Caesar v. Louisiana Tech University

Plaintiff: Roslyn J Caesar
Defendant: Louisiana Tech University
Case Number: 3:2019cv00915
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Louisiana Tech University. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Louisiana Tech University filed by Roslyn J Caesar.(Attorney Tyler G Storms added to party Roslyn J Caesar(pty:pla))(aty,Storms, Tyler)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/22/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Louisiana Tech University (crt,Leday, A)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/18/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER re #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 16, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Roslyn J Caesar. (crt,Miletello, A)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roslyn J Caesar. (crt,Miletello, A)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louisiana Tech University filed by Roslyn J Caesar. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caesar v. Louisiana Tech University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roslyn J Caesar
Represented By: Tyler G Storms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Tech University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?