Luv N Care Ltd v. M A M U S A Corp et al
Plaintiff: Luv N Care Ltd
Defendant: MAM USA Corporation, MAM Babyartikel, GMBH, M A M Babyartikel GmbH and M A M U S A Corp
Case Number: 3:2019cv00690
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luv N Care Ltd. M A M Babyartikel GmbH waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luv N Care Ltd. M A M U S A Corp waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (crt,Crick, S)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to M A M Babyartikel GmbH, M A M U S A Corp (crt,Crick, S)
May 30, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Crick, S)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Luv N Care Ltd. (aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M A M Babyartikel GmbH, M A M U S A Corp with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3960816) filed by Luv N Care Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr added to party Luv N Care Ltd(pty:pla))(aty,Chiaviello, Robert) Modified on 6/4/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luv N Care Ltd v. M A M U S A Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAM USA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAM Babyartikel, GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M A M Babyartikel GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M A M U S A Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luv N Care Ltd
Represented By: Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr
Represented By: Joseph D Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?