Admar International Inc et al v. Eastrock L L C
Plaintiff: Luv N Care Ltd and Admar International Inc
Defendant: Eastrock LLC and Eastrock L L C doing business as Haakaa U S A
Petitioner: Admar International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00904
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Admar International Inc, Luv N Care Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 9/9/2020. Any reply may be filed by movant without leave of court within 14 days after the response is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/31/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim with consent by Admar International Inc, Luv N Care Ltd. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jessica H Polakowski for Eastrock L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/13/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Monica A Mark for Eastrock L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/13/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
August 13, 2020 REFUND of duplicate fee of $105.00 completed this date through Pay.gov as fee was paid twice when filing the motion to appear pro hac vice for Jessica Hutson Polakowski on 08/12/2020, receipt ALAWDC-4354673. Counsel requested to confirm this refund on next credit card statement. (crt,Williams, C)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Responses due by 9/2/2020 (crt,Jones, P)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Eastrock L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit Declaration)(aty,Hemken, David)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Jessica Hutson-Polakowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number BLAWDC-4354673) by Eastrock L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Hemken, David)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Monica A. Mark to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4354624) by Eastrock L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney David Jonathan Hemken added to party Eastrock L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Hemken, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Admar International Inc, Luv N Care Ltd as to Eastrock L L C served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eastrock L L C. (crt,Jones, P)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to Register of Copyrights with attachments. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits, #2 Docket Sheet) (crt,Jones, P)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Luv N Care Ltd. (aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Admar International Inc. (aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Admar International Inc, Luv N Care Ltd. (aty,Chiaviello, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/21/2020) (Jones, P).
July 20, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Jones, P)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Exhibits against Eastrock L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4327375) filed by Admar International, Inc., Luv N Care Ltd.(Attorney Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr added to party Admar International Inc and Luv N Care Ltd(pty:pla))(aty,Chiaviello, Robert) Modified on 7/21/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Admar International Inc et al v. Eastrock L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastrock LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastrock L L C doing business as Haakaa U S A
Represented By: David Jonathan Hemken
Represented By: John Tucker Kalmbach
Represented By: Monica A Mark
Represented By: Jessica Hutson Polakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Admar International, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luv N Care Ltd
Represented By: Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Admar International Inc
Represented By: Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?