Rich Land Seed Co Inc et al v. Memphis Light Gas & Water et al
Plaintiff: Rich Land Seed Co Inc and State of Louisiana
Defendant: Chevron Pipe Line Co, Memphis Light Gas & Water, Marathon Oil Co, B L S W Pleasure Corp, Bryson Oil & Gas Inc, C H Cuatro, Equitable Petroleum Corp, L O H O F I Corp, Loe Oil & Gas Corp, Marlog Inc, Quad Drilling Corp, S H Loe Oil Corp, W G Gas L L C, A B C Insurance Co and City of Memphis Light Gas & Water Division Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv01865
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by State of Louisiana, Rich Land Seed Co Inc. (aty,Owen, D)
August 19, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Chevron Pipe Line Co, City of Memphis Light Gas & Water Division Inc, Marathon Oil Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Report & Recommendation, Judgment)(aty,Zuckerman, Adam)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #11 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 8/19/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Rich Land Seed Co Inc. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Owen, D) Modified to edit filer on 7/29/2021 (Thomas, T).
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Marathon Oil Co , City of Memphis Light, Gas & Water Division, Inc. and Chevron Pipe Line Company. (aty,Zeringue, Claire)
July 14, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Memphis Light Gas & Water Division Inc. (aty,Zuckerman, Adam) Modified to correct filer on 7/14/2021 (Thomas, T).
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Oil Corp by Marathon Oil Co. (aty,Zeringue, Claire) Modified to edit docket text on 7/12/2021 (Thomas, T).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings at this time. Plaintiff's shall file any motion to remand by 7/28/21; Responsive pleadings by Defendants are not required until further order of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/8/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by City of Memphis Light Gas & Water Division Inc, Marathon Oil Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Zuckerman, Adam) Modified to add filers on 6/30/2021 (Thomas, T).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/30/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chevron Pipe Line Co identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corp for Chevron Pipe Line Co. (aty,Gelpi, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/29/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Louis Matthew Grossman, Tyler Ann Kostal, Adam Bennett Zuckerman on behalf of Chevron Pipe Line Co, Marathon Oil Co, Memphis Light Gas & Water. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/13/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 28, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. B L S W Pleasure Corp answer due 7/6/2021; Bryson Oil & Gas Inc answer due 7/6/2021; Chevron Pipe Line Co answer due 7/6/2021; L O H O F I Corp answer due 7/6/2021; Loe Oil & Gas Corp answer due 7/6/2021; Marathon Oil Co answer due 7/6/2021; Quad Drilling Corp answer due 7/6/2021; S H Loe Oil Corp answer due 7/6/2021; W G Gas L L C answer due 7/6/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #5 to Document #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 28, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal by Memphis Light, Gas & Water, Marathon Oil Company, and Chevron Pipe Line Company from 4th JDC Morehouse Parish, Case Number 2021-94; (Filing fee $402, receipt number BLAWDC-4720634) filed by Memphis Light Gas & Water, Marathon Oil Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 - Notice of Collateral Proceeding, #3 Exhibit Ex 2(1) - State Record, #4 Exhibit Ex 2(2) - State Record, #5 Exhibit Ex 2(3) - State Record, #6 Exhibit Ex 3 - State Ntc Filing Removal, #7 Exhibit Ex 4, #8 Exhibit Ex 5, #9 Exhibit Ex 6, #10 Exhibit Ex 7, #11 Exhibit Ex 8, #12 Exhibit Ex 9, #13 Exhibit Ex 10, #14 Exhibit Ex 11, #15 Exhibit Ex 12, #16 Exhibit Ex 13, #17 Exhibit Ex 14, #18 Exhibit Ex 15, #19 Exhibit Ex 16, #20 Exhibit Ex 17, #21 Exhibit Ex 18, #22 Exhibit Ex 19, #23 Exhibit Ex 20, #24 Exhibit Ex 21, #25 Exhibit Ex 22, #26 Exhibit Ex 23, #27 Exhibit Ex 24, #28 Exhibit Ex 25)(Attorney Adam Bennett Zuckerman added to party Memphis Light Gas & Water(pty:dft))(aty,Zuckerman, Adam) Modified to remove jury demand as not jury demand was listed in notice of removal on 6/29/2021 (Thomas, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rich Land Seed Co Inc et al v. Memphis Light Gas & Water et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Pipe Line Co
Represented By: Louis Matthew Grossman
Represented By: Alan J Berteau
Represented By: Anne Cary Lemelin
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Juneau
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph Gelpi
Represented By: John C Funderburk
Represented By: Louis V Gregoire, Jr
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memphis Light Gas & Water
Represented By: Adam Bennett Zuckerman
Represented By: Kennard B Davis
Represented By: Lauren Brink Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Co
Represented By: Tyler Ann Kostal
Represented By: Claire Michelle Zeringue
Represented By: Richard Dean McConnell, Jr
Represented By: Richard Stuart Pabst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B L S W Pleasure Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryson Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C H Cuatro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equitable Petroleum Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L O H O F I Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loe Oil & Gas Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlog Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quad Drilling Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S H Loe Oil Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W G Gas L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Memphis Light Gas & Water Division Inc
Represented By: Adam Bennett Zuckerman
Represented By: Kennard B Davis
Represented By: Lauren Brink Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rich Land Seed Co Inc
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Caroline Hidalgo Martin
Represented By: Christopher D Martin
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: Leah Cotten Poole
Represented By: Michael Louis Heaton
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Caroline Hidalgo Martin
Represented By: Christopher D Martin
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: Leah Cotten Poole
Represented By: Michael Louis Heaton
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?