Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C et al v S B S W L L C
Plaintiff: Admar International Inc and Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C
Defendant: S B S W L L C doing business as Gowind, Shu Zhao and Foxx Development Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00915
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C, Admar International Inc as to Foxx Development Inc served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020; Shu Zhao served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Foxx Development Inc, Shu Zhao. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Foxx Development, Inc., Shu Zhao with Jury Demand filed by Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C, Admar International Inc.(aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C, Admar International Inc as to S B S W L L C served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint) (crt,Thomas, T) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/23/2020) (Thomas, T).
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to S B S W L L C. (crt,Thomas, T)
July 22, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thomas, T)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C (Attorney Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr added to party Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C(pty:selreq)). (aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Admar International Inc. (aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Admar International Inc, Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C. (aty,Chiaviello, Robert) (Main Document 2 modified to nonfillable form and replaced on 7/22/2020) (Thomas, T). Modified to add filer on 7/22/2020 (Thomas, T).
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against S B S W L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4329860) filed by Admar International Inc, Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C.(Attorney Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr added to party Admar International Inc(pty:selreq))(aty,Chiaviello, Robert) Modified to edit docket text and add filer on 7/23/2020 (Thomas, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C et al v S B S W L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Admar International Inc
Represented By: Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C
Represented By: Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S B S W L L C doing business as Gowind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shu Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foxx Development Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?