McNeese v. Snow et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Henry McNeese, III
Defendant: Billy Rath, Amy Defreese Snow and Timmy A Snow
Case Number: 3:2020cv00071
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 APPEAL REMARK re #10 Notice of Appeal: Appeals Clerk received call from Mr. McNeese, pro se requesting a copy of his certified ROA (USCA #20-30082). Clerk forwarded Mr. McNeese a copy of the certified ROA (1 Disc) via USPS mail on 3/9/20. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
March 5, 2020 ELECTRONICALLY CERTIFIED Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #10 Notice of Appeal is now available to Appellate Counsel via the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals website. See Instructions for Access and Use of the Electronic Record Download Feature of CM/ECF by clicking #here. (USCA #20-30082) If you do not have access to the Electronic Download Feature of CM/ECF, please submit your request for the certified record on appeal to the District Court. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
February 19, 2020 Set Deadline for Clerk re #10 Notice of Appeal: Certify Appeal Record (20-30082) by Clerk to COA 3/5/2020. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
February 19, 2020 USCA Case Number 20-30082 for #10 Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph Henry McNeese, III. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 2/11/2020. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal by Joseph Henry McNeese, III, pro se. (crt,WalkerSld, B) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (WalkerSld, B).
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 9 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Joseph Henry McNeese, III, pro se. FEE STATUS: NOT PAID (crt,WalkerSld, B)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #8 Motion to Amend/Correct. Case has already been dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 2/5/2020. (jud,Hayes, Karen)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Joseph Henry McNeese, III. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed exhibit)(crt,Crick, S)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 EXHIBIT #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Henry McNeese, III. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint by Joseph Henry McNeese, III. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT denying #3 Motion for TRO. It is further ordered that this case is Dismissed Without Prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/17/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RULING re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Joseph Henry McNeese, III. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/17/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 15, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Joseph Henry McNeese, III. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Henry McNeese, III. (crt,Miletello, A) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2020: #1 Proposed order) (Thigpen, M).
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Billy Rath, Amy Defreese Snow, Timmy A Snow filed by Joseph Henry McNeese, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeese v. Snow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Henry McNeese, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Rath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Defreese Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timmy A Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?