Moss v. Pennington et al
Plaintiff: Rodericka Moss
Defendant: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, James Pennington, GKD Management LP, G K D Management L P and Starr Indemnity & Liability Co
Case Number: 3:2019cv01082
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/11/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/20/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co identifying Corporate Parent Starr Global Financial Inc, Corporate Parent Starr Global Holdings AG, Corporate Parent Starr International Company Inc for Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. (aty,McDonald, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by G K D Management L P. (aty,McDonald, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/20/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: 1 Notice of Removal, sent to Brett M Bollinger, Randell E Treadaway, Larry Peter Englande, Jr, Jeffrey E McDonald on behalf of GKD Management LP, Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/3/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 19, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 19, 2019 ANSWER to First Supplemental & Amended Complaint, by GKD Management LP, James Pennington, Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #5 OF DOCUMENT 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL & AMENDED COMPLAINT against GKD Management LP, James Pennington, Starr Indemnity and Liability Company filed by Rodericka Moss. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M).
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC Ouachita Parish, Case Number 2019-0122 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4027044) filed by Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, GKD Management LP, James Pennington. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit Responses to Requests for Admission, #5 Exhibit State Court Record)(Attorney Jeffrey E McDonald added to party GKD Management LP(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey E McDonald added to party James Pennington(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey E McDonald added to party Starr Indemnity and Liability Company(pty:dft))(aty,McDonald, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. Pennington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodericka Moss
Represented By: Jeffrey D Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company
Represented By: Larry Peter Englande, Jr
Represented By: Randell E Treadaway
Represented By: Brett M Bollinger
Represented By: Jeffrey E McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Pennington
Represented By: Larry Peter Englande, Jr
Represented By: Randell E Treadaway
Represented By: Brett M Bollinger
Represented By: Jeffrey E McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GKD Management LP
Represented By: Larry Peter Englande, Jr
Represented By: Randell E Treadaway
Represented By: Brett M Bollinger
Represented By: Jeffrey E McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G K D Management L P
Represented By: Larry Peter Englande, Jr
Represented By: Randell E Treadaway
Represented By: Brett M Bollinger
Represented By: Jeffrey E McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Co
Represented By: Larry Peter Englande, Jr
Represented By: Randell E Treadaway
Represented By: Brett M Bollinger
Represented By: Jeffrey E McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?