Lyon H Garrison
Represented By: Danielle Mikel Sczesny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co
Represented By: Julie Eustis Vaicius
Represented By: Joseph H Garbarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA
Represented By: William Prescott Worsley
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barney Bowlin
Represented By: Julie Eustis Vaicius
Represented By: Joseph H Garbarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Isaac
Represented By: Alvin Armistad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?