Davis v. Riverbend Detention Center
Plaintiff: Travis Davis
Defendant: Riverbend Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2020cv00906
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Intent to dismiss CASE for Failure to apprise court of change of address. (crt,Haik, K)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Travis Davis, River Bend Detention Center, re: #6 Sec P - Deficiency Order, returned marked: return to sender. (crt,Haik, K)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 8/21/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form, #2 Blank IFP Form)(crt,Leday, A)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/21/2020. (crt,Devillier, W)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-00256. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
July 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Devillier, W)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/21/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Transferring Case to the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 7/17/2020. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/21/2020.]
April 27, 2020 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/21/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Riverbend Detention Center, filed by Travis Davis.(KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/21/2020.]. Complaint not on approved form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Riverbend Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverbend Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?