Richard et al v. F C A U S L L C et al
Plaintiff: Cody Richard and Lynore Richard
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Courtesy of Ruston, LLC, Brennan Dodge, LLC, Brennan Dodge L L C, F C A U S L L C and Courtesy of Ruston L L C
Case Number: 3:2019cv01407
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 3rd Judicial District Court for Lincoln Parish. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 13, 2019 Filing 17 JUDGMENT granting #11 Motion to Remand. This matter is hereby remanded to the Third Judicial District Court, for the Parish of Lincoln, State of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/13/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 12, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by F C A U S L L C. (aty,Bryant, Camille)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/5/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by F C A U S L L C . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Bryant, Camille)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Cody Richard, Lynore Richard, F C A U S L L C, Courtesy of Ruston L L C and Brennan Dodge L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Pipes, William) Modified filers on 12/3/2019 (Bunting, M).
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #11 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (crt,Bunting, M)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Cody Richard, Lynore Richard. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(aty,Pipes, William)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 1/21/2020. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/26/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by F C A U S L L C.(aty,Bryant, Camille)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by F C A U S L L C. (aty,Bryant, Camille)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #2 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Camille R Bryant, Gary G Hebert on behalf of F C A U S L L C. Show Cause Response due by 12/2/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. F C A U S L L C answer due 11/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/7/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent by F C A U S L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Bryant, Camille)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/4/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Camille R Bryant, Gary G Hebert on behalf of F C A U S L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/14/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 30, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 30, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. FCA US LLC answer due 11/6/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 3rd JDC Lincoln Parish, Case Number 60615 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4088657) filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 State court petition Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Camille R Bryant added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Bryant, Camille)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard et al v. F C A U S L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Richard
Represented By: William Ransom Pipes
Represented By: Blaine Thomas Aydell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynore Richard
Represented By: William Ransom Pipes
Represented By: Blaine Thomas Aydell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Gary G Hebert
Represented By: Camille R Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtesy of Ruston, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brennan Dodge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brennan Dodge L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F C A U S L L C
Represented By: Gary G Hebert
Represented By: Camille R Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtesy of Ruston L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?