P A, Jr (Minor) v. Saul
Plaintiff: P.A., Jr. (Minor) and P A, Jr
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv01967
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. Transcript due 10/25/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by P A, Jr. Andrew Saul served on 7/25/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Osterhout, Karl)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Karl E Osterhout for P A, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/15/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by P A, Jr. (aty,Venkataraman, Vijay) Modified event to more accurately describe document filed on 7/14/2021 (Bunting, M).
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 9, 2021 Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky added. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 DOCUMENT RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY - MOTION for Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4732301) by P.A., Jr. (Minor). Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Venkataraman, Vijay) Modified to reflect resubmitted on 7/14/2021 (Bunting, M).
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4732252) filed by P.A., Jr. (Minor). (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to AG, #3 Summons to OGC, #4 Summons to US Atty)(Attorney Vijay Venkataraman added to party P.A., Jr. (Minor)(pty:pla))(aty,Venkataraman, Vijay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P A, Jr (Minor) v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.A., Jr. (Minor)
Represented By: Vijay Venkataraman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P A, Jr
Represented By: Vijay Venkataraman
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?