Cross Keys Bank v. Karcredit L L C et al
Plaintiff: Cross Keys Bank
Defendant: Ronnie D. Ward, Sharon D. Ward, Karcredit, L.L.C., Ruth Albritton, Sharon D. Karproperties, Sharon D. JDB of Monroe, Inc., Keith Albritton, Sharon D. Car King, LLC, Keith Winston Albritton, Karproperties and Ruth Crain Albritton
3Rd Party Defendant: Homeland Bancshares, Inc., Homeland Bancshares Inc and G Ellis Blount
Intervenor: Caldwell Bank & Trust Company
Intervenor Plaintiff: J D B of Monroe Inc, Car King L L C, Karcredit L L C and Caldwell Bank & Trust Co
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Ronnie D Ward and Sharon Denise Albritton Ward
Cross Defendant: R Joseph Naus
Case Number: 3:2020cv00900
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR - CASE NO LONGER PENDING IN OUR COURT.) NOTICE of (Statement Under Bankruptcy Rule 9027(e)(3)) by G Ellis Blount (aty,Johnson, Bernard) Modified on 8/3/2020 to indicate filed in error. (Crick, S).
August 3, 2020 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Bernard S Johnson on behalf of G Ellis Blount regarding #4 Notice (Other). Action taken: Terminated #4 Terminated Notice and modified text of entry to indicate Filed in Error - Case no longer pending in our court. Counsel requested to submit filing to the court of appropriate jurisdiction. (crt,Crick, S)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR - CASE NO LONGER PENDING IN OUR COURT.) MOTION to Remand by Ronnie D Ward. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Order, #2 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A)(aty,Rountree, James) Modified on 7/22/2020 to indicate filed in error. (Crick, S).
July 22, 2020 NOTICE of Corrective Action to James A Rountree on behalf of Ronnie D Ward regarding #3 MOTION to Remand . Action taken: Terminated #3 Motion to Remand and modified text of entry to indicate Filed in Error - Case no longer pending in our court. Counsel requested to submit filing to the court of appropriate jurisdiction. (crt,Crick, S)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ENTRY referring case to Bankruptcy Court: This action has been removed to this court from Fourth Judicial District Court, Ouachita Parish, Louisiana, Case Number C-2019-1665, and is being referred to U S Bankruptcy Court, Western District of Louisiana, for an adversary case regarding bankruptcy case number 20-30681. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 7/21/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Crick, S)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC Ouachita Parish, Case Number 2019-1665 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4326107) filed by Cross Keys Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - 01-Petition, #3 Exhibit 1 - 01-Exh 1, #4 Exhibit 1 - 01-Exh 2, #5 Exhibit 1 - 01-Exh 3-5, #6 Exhibit 1 - 02-Service, #7 Exhibit 1 - 03-Request Production, #8 Exhibit 1 - 04-Subpoena, #9 Exhibit 1 - 05-Answ & Reconv Demand, #10 Exhibit 1 - 06-Pn Intervene, #11 Exhibit 1 - 07-Rule, #12 Exhibit 1 - 08-Am Petition, #13 Exhibit 1 - 09-Service Returns, #14 Exhibit 1 - 11-Service, #15 Exhibit 1 - 12-Answ of Defendants, #16 Exhibit 1 - 13-Answ of Defendants, #17 Exhibit 1 - 14-Request Jury Trial, #18 Exhibit 1 - -15-Consent Order, #19 Exhibit 1 - 16-Answ & Suppl Reconv Demand, #20 Exhibit 1 - 17-Answ Intervention, #21 Exhibit 1 - 18-Excep No Cause, #22 Exhibit 1 - 19A-Am Answer, #23 Exhibit 1 - 19-Suppl Reconv Demand, #24 Exhibit 1 - 20-Intervention, #25 Exhibit 1 - 21-Oppos to Excep, #26 Exhibit 1 - 22-Mn Compel, #27 Exhibit 1 - 23-Defs Memo, #28 Exhibit 1 - 24-Ntc Hearing, #29 Exhibit 1 - 25-Combined Oppos, #30 Exhibit 1 - -26-Oppos Reconv Demand, #31 Exhibit 1 - 27-Mn Disqualify, #32 Exhibit 1 - 28-Reply to Oppos, #33 Exhibit 1 - 29-Reply to Oppos, #34 Exhibit 1 - 30-Memo Re Hearsay, #35 Exhibit 1 - 31-Service, #36 Exhibit 1 - 32-From Sheriff, #37 Exhibit 1 - 33-Am Answ, #38 Exhibit 1 - 34-Mn Status Conf, #39 Exhibit 1 - 35-Order, #40 Exhibit 1 - 36-Memo in Support, #41 Exhibit 1 - 37-Sheriff Returns)(Attorney Roger Joseph Naus added to party Cross Keys Bank(pty:pla))(aty,Naus, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross Keys Bank v. Karcredit L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie D. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon D. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karcredit, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon D. Karproperties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon D. JDB of Monroe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon D. Car King, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Winston Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karproperties
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Crain Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Homeland Bancshares, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Homeland Bancshares Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: G Ellis Blount
Represented By: Bernard S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cross Keys Bank
Represented By: Roger Joseph Naus
Represented By: Seth Michael Moyers
Represented By: Patrick Lawrence McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Caldwell Bank & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: J D B of Monroe Inc
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Car King L L C
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Karcredit L L C
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Caldwell Bank & Trust Co
Represented By: David M Kerth
Represented By: Brandon K Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Ronnie D Ward
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Sharon Denise Albritton Ward
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: R Joseph Naus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?