Cross Keys Bank v. Karcredit L L C et al
Plaintiff: Cross Keys Bank
Defendant: Keith Winston Albritton, Karproperties and Ruth Crain Albritton
Intervenor Plaintiff: J D B of Monroe Inc, Car King L L C, Karcredit L L C and Caldwell Bank & Trust Co
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Ronnie D Ward and Sharon Denise Albritton Ward
3Rd Party Defendant: Homeland Bancshares Inc and G Ellis Blount
Cross Defendant: R Joseph Naus
Case Number: 3:2020cv00942
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/26/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM RULING re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference with docket entries received filed by Ronnie D Ward, Sharon Denise Albritton Ward. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/26/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 SUR-REPLY to Response to #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference with docket entries received, filed by Cross Keys Bank. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/21/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 20, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Cross Keys Bank's Sur-Reply to the Wards' Reply Brief on Withdrawal of Reference with consent . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cross Keys Bank re #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Cross Keys Bank's Sur-Reply to the Wards' Reply Brief on Withdrawal of Reference with consent (aty,McCune, Patrick)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Cross Keys Bank's Sur-Reply to the Wards' Reply Brief on Withdrawal of Reference with consent by Cross Keys Bank. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,McCune, Patrick)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference with docket entries received filed by Ronnie D Ward, Sharon Denise Albritton Ward. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Rountree, James) Modified on 8/19/2020 to correctly identify document (Dauterive, C).
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cross Keys Bank re #4 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, (aty,Naus, Roger)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference with docket entries received Cross Keys Bank's Memorandum In Opposition To The Motion to Withdraw The Reference (D.E. 1) Filed By Ronnie Ward and Sharon Ward filed by Cross Keys Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email and Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Discovery to Blount, #4 Exhibit 4 - Discovery to CKB, #5 Exhibit 5 - Karcredit Operating Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of CKB)(aty,Naus, Roger)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. Motion referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Responses due by 8/17/2020. (crt,Dunford, T)
July 27, 2020 BANKRUPTCY CLERK Certification of Completion of record on Motion to Withdraw Reference. (crt,Slatten, T)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference with docket entries received by Ronnie D Ward, Sharon Denise Albritton Ward. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Bankruptcy Adversary Docket Sheet)(crt,Dunford, T) Modified document number on 7/27/2020 (Dunford, T).
July 24, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 7/27/2020 (Dunford, T).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC Ouachita Parish, Case Number 2019-1665 filed by Cross Keys Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - 01-Petition, #3 Exhibit 1 - 01-Exh 1, #4 Exhibit 1 - 01-Exh 2, #5 Exhibit 1 - 01-Exh 3-5, #6 Exhibit 1 - 02-Service, #7 Exhibit 1 - 03-Request Production, #8 Exhibit 1 - 04-Subpoena, #9 Exhibit 1 - 05-Answ & Reconv Demand, #10 Exhibit 1 - 06-Pn Intervene, #11 Exhibit 1 - 07-Rule, #12 Exhibit 1 - 08-Am Petition, #13 Exhibit 1 - 09-Service Returns, #14 Exhibit 1 - 11-Service, #15 Exhibit 1 - 12-Answ of Defendants, #16 Exhibit 1 - 13-Answ of Defendants, #17 Exhibit 1 - 14-Request Jury Trial, #18 Exhibit 1 - -15-Consent Order, #19 Exhibit 1 - 16-Answ & Suppl Reconv Demand, #20 Exhibit 1 - 17-Answ Intervention, #21 Exhibit 1 - 18-Excep No Cause, #22 Exhibit 1 - 19A-Am Answer, #23 Exhibit 1 - 19-Suppl Reconv Demand, #24 Exhibit 1 - 20-Intervention, #25 Exhibit 1 - 21-Oppos to Excep, #26 Exhibit 1 - 22-Mn Compel, #27 Exhibit 1 - 23-Defs Memo, #28 Exhibit 1 - 24-Ntc Hearing, #29 Exhibit 1 - 25-Combined Oppos, #30 Exhibit 1 - -26-Oppos Reconv Demand, #31 Exhibit 1 - 27-Mn Disqualify, #32 Exhibit 1 - 28-Reply to Oppos, #33 Exhibit 1 - 29-Reply to Oppos, #34 Exhibit 1 - 30-Memo Re Hearsay, #35 Exhibit 1 - 31-Service, #36 Exhibit 1 - 32-From Sheriff, #37 Exhibit 1 - 33-Am Answ, #38 Exhibit 1 - 34-Mn Status Conf, #39 Exhibit 1 - 35-Order, #40 Exhibit 1 - 36-Memo in Support, #41 Exhibit 1 - 37-Sheriff Returns)(Attorney Roger Joseph Naus added to party Cross Keys Bank(pty:pla))(aty,Naus, Roger) Modified file date and document numbers on 7/27/2020 (Dunford, T). Modified on 7/27/2020 (Dunford, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross Keys Bank v. Karcredit L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: J D B of Monroe Inc
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Car King L L C
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Karcredit L L C
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Caldwell Bank & Trust Co
Represented By: David M Kerth
Represented By: Brandon K Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Ronnie D Ward
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Sharon Denise Albritton Ward
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Winston Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karproperties
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Crain Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Homeland Bancshares Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: G Ellis Blount
Represented By: Bernard S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cross Keys Bank
Represented By: Seth Michael Moyers
Represented By: Roger Joseph Naus
Represented By: Patrick Lawrence McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: R Joseph Naus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?