Ward et al v. Cross Keys Bank
Appellant: Ronnie D Ward and Sharon Denise Albritton Ward
Appellee: Cross Keys Bank
Debtor: Karcredit L L C
Case Number: 3:2020cv01511
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Setting #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Bankruptcy Appeal set for 4/6/2021 before Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Crick, S)
January 14, 2021 BANKRUPTCY CLERK Certification of Completion of record on appeal. All documents have been provided. (crt,Slatten, T)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Statement of Issues and Designation of Record for Appeal; denying 11 Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/11/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 11, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM RULING re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing of Statement of Issues & Designation of Record for Appeal filed by Ronnie D Ward, Sharon Denise Albritton Ward and 11 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by Cross Keys Bank. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/11/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #16 Motion for Leave to File Sur Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/6/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 5, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER re #16 Motion for Leave to File Sur Reply by Ronnie D Ward, Sharon Denise Albritton Ward. (aty,Rountree, James) Modified on 1/6/2021 to create docket entry relationship. (Crick, S).
January 5, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply Brief re 11 Motion to Dismiss Appeal without consent by Ronnie D Ward, Sharon Denise Albritton Ward. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Rountree, James) Modified on 1/6/2021 to create docket entry relationship and indicate #17 Proposed order submitted as separate document. (Crick, S).
January 5, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by Cross Keys Bank. (aty,McCune, Patrick)
December 30, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal, #7 MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing of Statement of Issues & Designation of Record for Appeal filed by Ronnie D Ward, Sharon Denise Albritton Ward. (aty,Rountree, James)
December 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: 11 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal. Motion referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Responses due by 1/19/2021 (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 23, 2020 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #13 Bankruptcy Designation of Record on Appeal/Withdraw Reference. Action taken: Modified docket entry to correctly reflect documents designated in Attachment #2 as 15-22. (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Cross Keys Bank (Attachments: #1 Case 20-30681 Docket Sheet, #2 Case 20-30681 Docs. 1-3, 7, 9-10, 15-22, #3 Case 20-30681 Docs. 23-25, 28-31, 37-40, 42-43, 45-46, #4 Case 20-30681 Claim 1 filed by Cross Keys Bank, #5 20AP-03011 Docket Sheet, #6 20AP-03011 Ntc. of Removal (Doc. 1) pp. 1-252, #7 20AP-03011 Ntc. of Removal (Doc. 1) pp. 253-500, #8 20AP-03011 Docs. 3-5, 8-10, 12-15, 21-22, 33-40, #9 20AP-03011 Docs. 41, 43-47, 49-51, 55, 57-58, 64, 70-72, 79-81, 83-86, 89, 94, 96, 118-121, 127-131, #10 20AP-03014 Docket Sheet, #11 20AP-03014 Notice of Removal (Doc. 1), #12 20AP-03014 Docs. 2-3, 6-7, 9-10, 12, 17-18, 24, 26-31)(crt,Mitchell, M) Modified on 1/5/2021 to correctly reflect documents designated in Attachment #2 as 15-22 (Dauterive, C).
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing of Statement of Issues & Designation of Record for Appeal filed by Cross Keys Bank in RESPONSE to #4 Minute Entry and #10 Order. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture additional reliefs incorporated within 11 Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Cross Keys Bank. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (aty,McCune, Patrick)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER vacating #9 Order on Motion for Extension. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Appellee may file an opposition to the motion no later than 12/28/2020. Appellants may file a reply to any opposition no later than 7 days after the opposition is filed. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/18/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 VACATED. ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time for Filing of Statement of Issues & Designation of Record for Appeal. The time for filing the statement of issues and designation of record is enlarged to December 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/18/2020. (crt,Miletello, A) Modified on 12/18/2020 to reflect as vacated, see #10 Order (Miletello, A).
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER re #7 Motion for Extension by Ronnie D Ward, Sharon Denise Albritton Ward . (aty,Rountree, James) Modified on 12/18/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
December 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing of Statement of Issues & Designation of Record for Appeal. Responses due by 12/28/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 17, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing of Statement of Issues & Designation of Record for Appeal. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Crick, S)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing of Statement of Issues & Designation of Record for Appeal by Ronnie D Ward, Sharon Denise Albritton Ward. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Rountree, James) Modified on 12/18/2020 to modify docket text and indicate #8 Proposed order submitted as separate document. (Crick, S).
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Adversary held on 11/12/2020 before Bankruptcy Judge John S. Hodge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Richard Simpson, Telephone number 318-588-3822. Total pages: 87. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 1/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2021. (crt,Rodgers, S)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with transcript request by Ronnie D Ward, Sharon Denise Albritton Ward (Attachments: #1 Involuntary Petition, #2 BK Docket Sheet, #3 AP Docket Sheet, #4 AP Doc 4 pages 1-250, #5 AP Doc 4 pages 251-500, #6 AP Docs 12,33,34,38 and 43, #7 AP Doc 40, #8 AP Doc #41, 44, 47, 49, 50, 55, 57, 64, 85, and 94, #9 BK Doc 23, #10 20BK-30681 Claims Register, #11 Proof of Claim filed in 20BK-30681)(crt,Rodgers, S)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY: Appellee may file a response to #2 Notice of Failure to Perfect Bankruptcy Appeal by 12/23/20. Appellants may file a reply seven days thereafter. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/10/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Issues for Appeal by Ronnie D Ward, Sharon Denise Albritton Ward re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Attachments: #1 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Rodgers, S)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Failure to Perfect Bankruptcy Appeal. (crt,Slatten, T)
November 24, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Crick, S)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT from Order dated 9/3/20,11/12/20 signed by Bankruptcy Judge John S Hodge filed by Ronnie D Ward, Sharon Denise Albritton Ward. (Attachments: #1 BK Orders Appealed, #2 BK Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal, #3 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Jones, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward et al v. Cross Keys Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ronnie D Ward
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sharon Denise Albritton Ward
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cross Keys Bank
Represented By: Patrick Lawrence McCune
Represented By: Seth Michael Moyers
Represented By: Roger Joseph Naus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Karcredit L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?