RSBCO v. USA
Plaintiff: RSBCO and R S B C O
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01138
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R S B C O USA served on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (aty,Woodard, Russell)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R S B C O USA served on 9/9/2019. (aty,Woodard, Russell) Modified on 9/18/2019 docket entry to remove answer due date; awaiting service return as to Charles P Rettig (Dauterive, C). Modified on 9/20/2019 to modify date of service. (Crick, S).
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons,Complaint served on US Attorney on 09/06/2019, filed by R S B C O. (aty,Woodard, Russell)
September 9, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Russell A Woodard, Jr on behalf of R S B C O regarding #3 Summons Returned Executed. Action taken: Modified docket entry to remove answer due date; awaiting service returns as to U S Attorney General and Charles P Rettig. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R S B C O. USA served on 9/6/2019. (aty,Woodard, Russell) Modified on 9/11/2019 to remove answer due date; awaiting service returns as to U S Attorney General and Charles P Rettig. (Dauterive, C).
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Charles P Rettig. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 29, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4036663) filed by RSBCO. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Russell A Woodard, Jr added to party RSBCO(pty:pla))(aty,Woodard, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RSBCO v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RSBCO
Represented By: Russell A Woodard
Represented By: Russell A Woodard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R S B C O
Represented By: Russell A Woodard
Represented By: Russell A Woodard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?