Davis v. 3rd Judicial District Court

Plaintiff: Coobie Deon Davis
Defendant: 3rd Judicial District Court, Kia Baldwin Richardson, John Belton and Lewis Jones
Case Number: 3:2019cv00518
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Monroe Office
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
2 Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 JUDGMENT adopting #12 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge dismissing Plaintiff's claims as duplicative and malicious without prejudice to Plaintiff's right to prosecute the pending, duplicative proceeding. The claims are otherwise Dismissed With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 6/4/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTION to #12 Report and Recommendations by Coobie Deon Davis. Response to Objection to R&R due by 6/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Williams, L)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3rd Judicial District Court, John Belton, Lewis Jones, Kia Baldwin Richardson filed by Coobie Deon Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Complaint filed by Coobie Deon Davis Recommending that Plaintiff's claims be Dismissed as duplicative and malicious Without Prejudice to Plaintiff's right to prosecute the pending, duplicative proceeding. The claims should otherwise be Dismissed With Prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 6/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/28/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk and by order of Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge Terry A Doughty. Judge Elizabeth E Foote no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.(crt,Whidden, C)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 5/24/2019. (crt,Keifer, K)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Putch, A)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $5.32. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/17/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER re #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled accounts officer page filed by Coobie Deon Davis regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Coobie Deon Davis. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Accounts officer page not signed. Clerk resent accounts officer page with a note stating it must be completed.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) Modified to remove deficiency notation on 5/16/2019 (Haik, K).
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against 3rd Judicial District Court filed by Coobie Deon Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 5/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form, #2 IFP Form)(crt,Leday, A)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #1 Complaint referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Putch, A)
April 23, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Putch, A)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against 3rd Judicial District Court filed by Coobie Deon Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) Petition not on proper form (Putch, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. 3rd Judicial District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coobie Deon Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3rd Judicial District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Baldwin Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Belton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?