Perkins v. Ouachita Correctional Center et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Domtae Perkins
Defendant: Cpt Cambell, Ms Parker, Jay Russul, Cpl Yardba, Mrs Brordway, Pat Johnson and Ouachita Correctional Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv01232
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 20, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-12158. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND REASONS: Case Transferred to Western District of Louisiana. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that determination of pauper status is DEFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 9/19/2019.(ajn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan Domtae Perkins. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Originally Filed Deficient Document)(jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jonathan Domtae Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Originally Filed Deficient Complaint)(jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/5/2019. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan Domtae Perkins. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT: COMPLAINT against Ms. Brordway, Cpt. Cambell, Pat Johnson, Ouachita Correctional Center, Ms. Parker, Jay Russell, Yarolba filed by Jonathan Domtae Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Ouachita Correctional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt Cambell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Russul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl Yardba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs Brordway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ouachita Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Domtae Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?