Alexander v. Anheuser-Busch et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Alexander
Defendant: Joao Mauricio Giffoni de Castro Neves, Carlos Brito, Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc, Anheuser-Busch and Anheuser-Busch L L C
Case Number: 3:2019cv00738
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anheuser-Busch L L C identifying Corporate Parent, Anheuser-Busch Companies L L C, for Anheuser-Busch L L C. (aty,Salafia, Jessica) Modified on 8/6/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc, Anheuser-Busch L L C, Carlos Brito, Joao Mauricio Giffoni de Castro Neves filed by Bruce Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(crt,Williams, L)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Responses due by 8/15/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc, Carlos Brito, Joao Mauricio Giffoni de Castro Neves . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Salafia, Jessica)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc, Carlos Brito and Joao Mauricio Giffoni de Castro Neves. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit)(aty,Salafia, Jessica) Modified on 7/24/2019 to correct filers (Dauterive, C). Modified on 7/25/2019 to add MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and to reflect corrected Memorandum in Support w/ Table of Contents and Authorities filed as document #10 (Dauterive, C).
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc. (aty,Salafia, Jessica) Modified on 7/24/2019 to correct filer and add Corporate Parent Anheuser-Busch Inbev USA L L C (Dauterive, C).
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #5 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Jessica Lauren Salafia on behalf of Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc and Anheuser-Busch L L C. Show Cause Response due by 8/6/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc, Anheuser-Busch L L C, Carlos Brito and Joao Mauricio Giffoni de Castro Neves answer due 7/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/9/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Jessica Lauren Salafia on behalf of Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc and Anheuser-Busch L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/22/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with opposition by Anheuser-Busch L L C, Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc, Carlos Brito and Joao Mauricio Giffoni de Castro Neves. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Jessica Lauren Salafia added to party Anheuser-Busch(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Lauren Salafia added to party Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Lauren Salafia added to party Carlos Brito(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Lauren Salafia added to party Joao Mauricio Giffoni de Castro Neves(pty:dft))(aty,Salafia, Jessica) Modified on 7/8/2019 to add correct party (Dauterive, C).
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Bruce Alexander as to Anheuser-Busch, Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc. Certified mail return receipts indicate service was sent to corporations in Missouri. Service of summons on a corporation should be accomplished by delivering papers to the company's agent for service of process for the state in which the complaint/offense occurred.(crt,Reeves, T)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anheuser-Busch, Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc, Carlos Brito, Joao Mauricio Giffoni de Castro Neves (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 11, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anheuser-Busch, Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc, Carlos Brito, Joao Mauricio Giffoni de Castro Neves with Jury Demand (Receipt number 34635003508, filing fee $400) filed by Bruce Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit)(crt,MiletelloSld, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Anheuser-Busch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joao Mauricio Giffoni de Castro Neves
Represented By: Jessica Lauren Salafia
Represented By: Mark Edward Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Brito
Represented By: Jessica Lauren Salafia
Represented By: Mark Edward Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc
Represented By: Jessica Lauren Salafia
Represented By: Mark Edward Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch
Represented By: Jessica Lauren Salafia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch L L C
Represented By: Jessica Lauren Salafia
Represented By: Mark Edward Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?