Glass v. Finley et al
Plaintiff: David Christopher Glass
Defendant: Kristy Massey Finley, First Guaranty Mortgage Corp and Dean Morris L L C
Case Number: 3:2019cv01216
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the motion be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 11/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/4/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTION to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by David Christopher Glass. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by David Christopher Glass of Pendency of Actions (crt,Jones, P)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Responses due by 10/31/2019 (crt,Jones, P)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Guaranty Mortgage Corp identifying Corporate Parent B2 FIE IV LLC for First Guaranty Mortgage Corp. (aty,Bowen, Candace)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dean Morris L L C. (aty,Bowen, Candace)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dean Morris L L C, Kristy Massey Finley, First Guaranty Mortgage Corp. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed order)(Attorney Candace Lauren Bowen added to party Dean Morris L L C, Kristy Massey Finley, First Guaranty Mortgage Corp(pty:dft))(aty,Bowen, Candace) Modified on 10/10/2019 to edit text (Jones, P).
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dean Morris L L C, Kristy Massey Finley, First Guaranty Mortgage Corp (crt,Miletello, A)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/18/2019. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/18/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #3 Motion for TRO. It Is Further Ordered that the request for an emergency hearing is Denied. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/17/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 17, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 MOTION for Sanctions. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Crick, S)
September 17, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Crick, S)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Sanctions by David Christopher Glass. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(crt,Miletello, A) .
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Permanent Injunction & Demand for Emergency Hearing by David Christopher Glass. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed order)(crt,Miletello, A)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Christopher Glass. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(crt,Miletello, A)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dean Morris L L C, Kristy Massey Finley, First Guaranty Mortgage Corp with Jury Demand filed by David Christopher Glass. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glass v. Finley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Massey Finley
Represented By: Candace Lauren Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Guaranty Mortgage Corp
Represented By: Candace Lauren Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Morris L L C
Represented By: Candace Lauren Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Christopher Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?