Rhodes v. Aurora Cares L L C
Plaintiff: Curtis Rhodes
Defendant: Lisa Davis, Aurora Cares, LLC and Aurora Cares L L C
Case Number: 3:2020cv00319
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 First MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Curtis Rhodes. (aty,Coman, Matthew)
April 28, 2020 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 First MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Lisa Davis. (Attachments: #1 Letters of reference)(aty,Nowell, Penny)
April 28, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 First MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Aurora Cares L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief A - Memorandum Brief in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit B - January 10, 2020 Review Panel Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Lisa Davis, #4 Exhibit D - February 26, 2020 Review Panel Correspondence)(aty,Frye, William) Modified docket text on 4/29/2020 (Bunting, M).
April 20, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #17 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dismiss plaintiffs claims against Lisa Davis or for stay MOTION to Stay . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Responses due by 6/26/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
April 20, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Aurora Cares, LLC MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion to Stay this Proceeding MOTION to Stay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Responses due by 6/20/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply are extended by 60 days respectively. A separate Notice of Motion Setting will issue relating to these pending Motions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's #21 Motion to Compel is moot and hereby denied. The depositions noticed by Plaintiff shall be continued to a mutually convenient time and place when the travel restrictions and/or stay-home orders are lifted in Louisiana and Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/20/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
April 17, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Aurora Cares, LLC MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion to Stay this Proceeding MOTION to Stay, [1 (Joint Response) filed by Aurora Cares L L C and Lisa Davis. (aty,Frye, William) Modified on 4/17/2020 (Bunting, M).
April 16, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Aurora Cares L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - April 11, 2020 Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - April 13, 2020 Response Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Fourth Supplemental Order, #5 Exhibit E - Frye Email)(aty,Frye, William)
April 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Aurora Cares, LLC MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion to Stay this Proceeding MOTION to Stay. Responses due by 4/20/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Expedite consideration of #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. Aurora Cares LLC shall file any response to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension or to Stay on or before April 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/14/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
April 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Compel. Responses due by 4/20/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Expedite consideration of #21 MOTION to Compel. Aurora Cares LLC shall file response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel on or before April 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/14/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
April 13, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Aurora Cares, LLC MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion to Stay this Proceeding MOTION to Stay, [1 by Curtis Rhodes. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Coman, Matthew)
April 13, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Aurora Cares, LLC MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion to Stay this Proceeding MOTION to Stay, #17 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dismiss plaintiffs claims against Lisa Davis or for stay MOTION to Stay with opposition by Curtis Rhodes. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Coman, Matthew)
April 13, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #21 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by Curtis Rhodes. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Coman, Matthew) Modified docket text on 4/14/2020 (Bunting, M).
April 13, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by Curtis Rhodes. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed order)(aty,Coman, Matthew) Modified docket text and event ot more accurately describe document filed on 4/14/2020 (Bunting, M).
April 7, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #19 First MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Responses due by 4/28/2020 (crt,Bunting, M)
April 7, 2020 Filing 19 First MOTION to Remand by Curtis Rhodes. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed order Proposed Order)(aty,Coman, Matthew). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 4/7/2020 (Bunting, M). Modified to add additional relief requested on 4/7/2020 (Bunting, M).
April 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #17 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dismiss plaintiffs claims against Lisa Davis or for stay MOTION to Stay . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Responses due by 4/27/2020 (crt,Bunting, M)
April 3, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dismiss plaintiffs claims against Lisa Davis or for stay, MOTION to Stay (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/3/2020.) by Lisa Davis. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Declaration of Lisa Davis, #4 Cover Letter)(aty,Nowell, Penny) Modified docket text on 4/6/2020 (Bunting, M).
April 2, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Aurora Cares L L C . (aty,Frye, William)
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aurora Cares L L C. (aty,Frye, William)
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Aurora Cares, LLC MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion to Stay this Proceeding MOTION to Stay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Responses due by 4/21/2020 (crt,Bunting, M)
March 30, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Aurora Cares, LLC MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion to Stay this Proceeding filed by Aurora Cares L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages)(aty,Frye, William)
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Aurora Cares, LLC, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion to Stay this Proceeding by Aurora Cares L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Review Panel Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Tina Alexander, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Lisa Davis)(aty,Frye, William). Added MOTION to Stay on 3/31/2020 (Bunting, M). Modified to add additional relief requested on 3/31/2020 (Bunting, M). See #13 for Memorandum.
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal. Lisa Davis answer due 4/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/27/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
March 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement of Aurora Cares due by 4/2/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal. Aurora Cares L L C answer due 3/30/2020. An extension to time until 4/2/20 to file its Corporate Disclosure Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/24/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent and to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Cares L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Frye, William)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Lisa Davis. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Conference with Counsel, #2 Text of proposed order, #3 Cover letter)(Attorney Penny N Nowell added to party Lisa Davis(pty:dft))(aty,Nowell, Penny)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of William Davis Frye for Aurora Cares L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/18/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for W. Davis Frye to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4211821) by Aurora Cares L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed order)(aty,McCain, Allena)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/13/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/12/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Connell L Archey on behalf of Aurora Cares L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/26/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
March 11, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Mitchell, P)
March 11, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Lisa Davis answer due 3/18/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Document #2 . (crt,Mitchell, P)
March 11, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed for Aurora Cares, L L C in the 3rd JDC, Parish of Union with answer due 3/23/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Document #2 . (crt,Mitchell, P)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal, state court record by Aurora Cares, LLC. (aty,Archey, Connell)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 3rd JDC Union Parish, Case Number 49313 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4206510) filed by Aurora Cares, LLC, Lisa Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Connell L Archey added to party Aurora Cares, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Connell L Archey added to party Lisa Davis(pty:selreq))(aty,Archey, Connell) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/12/2020) (Mitchell, P). Modified on 3/12/2020 to correct buttons on civil cover sheet. (Mitchell, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes v. Aurora Cares L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Davis
Represented By: Penny N Nowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Cares, LLC
Represented By: Connell L Archey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Cares L L C
Represented By: Connell L Archey
Represented By: Allena B McCain
Represented By: William Davis Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Rhodes
Represented By: Matthew McKay Coman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?