Louisiana et al v. Becerra et al
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, Administration for Children & Families, Jooyeun Chang and Bernadine Futrell
Case Number: 3:2021cv04370
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION for Natalie Christmas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5003581) by State of Florida. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
February 18, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION for Shannon Grammel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5003363) by State of Kansas. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Answers due by 3/24/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 2/16/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 15, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Administration for Children & Families, Xavier Becerra, Jooyeun Chang, Bernadine Futrell, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Clendenen, Michael)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of David M S Dewhirst for State of Montana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 2/8/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 7, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION for David Dewhirst to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4989147) by State of Montana. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Melissa A Holyoak for State of Utah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 2/2/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of D John Sauer for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 2/2/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
February 1, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION for Melissa A. Holyoak to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4981489) by State of Utah. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
February 1, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION for D. John Sauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4981352) by State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Morgan Elizabeth Brungard for State of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/19/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Benjamin M Flowers for State of Ohio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/19/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Thomas Tyler Hydrick for State of South Carolina. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/14/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
January 14, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Morgan Brungard to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4961593) by State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION for Benjamin M. Flowers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4961479) by State of Ohio. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2022 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Tennessee, State of Georgia, State of Ohio, State of Alabama, State of Utah, State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of West Virginia, State of North Dakota, State of Missouri, State of Florida, State of Alaska, State of Iowa, State of Mississippi, State of South Dakota, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Indiana, State of Arizona, State of Wyoming, State of South Carolina, State of Kansas, State of Arkansas Bernadine Futrell served on 12/27/2021, answer due 2/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-USPS Tracking, #2 Exhibit B-USPS Tracking-US Atty, #3 Exhibit C-USPS Tracking-US AG)(aty,St John, Joseph)
January 14, 2022 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Tennessee, State of Georgia, State of Ohio, State of Alabama, State of Utah, State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of West Virginia, State of North Dakota, State of Missouri, State of Florida, State of Alaska, State of Iowa, State of Mississippi, State of South Dakota, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Indiana, State of Arizona, State of Wyoming, State of South Carolina, State of Kansas, State of Arkansas Jooyeun Chang served on 12/27/2021, answer due 2/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-USPS Tracking, #2 Exhibit B-USPS Tracking-US Atty, #3 Exhibit C-USPS Tracking-US AG)(aty,St John, Joseph)
January 14, 2022 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Tennessee, State of Georgia, State of Ohio, State of Alabama, State of Utah, State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of West Virginia, State of North Dakota, State of Missouri, State of Florida, State of Alaska, State of Iowa, State of Mississippi, State of South Dakota, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Indiana, State of Arizona, State of Wyoming, State of South Carolina, State of Kansas, State of Arkansas Administration for Children & Families served on 12/27/2021, answer due 2/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-USPS Tracking, #2 Exhibit B-USPS Tracking-US Atty, #3 Exhibit C-USPS Tracking-US AG)(aty,St John, Joseph)
January 14, 2022 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Tennessee, State of Georgia, State of Ohio, State of Alabama, State of Utah, State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of West Virginia, State of North Dakota, State of Missouri, State of Florida, State of Alaska, State of Iowa, State of Mississippi, State of South Dakota, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Indiana, State of Arizona, State of Wyoming, State of South Carolina, State of Kansas, State of Arkansas U S Dept of Health & Human Services served on 12/27/2021, answer due 2/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-USPS Tracking, #2 Exhibit B-USPS Tracking-US Atty, #3 Exhibit C-USPS Tracking-US AG)(aty,St John, Joseph)
January 14, 2022 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Tennessee, State of Georgia, State of Ohio, State of Alabama, State of Utah, State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of West Virginia, State of North Dakota, State of Missouri, State of Florida, State of Alaska, State of Iowa, State of Mississippi, State of South Dakota, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Indiana, State of Arizona, State of Wyoming, State of South Carolina, State of Kansas, State of Arkansas Xavier Becerra served on 12/27/2021, answer due 2/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-USPS Tracking, #2 Exhibit B-USPS Tracking-US Atty, #3 Exhibit C-USPS Tracking-US AG)(aty,St John, Joseph)
January 11, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #26 MOTION for Thomas T. Hydrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4956326). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Crick, S)
January 11, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Thomas T. Hydrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4956326) by State of South Carolina. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
January 11, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #26 MOTION for Thomas T. Hydrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4956326). Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Crick, S)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of James A Campbell for State of Nebraska. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/10/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
January 7, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for James A. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4953095) by State of Nebraska. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Lindsay S See for State of West Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/7/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of David M McVey for State of South Dakota. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/7/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Elisabeth Ashley Daigle for State of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/7/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Stephen J Petrany for State of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/7/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
January 6, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for David M. McVey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4951543) by State of South Dakota. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
January 6, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Lindsay S. See to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4951354) by State of West Virginia. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
January 6, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Elisabeth Daigle to Enroll as Counsel by State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
January 6, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Stephen J. Petrany to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4950223) by State of Georgia. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
January 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot #6 Motion for TRO and #7 Amended Motion for TRO. The U.S. Department of Health and Human Resources, the Administration for Children and Families, and the Office of Head Start, along with their Secretary, directors, administrators, and employees are hereby ENJOINED and RESTRAINED from implementing the Head Start Mandate set forth in 86 Fed. Reg. 68052 (November 30, 2021), as to all Head Start staff, volunteers, contractors, students, and all others covered by said Head Start Mandate. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/1/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 31, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming. (aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
December 29, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #7 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Administration for Children & Families, Xavier Becerra, Jooyeun Chang, Bernadine Futrell, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. (aty,Clendenen, Michael)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants may file a combined brief in response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order not to exceed 50 pages, excluding the table of contents and table of authorities. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs may file a combined reply brief in support of both Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order not to exceed 20 pages, excluding the table of contents and table of authorities. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/27/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 27, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Administration for Children & Families, Xavier Becerra, Jooyeun Chang, Bernadine Futrell, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Edelman, Christopher)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Clendenen on behalf of Administration for Children & Families, Xavier Becerra, Jooyeun Chang, Bernadine Futrell, U S Dept of Health & Human Services (Attorney Michael Patrick Clendenen added to party Administration for Children & Families(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Patrick Clendenen added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Patrick Clendenen added to party Jooyeun Chang(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Patrick Clendenen added to party Bernadine Futrell(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Patrick Clendenen added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft)) (aty,Clendenen, Michael)
December 27, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY: Defendants are to file a response to #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, December 29, 2021. Plaintiffs may file a reply by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, December 31, 2021. Plaintiffs are to promptly notify Defendants of this briefing schedule in order to allow Defendants sufficient time to respond. The previous briefing schedule [Doc. No. 3] for the Preliminary Injunction remains in effect. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/23/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D Edelman on behalf of Administration for Children & Families, Xavier Becerra, Jooyeun Chang, Bernadine Futrell, U S Dept of Health & Human Services (Attorney Christopher D Edelman added to party Administration for Children & Families(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher D Edelman added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher D Edelman added to party Jooyeun Chang(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher D Edelman added to party Bernadine Futrell(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher D Edelman added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft)) (aty,Edelman, Christopher)
December 23, 2021 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
December 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Xavier Becerra, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, Administration for Chidlren & Families, Jooyeun Chang, Bernadine Futrell. (crt,Crick, S)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 ISSUED IN ERROR. SUMMONS ISSUED as to Administration for Children & Families, Xavier Becerra, Jooyeun Chang, Bernadine Futrell, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 12/22/2021 to indicate issued in error. (Crick, S).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ENTRY: Plaintiffs are to promptly serve Defendants with the Complaint and #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and file proof of service in the record. Upon receipt, Defendants may file a Response to the Motion no later than 5 p.m. on 1/14/2022. Plaintiffs may file a Reply no later than 5 p.m. on 1/21/2022. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/22/2021. (crt,Keifer, K)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Administration for Children & Families, Xavier Becerra, Jooyeun Chang, Bernadine Futrell, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4936479) filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Tennessee, State of Georgia, State of Ohio, State of Alabama, State of Utah, State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of West Virginia, State of North Dakota, State of Missouri, State of Florida, State of Alaska, State of Iowa, State of Mississippi, State of South Dakota, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Indiana, State of Arizona, State of Wyoming, State of South Carolina, State of Kansas, State of Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Alabama(pty:pla), State of Alaska(pty:pla), State of Arizona(pty:pla), State of Arkansas(pty:pla), State of Florida(pty:pla), State of Georgia(pty:pla), State of Indiana(pty:pla), State of Iowa(pty:pla), State of Kansas(pty:pla), Commonwealth of Kentucky(pty:pla), State of Louisiana(pty:pla), State of Mississippi(pty:pla), State of Missouri(pty:pla), State of Montana(pty:pla), State of Nebraska(pty:pla), State of North Dakota(pty:pla), State of Ohio(pty:pla), State of Oklahoma(pty:pla), State of South Carolina(pty:pla), State of South Dakota(pty:pla), State of Tennessee(pty:pla), State of Utah(pty:pla), State of West Virginia(pty:pla), State of Wyoming(pty:pla))(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/21/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
December 21, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana et al v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Joseph Scott St John
Represented By: Josiah Kollmeyer
Represented By: Elisabeth Ashley Daigle
Represented By: Morgan Elizabeth Brungard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alabama
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alaska
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arizona
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Georgia
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Indiana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Iowa
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Kansas
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: D John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Montana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: David M S Dewhirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: James Andrew Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Thomas Tyler Hydrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: David M McVey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Utah
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Melissa A Holyoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wyoming
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Christopher D Edelman
Represented By: Michael Patrick Clendenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Health & Human Services
Represented By: Christopher D Edelman
Represented By: Michael Patrick Clendenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administration for Children & Families
Represented By: Christopher D Edelman
Represented By: Michael Patrick Clendenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jooyeun Chang
Represented By: Christopher D Edelman
Represented By: Michael Patrick Clendenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadine Futrell
Represented By: Christopher D Edelman
Represented By: Michael Patrick Clendenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?