Louisiana Tech University Foundation Inc v. Bel-Mac Roofing Inc
Plaintiff: Louisiana Tech University Foundation Inc
Defendant: Bel-Mac Roofing, Inc. and Bel-Mac Roofing Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv03539
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. Judge Terry A Doughty no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.(crt,Whidden, C)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/17/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Louisiana Tech University Foundation Inc. Bel-Mac Roofing Inc waiver sent on 10/11/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (aty,Ricci, Robert)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Louisiana Tech University Foundation Inc. (aty,Ricci, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to Register of Copyrights with attachments. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint with exhibits) (crt,Bunting, M)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint with exhibits) (crt,Bunting, M)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bel-Mac Roofing Inc. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Robert Devin Ricci on behalf of Louisiana Tech University Foundation Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/22/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 8, 2021 Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky added. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bel-Mac Roofing, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4847969) filed by Louisiana Tech University Foundation Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Attorney Robert Devin Ricci added to party Louisiana Tech University Foundation Inc(pty:pla))(aty,Ricci, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana Tech University Foundation Inc v. Bel-Mac Roofing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Tech University Foundation Inc
Represented By: Robert Devin Ricci
Represented By: Lauren Jean Rucinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bel-Mac Roofing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bel-Mac Roofing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?