Kansas City Southern Railway Co v. Shan of Monroe L L C et al
Plaintiff: Kansas City Southern Railway Co
Defendant: Welco of West Monroe Inc, XYZ-1 Insurance Company, Shan of Monroe, LLC, XYZ Company, XYZ-2 Insurance Company, X Y Z Co, X Y Z Insurance Co and Shan of Monroe L L C
Case Number: 3:2019cv01569
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Welco of West Monroe Inc served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (aty,Gilliam, Bobby)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Shan of Monroe L L C served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (aty,Gilliam, Bobby)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shan of Monroe L L C, Welco of West Monroe Inc (crt,Bunting, M)
December 6, 2019 Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes added. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shan of Monroe, LLC, Welco of West Monroe Inc, XYZ Company, XYZ-1 Insurance Company, XYZ-2 Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4127251) filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Bobby S Gilliam added to party Kansas City Southern Railway Co(pty:pla))(aty,Gilliam, Bobby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kansas City Southern Railway Co v. Shan of Monroe L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas City Southern Railway Co
Represented By: Bobby S Gilliam
Represented By: Gemma Zuniga
Represented By: Paul Michael Davis, Jr
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick McCartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welco of West Monroe Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ-1 Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shan of Monroe, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ-2 Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shan of Monroe L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?