Rich Land Seed Co Inc. v. B L S W Pleasure Corp et al
Plaintiff: Rich Land Seed Co., Inc., State of Louisiana and Rich Land Seed Co Inc
Defendant: C H Cuatro, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Loe Oil & Gas Corp., Equitable Petroleum Corp, Marlog, Inc., Lo-Ho-Fi Corp., WG Gas, LLC, Bryson Oil & Gas, Inc., ABC Insurance Company, Marathon Oil Co, Quad Drilling Corp., S. H. Loe Oil Corp., City of Memphis Light, Gas & Water Division, Inc., BLSW Pleasure Corp., A B C Insurance Co, Loe Oil & Gas Corp, City of Memphis Light Gas & Water Division Inc, Marlog Inc, Bryson Oil & Gas Inc, B L S W Pleasure Corp, S H Loe Oil Corp, Memphis Light Gas & Water, W G Gas L L C, Quad Drilling Corp and Lo-Ho-Fi Corp
Case Number: 3:2021cv01070
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Marathon Oil Co, Memphis Light Gas & Water. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(aty,Zuckerman, Adam) Modified on 6/15/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
May 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #12 MOTION to Remand. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 6/14/2021 (crt,Miletello, A)
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Rich Land Seed Co Inc. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order))(aty,Owen, D) Modified filer and docket text on 5/24/2021 (Miletello, A).
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 Response to Removal Order by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Memphis Light Gas & Water, Marathon Oil Co re #6 Removal Order (aty,Zuckerman, Adam) Modified on 5/21/2021 to modify filer and docket text. (Crick, S).
May 6, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Memphis Light Gas & Water Division Inc. (aty,Zuckerman, Adam)
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marathon Oil Co identifying Corporate Parent, Marathon Oil Corp for Marathon Oil Co. (aty,Zeringue, Claire) Modified on 5/7/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Chevron Pipe Line Co, Memphis Light Gas & Water, Marathon Oil Co's responsive pleadings are due after a final ruling on motion to remand. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its Motion to Remand within 30 days of removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 4/27/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Memphis Light Gas & Water, Marathon Oil Co. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Zuckerman, Adam) Modified on 4/26/2021 to modify filer (Miletello, A).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 4/23/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED Certificate of Service re #1 Notice of Removal by Memphis Light Gas & Water. (aty,Zuckerman, Adam) Modified on 4/23/2021 to modify docket text and filer. (Crick, S).
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/22/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Adam Bennett Zuckerman, Claire Michelle Zeringue on behalf of Marathon Oil Co, Memphis Light Gas & Water. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/6/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chevron Pipe Line Co identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corp for Chevron Pipe Line Co (Attorney Jeffrey Joseph Gelpi added to party Chevron Pipe Line Co(pty:dft)). (aty,Gelpi, Jeffrey)
April 21, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. B L S W Pleasure Corp answer due 4/28/2021; Chevron Pipe Line Co answer due 4/28/2021; City of Memphis Light Gas & Water Division Inc answer due 4/28/2021; Lo-Ho-Fi Corp answer due 4/28/2021; Loe Oil & Gas Corp answer due 4/28/2021; Marathon Oil Co answer due 4/28/2021; S H Loe Oil Corp answer due 4/28/2021; W G Gas L L C answer due 4/28/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in Attachments #36 & #37 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
April 21, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Bryson Oil & Gas Inc answer due 4/28/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in Attachments #36 & #37 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
April 21, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Crick, S)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal (Joint) from 5th JDC Richland Parish, Case Number 48086 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4648777) filed by City of Memphis Light, Gas & Water Division, Inc., Marathon Oil Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Part 1 Petition, #3 Exhibit A-Part 2 Petition, #4 Exhibit A-Part 3 Petition, #5 Exhibit A-Part 4 Petition, #6 Exhibit A-Part 5 Petition, #7 Exhibit A-Part 6 Petition, #8 Exhibit A-Part 7 Petition, #9 Exhibit A-Part 8 Petition, #10 Exhibit A-Part 9 Petition, #11 Exhibit A-Part 10 Petition, #12 Exhibit A-Part 11 Petition, #13 Exhibit A-Part 12 Petition, #14 Exhibit A-Part 13 Petition, #15 Exhibit A-Part 14 Petition, #16 Exhibit A-Part 15 Petition, #17 Exhibit A-Part 16 Petition, #18 Exhibit A-Part 17 Petition, #19 Exhibit B-Part 1 Record, #20 Exhibit B-Part 2 Record, #21 Exhibit B-Part 3 Record, #22 Exhibit B-Part 4 Record, #23 Exhibit B-Part 5 Record, #24 Exhibit B-Part 6 Record, #25 Exhibit B-Part 7 Record, #26 Exhibit B-Part 8 Record, #27 Exhibit B-Part 9 Record, #28 Exhibit B-Part 10 Record, #29 Exhibit B-Part 11 Record, #30 Exhibit B-Part 12 Record, #31 Exhibit B-Part 13 Record, #32 Exhibit B-Part 14 Record, #33 Exhibit B-Part 15 Record, #34 Exhibit B-Part 16 Record, #35 Exhibit B-Part 17 Record, #36 Exhibit B-Part 18 Record, #37 Exhibit C-Citations, #38 Exhibit D-Notice of Filing, #39 Exhibit E-R - Corp Records)(Attorney Adam Bennett Zuckerman added to party City of Memphis Light, Gas & Water Division, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Zuckerman, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rich Land Seed Co Inc. v. B L S W Pleasure Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C H Cuatro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Pipe Line Co
Represented By: Alan J Berteau
Represented By: John C Funderburk
Represented By: Louis V Gregoire, Jr
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Juneau
Represented By: Anne Cary Lemelin
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph Gelpi
Represented By: Louis Matthew Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loe Oil & Gas Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equitable Petroleum Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlog, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lo-Ho-Fi Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WG Gas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryson Oil & Gas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Co
Represented By: Tyler Ann Kostal
Represented By: Richard Dean McConnell, Jr
Represented By: Claire Michelle Zeringue
Represented By: Richard Stuart Pabst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quad Drilling Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. H. Loe Oil Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Memphis Light, Gas & Water Division, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Bennett Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLSW Pleasure Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loe Oil & Gas Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Memphis Light Gas & Water Division Inc
Represented By: Lauren Brink Adams
Represented By: Adam Bennett Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlog Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryson Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B L S W Pleasure Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S H Loe Oil Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memphis Light Gas & Water
Represented By: Lauren Brink Adams
Represented By: Adam Bennett Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W G Gas L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quad Drilling Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lo-Ho-Fi Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rich Land Seed Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rich Land Seed Co Inc
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Leah Cotten Poole
Represented By: Caroline Hidalgo Martin
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Michael Louis Heaton
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: Christopher D Martin
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?