Warner v. Warden FCI Texarkana
Plaintiff: Eddie Warner
Defendant: Warden F C I Texarkana
Case Number: 3:2020cv00673
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00049. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
May 28, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to the Western District of Louisiana. (slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/28/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #4 Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding Venue sent to Eddie Warner returned, "not at Texarkana Federal Correctional Institute". No forwarding address provided by facility. (slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/28/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING VENUE. It is ORDERED that this petition is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. (Held for 20 days per Local Rule 83) Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/7/2020. (slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/28/2020.]
October 16, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. INCORRECT CASE. DISREGARD.*** INITIAL Partial Filing fee paid per court order: $ 22, receipt number 6-49596 (gsg) Modified on 10/17/2019 (gsg). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/28/2020.]
April 25, 2019 Pro Se Guidelines that includes information to petitioner to report any change of address; docket sheet; and Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge were forwarded to Petitioner Warner. (slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/28/2020.]
April 25, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/28/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING HABEAS CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/24/2019. (slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/28/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/28/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING VENUE. Petitioner is located in the Texarkana division as well as all records and witnesses involving this action and transfer of this action to such division would be appropriate. This case is transferred to the Texarkana Division of this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/24/19. (mrp, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/28/2020.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 28 USC 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Eddie Warner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mrp, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/28/2020.]
April 5, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn.(mrp, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. Warden FCI Texarkana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden F C I Texarkana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?