Missouri et al v. Biden et al
Plaintiff: State of Missouri, State of Louisiana, Aaron Kheriaty, Dr. Martin Kulldorff, Jim Hoft, Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines and Martin Kulldorff
Defendant: Joseph R Biden, Jr, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Vivek H. Murthy, Xavier Becerra, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dr. Anthony Fauci, National Institute of Allergy and Infectious Diseases, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Alejandro Mayorkas, Dept of Homeland Security, Jen Easterly, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Nina Jankowicz, Vivek H Murthy, Anthony Fauci, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Karine Jean-Pierre, Carol Crawford, Jennifer Shopkorn, United States Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce, Robert Silvers, Samantha Vinograd, Gina McCarthy, U S Census Bureau, U S Dept of Commerce, Andrew Slavitt, Rob Flaherty, Courtney Rowe, Clarke Humphrey, Benjamin Wakana, Subhan Cheema, Dori Salcido, Timothy W Manning, Dana Remus, Aisha Shah, Laura Rosenberger, Mina Hsiang, U S Dept of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Laura Dehmlow, Elvis M Chan, Jay Dempsey, Kate Galatas, Eric Waldo, Yolanda Byrd, Christy Choi, Tericka Lambert, Joshua Peck, Janell Muhammed, Matthew Masterson, Lauren Protentis, Geoffrey Hale, Allison Snell, Kim Wyman, Brian Scully, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Kristin Galemore, U S Food & Drug Administration, Erica Jefferson, Michael Murray, Brad Kimberly, U S Dept of State, Leah Bray, Samaruddin K Stewart, Daniel Kimmage, Alexis Frisbie, U S Dept of Treasury, Wally Adeyemo, U S Election Assistance Commission, Mark A Robbins and Kristen Muthig
Petitioner: Judson Witham, Kimberly D Hogan, Mike Webb, Charlene Bollinger, Robert F Kennedy, Jr and Joseph Mercola
Case Number: 3:2022cv01213
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #219 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact attached to #214 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting in part defendants request for extension of time to respond to #214 Memorandum in Support of #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants shall respond by 4/25/23 and Plaintiffs may reply fifteen days thereafter. It Is Further Ordered that oral arguments will be held on 5/12/23 at 9:00 a.m. in Monroe, Second Floor Courtroom. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 3/15/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 15, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 4/25/2023. Oral Argument will be held on 5/12/2023 at 9:00 AM in Monroe, 2nd floor before Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 14, 2023 Filing 222 REPLY to Response to Motion re #219 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact or in the Alternative, for Other Appropriate Relief filed by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. (aty,Snow, Kyla)
March 13, 2023 Filing 221 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #219 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact or in the Alternative, for Other Appropriate Relief filed by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (aty,Sauer, Dean)
March 9, 2023 Filing 220 MINUTE ENTRY: re #219 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact or in the Alternative, for Other Appropriate Relief. Plaintiffs' Response is due by 3/13/2023. Defendants may reply by 3/14/2023. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 3/9/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 9, 2023 Filing 219 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact or in the Alternative, for Other Appropriate Relief by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Snow, Kyla)
March 8, 2023 Filing 218 REDACTED EXHIBIT G re #214 Memorandum in Support of #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED Exhibit H, #2 REDACTED Exhibit K, #3 REDACTED Exhibit S, #4 REDACTED Exhibit T, #5 REDACTED Exhibit U, #6 REDACTED Exhibit V, #7 REDACTED Exhibit W, #8 REDACTED Exhibit FF)(crt,Crawford, A)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting #216 Motion to Seal Exhibits attached to #212 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and #214 Memorandum in Support of Motion, and Replace with redacted copies. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 3/8/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 7, 2023 Motions Transferred regarding #216 Consent MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Document re: #214 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, #212 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
March 7, 2023 Filing 216 Consent MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Document re: #214 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, #212 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Proposed order)(aty,Sauer, Dean)
March 7, 2023 Filing 215 MANUAL ATTACHMENT received from Dean John Sauer on behalf of Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri regarding #214 Supplememntal Memorandum in Support of Motion. The original manual attachments will be maintained in the division of the presiding judge, until expiration of appeal delays. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 7, 2023 Filing 214 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1-Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact, #2 Ex. 2-Declaration of Jasimiel Jones, #3 Jones Declaration Ex. A, #4 Jones Declaration Ex. B, #5 Jones Declaration Ex. C, #6 Jones Declaration Ex. D, #7 Jones Declaration Ex. E, #8 Jones Declaration Ex. F, #9 Sealed Jones Declaration Ex. G, #10 Sealed Jones Declaration Ex. H, #11 Jones Declaration Ex. I, #12 Jones Declaration Ex. J, #13 Sealed Jones Declaration Ex. K, #14 Jones Declaration Ex. L, #15 Jones Declaration Ex. M, #16 Jones Declaration Ex. N, #17 Jones Declaration Ex. O, #18 Jones Declaration Ex. P, #19 Jones Declaration Ex.Q, #20 Jones Declaration Ex. R, #21 Sealed Jones Declaration Ex. S, #22 Sealed Jones Declaration Ex. T, #23 Sealed Jones Declaration Ex. U, #24 Sealed Jones Declaration Ex. V, #25 Sealed Jones Declaration Ex. W, #26 Jones Declaration Ex. X, #27 Jones Declaration Ex. Y, #28 Jones Declaration Ex. Z, #29 Jones Declaration Ex. AA, #30 Jones Declaration Ex. BB, #31 Jones Declaration Ex. CC, #32 Jones Declaration Ex. DD, #33 Jones Declaration Ex. EE, #34 Sealed Jones Declaration Ex. FF, #35 Jones Declaration Ex. GG, #36 Jones Declaration Ex. HH - Notice of Manual Attachment)(crt,Crawford, A) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/7/2023) (Crawford, A). (Attachment 36 replaced on 3/7/2023) (Crawford, A). Modified on 3/7/2023 to correct text (Crawford, A). Modified on 3/8/2023 to indicate which exhibits were sealed (Crawford, A).
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting #212 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 3/7/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 6, 2023 Motions Transferred regarding #212 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
March 6, 2023 Filing 212 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Charlene Bollinger, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Ex. 1-Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact, #4 Ex. 2-Declaration of Jasimiel Jones, #5 Jones Declaration Ex. A, #6 Jones Declaration Ex. B, #7 Jones Declaration Ex. C, #8 Jones Declaration Ex. D, #9 Jones Declaration Ex. E, #10 Jones Declaration Ex. F, #11 Jones Declaration Ex. G, #12 Jones Declaration Ex. H, #13 Jones Declaration Ex. I, #14 Jones Declaration Ex. J, #15 Jones Declaration Ex. K, #16 Jones Declaration Ex. L, #17 Jones Declaration Ex. M, #18 Jones Declaration Ex. N, #19 Jones Declaration Ex. O, #20 Jones Declaration Ex. P, #21 Jones Declaration Ex. Q, #22 Jones Declaration Ex. R, #23 Jones Declaration Ex. S, #24 Jones Declaration Ex. T, #25 Jones Declaration Ex. U, #26 Jones Declaration Ex. V, #27 Jones Declaration Ex. W, #28 Jones Declaration Ex. X, #29 Jones Declaration Ex. Y, #30 Jones Declaration Ex. Z, #31 Jones Declaration Ex. AA, #32 Jones Declaration Ex. BB, #33 Jones Declaration Ex. CC, #34 Jones Declaration Ex. DD, #35 Jones Declaration Ex. EE, #36 Jones Declaration Ex. FF, #37 Jones Declaration Ex. GG, #38 Jones Declaration Ex. HH)(aty,Sauer, Dean)
March 6, 2023 Filing 211 MINUTE ENTRY: re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. The parties shall send an email to the deputy clerk with available dates for oral arugment. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 3/6/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 4, 2023 Filing 210 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Transcript of Eric Waldo by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri (Attachments: #1 Waldo Deposition Transcript, #2 Waldo Exhibit 1, #3 Waldo Exhibit 2, #4 Waldo Exhibit 3, #5 Waldo Exhibit 4, #6 Waldo Exhibit 5, #7 Waldo Exhibit 6, #8 Waldo Exhibit 7, #9 Waldo Exhibit 8, #10 Waldo Exhibit 9, #11 Waldo Exhibit 10, #12 Waldo Exhibit 11, #13 Waldo Exhibit 12, #14 Waldo Exhibit 14, #15 Waldo Exhibit 16, #16 Waldo Exhibit 17, #17 Waldo Exhibit 18, #18 Waldo Exhibit 19, #19 Waldo Exhibit 21, #20 Waldo Exhibit 22, #21 Waldo Exhibit 24, #22 Waldo Exhibit 25, #23 Waldo Exhibit 27, #24 Waldo Exhibit 28, #25 Waldo Exhibit 30, #26 Waldo Exhibit 31, #27 Waldo Exhibit 32, #28 Waldo Exhibit 33, #29 Waldo Exhibit 35, #30 Waldo Exhibit 36, #31 Waldo Exhibit 37, #32 Waldo Exhibit 38, #33 Waldo Exhibit 39, #34 Waldo Exhibit 41, #35 Waldo Exhibit 42, #36 Waldo Exhibit 44, #37 Waldo Exhibit 45, #38 Waldo Exhibit 46, #39 Waldo Exhibit 47, #40 Waldo Exhibit 48, #41 Waldo Exhibit 49, #42 Waldo Exhibit 50, #43 Waldo Exhibit 51, #44 Waldo Exhibit 52, #45 Waldo Exhibit 53, #46 Waldo Exhibit 54)(aty,Short, Tracy)
March 4, 2023 Filing 209 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Transcript and Exhibits of Brian Scully by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri (Attachments: #1 Scully Deposition Transcript, #2 Scully Exhibit 1, #3 Scully Exhibit 2, #4 Scully Exhibit 6, #5 Scully Exhibit 7, #6 Scully Exhibit 9, #7 Scully Exhibit 10, #8 Scully Exhibit 11, #9 Scully Exhibit 12, #10 Scully Exhibit 13, #11 Scully Exhibit 14, #12 Scully Exhibit 15, #13 Scully Exhibit 16, #14 Scully Exhibit 17, #15 Scully Exhibit 18, #16 Scully Exhibit 19, #17 Scully Exhibit 21, #18 Scully Exhibit 23, #19 Scully Exhibit 24, #20 Scully Exhibit 27, #21 Scully Exhibit 28, #22 Scully Exhibit 29, #23 Scully Exhibit 30, #24 Scully Exhibit 31, #25 Scully Exhibit 46, #26 Scully Exhibit 49, #27 Scully Exhibit 52, #28 Scully Exhibit 59, #29 Scully Exhibit 61, #30 Scully Exhibit 62)(aty,Short, Tracy)
March 4, 2023 Filing 208 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Transcript and Exhibits of Daniel Kimmage by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri (Attachments: #1 Kimmage Deposition Transcript, #2 Kimmage Exhibit 1, #3 Kimmage Exhibit 2, #4 Kimmage Exhibit 3, #5 Kimmage Exhibit 4, #6 Kimmage Exhibit 5, #7 Kimmage Exhibit 6, #8 Kimmage Exhibit 7, #9 Kimmage Exhibit 8, #10 Kimmage Exhibit 9, #11 Kimmage Exhibit 10, #12 Kimmage Exhibit 11, #13 Kimmage Exhibit 12, #14 Kimmage Exhibit 13, #15 Kimmage Exhibit 14, #16 Kimmage Exhibit 15, #17 Kimmage Exhibit 16)(aty,Short, Tracy)
March 4, 2023 Filing 207 EXHIBIT re #206 Notice (Other),,,, by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Fauci Exhibit 37, #2 Fauci Exhibit 38, #3 Fauci Exhibit 39, #4 Fauci Exhibit 40, #5 Fauci Exhibit 41, #6 Fauci Exhibit 42, #7 Fauci Exhibit 43, #8 Fauci Exhibit 44, #9 Fauci Exhibit 45, #10 Fauci Exhibit 46, #11 Fauci Exhibit 47, #12 Fauci Exhibit 48, #13 Fauci Exhibit 49, #14 Fauci Exhibit 50, #15 Fauci Exhibit 51, #16 Fauci Exhibit 52, #17 Fauci Exhibit 53, #18 Fauci Exhibit 54, #19 Fauci Exhibit 55, #20 Fauci Exhibit 56, #21 Fauci Exhibit 57, #22 Fauci Exhibit 58, #23 Fauci Exhibit 59, #24 Fauci Exhibit 60, #25 Fauci Exhibit 61, #26 Fauci Exhibit 62, #27 Fauci Exhibit 63)(aty,Short, Tracy)
March 4, 2023 Filing 206 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Transcript and Exhibits of Dr. Anthony Fauci by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri (Attachments: #1 Fauci Deposition Transcript, #2 Fauci Exhibit 1, #3 Fauci Exhibit 2, #4 Fauci Exhibit 3, #5 Fauci Exhibit 4, #6 Fauci Exhibit 5, #7 Fauci Exhibit 6, #8 Fauci Exhibit 7, #9 Fauci Exhibit 8, #10 Fauci Exhibit 9, #11 Fauci Exhibit 10, #12 Fauci Exhibit 11, #13 Fauci Exhibit 12, #14 Fauci Exhibit 13, #15 Fauci Exhibit 14, #16 Fauci Exhibit 15, #17 Fauci Exhibit 16, #18 Fauci Exhibit 17, #19 Fauci Exhibit 18, #20 Fauci Exhibit 19, #21 Fauci Exhibit 20, #22 Fauci Exhibit 21, #23 Fauci Exhibit 22, #24 Fauci Exhibit 23, #25 Fauci Exhibit 24, #26 Fauci Exhibit 25, #27 Fauci Exhibit 26, #28 Fauci Exhibit 27, #29 Fauci Exhibit 28, #30 Fauci Exhibit 29, #31 Fauci Exhibit 30, #32 Fauci Exhibit 31, #33 Fauci Exhibit 32, #34 Fauci Exhibit 33, #35 Fauci Exhibit 34, #36 Fauci Exhibit 35)(aty,Short, Tracy)
March 3, 2023 Filing 205 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Transcript and Exhibits of Carol Crawford by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript, #2 Deposition Exhibit 1, #3 Deposition Exhibit 2, #4 Deposition Exhibit 3, #5 Deposition Exhibit 4, #6 Deposition Exhibit 5, #7 Deposition Exhibit 6, #8 Deposition Exhibit 7, #9 Deposition Exhibit 8, #10 Deposition Exhibit 9, #11 Deposition Exhibit 10, #12 Deposition Exhibit 11, #13 Deposition Exhibit 12, #14 Deposition Exhibit 13, #15 Deposition Exhibit 14, #16 Deposition Exhibit 15, #17 Deposition Exhibit 16, #18 Deposition Exhibit 17, #19 Deposition Exhibit 18, #20 Deposition Exhibit 19, #21 Deposition Exhibit 20, #22 Deposition Exhibit 21, #23 Deposition Exhibit 22, #24 Deposition Exhibit 23, #25 Deposition Exhibit 24, #26 Deposition Exhibit 26, #27 Deposition Exhibit 27, #28 Deposition Exhibit 28, #29 Deposition Exhibit 29, #30 Deposition Exhibit 30, #31 Deposition Exhibit 31, #32 Deposition Exhibit 32, #33 Deposition Exhibit 33, #34 Deposition Exhibit 34, #35 Deposition Exhibit 35, #36 Deposition Exhibit 36, #37 Deposition Exhibit 37, #38 Deposition Exhibit 38, #39 Deposition Exhibit 39, #40 Deposition Exhibit 40, #41 Deposition Exhibit 41, #42 Deposition Exhibit 42, #43 Deposition Exhibit 43, #44 Deposition Exhibit 44)(aty,Short, Tracy)
March 3, 2023 Filing 204 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Transcript and Exhibits of Elvis Chan by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript, #2 Deposition Exhibit 1, #3 Deposition Exhibit 2, #4 Deposition Exhibit 6, #5 Deposition Exhibit 8, #6 Deposition Exhibit 9, #7 Deposition Exhibit 13, #8 Deposition Exhibit 15, #9 Deposition Exhibit 23)(aty,Short, Tracy)
February 24, 2023 Filing 203 NOTICE of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE that under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), the case is dismissed as of February 24, 2023, pursuant to petitioners motion. (USCA #22-30697) (crt,WalkerSld, B) Modified text on 2/24/2023 (WalkerSld, B).
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #201 Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Response/Reply re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Replies due by 3/6/2023. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 2/23/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
February 22, 2023 Motions Transferred regarding #201 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Preliminary-Injunction Brief with consent . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 22, 2023 Filing 201 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Preliminary-Injunction Brief with consent by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Sauer, Dean) Modified on 2/23/2023 (Thomas, T).
February 9, 2023 Filing 200 Statement of Facts by Kimberly D Hogan (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Bunting, M)
February 8, 2023 Filing 199 REPLY to Response to Motion re #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. (aty,Snow, Kyla)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting #197 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limit. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 2/8/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 8, 2023 Filing 197 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Reply on Motion to Dismiss by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Sur, Indraneel)
February 8, 2023 Motions Transferred regarding #197 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Reply on Motion to Dismiss. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 6, 2023 Filing 196 STATEMENT OF FACTS by Kimberly D Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting #193 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Dean John Sauer for State of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 2/2/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting #192 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as additional counsel Tracy L Short for State of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 2/1/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
February 1, 2023 Filing 193 MOTION for D. John Sauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5443205) by State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
January 31, 2023 Filing 192 MOTION for Tracy Short to Enroll as Counsel by State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Short, Tracy)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #190 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dean John Sauer terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/30/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
January 27, 2023 Filing 190 MOTION to Withdraw D. John Sauer as Attorney by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Order)(aty,Sauer, Dean)
January 27, 2023 Filing 189 NOTICE of Deficiency to Tracy L Short on behalf of State of Louisiana regarding #188 Notice of Appearance. Reason: This party is already represented by other counsel. Please refer to provisions under LR83.2.12 regarding appearance of other counsel to ensure compliance with this rule. A motion to enroll as co-counsel or to substitute counsel (signed by the current counsel of record) is required to remedy this situation. Please also refer to LR5.7.08 regarding electronic filing of documents requiring signatures of more than one party. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 27, 2023 Filing 188 DEFICIENT ? NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy L Short on behalf of State of Louisiana (Attorney Tracy L Short added to party State of Louisiana(pty:pla)) (aty,Short, Tracy) Modified to reflect deficiency on 1/27/2023 (Thomas, T).
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #178 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/25/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER denying #185 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/25/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 25, 2023 Filing 185 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply with opposition by Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, . Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed Sur-reply brief, #3 Proposed Exhibit 1 to Sur-reply: CISA MDM webpage)(aty,Snow, Kyla) Modified to correct filer and to indicate attachments are proposed on 1/25/2023 (Thomas, T).
January 25, 2023 Motions Transferred regarding #185 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply with opposition . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 24, 2023 Filing 184 REPLY to Response to Motion re #178 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Disclosures from Defendant CISA filed by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Sauer, Dean)
January 24, 2023 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua E Gardner on behalf of Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman (Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Wally Adeyemo(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Leah Bray(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Yolanda Byrd(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party U S Census Bureau(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Elvis M Chan(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Subhan Cheema(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Christy Choi(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party U S Dept of Commerce(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Carol Crawford(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Laura Dehmlow(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Jay Dempsey(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Jen Easterly(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party U S Election Assistance Commission(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Anthony Fauci(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Rob Flaherty(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party U S Food & Drug Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Alexis Frisbie(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Kate Galatas(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Kristin Galemore(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Geoffrey Hale(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Mina Hsiang(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Clarke Humphrey(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Nina Jankowicz(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Karine Jean-Pierre(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Erica Jefferson(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Brad Kimberly(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Daniel Kimmage(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Tericka Lambert(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Timothy W Manning(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Matthew Masterson(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Gina McCarthy(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Lorena Molina-Irizarry(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Janell Muhammed(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Michael Murray(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Vivek H Murthy(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Kristen Muthig(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Joshua Peck(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Lauren Protentis(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Jennifer Rene Psaki(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Dana Remus(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Mark A Robbins(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Laura Rosenberger(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Courtney Rowe(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Dori Salcido(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Zachary Henry Schwartz(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Brian Scully(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Aisha Shah(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Jennifer Shopkorn(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Robert Silvers(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Andrew Slavitt(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Allison Snell(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party U S Dept of State(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Samaruddin K Stewart(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party U S Dept of Treasury(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Samantha Vinograd(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Benjamin Wakana(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Eric Waldo(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua E Gardner added to party Kim Wyman(pty:dft)) (aty,Gardner, Joshua) (Main Document 183 modified to nonfillable form and replaced on 1/24/2023) (Thomas, T). M
January 23, 2023 Filing 182 RESPONSE to Motion re #178 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Disclosures from Defendant CISA filed by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(aty,Snow, Kyla)
January 20, 2023 Filing 181 MINUTE ENTRY: The #180 Notice of Motion Setting is Vacated. Defendants' response as to #178 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Disclosures from Defendant CISA filed by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, Jim Hoft, Jill Hines, Jayanta Bhattacharya are due by 1/23/2023. Plaintiff may file a reply by 1/24/2023. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/20/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 20, 2023 Filing 180 *VACATED*NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #178 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Disclosures from Defendant CISA. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 2/10/2023.(crt,Thomas, T) Modified on 1/20/2023 to indicate notice vacated (Crawford, A).
January 20, 2023 Motions Transferred regarding #178 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Disclosures from Defendant CISA. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 19, 2023 Filing 179 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to Motion to Compel Supplemental Production from CISA by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri re #178 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Disclosures from Defendant CISA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(aty,Sauer, Dean)
January 19, 2023 Filing 178 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Disclosures from Defendant CISA by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sauer, Dean)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #176 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Joshua M Divine for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/18/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
January 13, 2023 Filing 176 MOTION for Joshua M. Divine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5424968) by State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER re: Psaki Deposition. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/12/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 11, 2023 Filing 174 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Addressing the Fifth Circuit's Nondispositive Order Regarding Jennifer Psaki's Deposition by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Sauer, Dean)
January 11, 2023 Filing 173 NOTICE of Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum on Discovery Relating to Public Statements by Jennifer R. Psaki by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpt of Waldo Deposition)(aty,Snow, Kyla)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER denying #170 Motion for List of Inventory of All Censorship Requests. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/11/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #118 Motion to Intervene; granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion for Access to Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/10/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
January 10, 2023 Filing 170 MOTION for List of Inventory of All Censorship Requests by Judson Witham. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
January 10, 2023 Motions Transferred regarding #170 MOTION for List of Inventory of All Censorship Requests. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #167 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 2/8/2023. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/9/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying #166 Motion for List of Inventory of All Censorship Requests. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/9/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 9, 2023 Filing 167 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim with consent by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Chuzi, Amanda)
January 9, 2023 Motions Transferred regarding #167 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdic. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 6, 2023 Filing 166 MOTION for List of Inventory of All Censorship Requests by Kimberly D Hogan. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/6/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 6, 2023 Motions Transferred regarding #166 MOTION for List of Inventory of All Censorship Requests. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 6, 2023 Filing 165 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #128 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, filed by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #161 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/6/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE ENTRY: re #160 USCA Memorandum Order staying the deposition of Jennifer R. Psaki pending the pursuit of less intrusive alternatives to a deposition and further order of the district court. The parties shall file simultaneous alternatives to Psaki's depositions by 1/11/23, at 5:00 p.m. The Court will also consider an extension of the expedited preliminary injunction-related discovery only for purposes of this matter. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/6/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #159 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Charles F Capps for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/5/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
January 6, 2023 Motions Transferred regarding #161 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 5, 2023 Filing 161 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed order )(aty,Sauer, Dean) Modified on 1/6/2023 (Thomas, T).
January 5, 2023 Filing 160 USCA Memorandum Order granting the Federal Government's motion for leave to supplement its petition for writ of mandamus. (USCA #22-30697)IT IS ORDERED that the United States be added as a petitioner in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Jennifer R. Psaki's deposition is stayed pending the pursuit of less intrusive alternatives to a deposition and further order of the district court. The petition for writ of mandamus remains pending in this court. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
January 3, 2023 Filing 159 MOTION for Charles F. Capps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5412740) by State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #156 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs responses due on or before 1/5/2023. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/28/2022. (crt,Enkey, R)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #140 Motion for Clarification of #117 Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/27/2022. (crt,Enkey, R)
December 27, 2022 Filing 156 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim with consent by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Plaintiffs Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time)(aty,Sauer, Dean)
December 27, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #156 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction an. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 23, 2022 Filing 155 REPLY to Response to Motion re #140 MOTION for Clarification of #117 Memorandum Order filed by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Kirschner, Adam)
December 20, 2022 Filing 154 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #140 MOTION for Clarification of #117 Memorandum Order filed by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (aty,Sauer, Dean)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #151 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #117 Order on Motion for Protective Order with consent. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/19/2022. (crt,Enkey, R)
December 16, 2022 Filing 152 REPLY to Response to Motion re #118 MOTION to Intervene with opposition filed by Charlene Bollinger, Robert F Kennedy, Jr, Joseph Mercola. (aty,Maturin, Glynn)
December 16, 2022 Filing 151 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #117 Order on Motion for Protective Order with consent by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Kirschner, Adam)
December 16, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #151 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #117 Order on Motion for Protective Order with consent . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 9, 2022 Filing 150 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #118 MOTION to Intervene with opposition filed by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. (aty,Kirschner, Adam)
December 8, 2022 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #118 MOTION to Intervene with opposition filed by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (aty,Sauer, Dean)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM ORDER re: expedited preliminary injunction-related discovery; setting briefing schedule for #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/7/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE ENTRY: re #140 MOTION for Clarification of #117 Memorandum Order filed by Robert Silvers, U S Dept of Justice, Clarke Humphrey, Timothy W Manning, Rob Flaherty, U S Dept of Commerce, Laura Dehmlow, Daniel Kimmage, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Vivek H Murthy, U S Dept of State, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christy Choi, Kristin Galemore, Jay Dempsey, Elvis M Chan, Kristen Muthig, Laura Rosenberger, Yolanda Byrd, Andrew Slavitt, Nina Jankowicz, Eric Waldo, Brian Scully, Alexis Frisbie, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Wally Adeyemo, U S Election Assistance Commission, Brad Kimberly, Samaruddin K Stewart, Leah Bray, Dori Salcido, Jennifer Shopkorn, Kate Galatas, Tericka Lambert, Joshua Peck, Allison Snell, Gina McCarthy, Subhan Cheema, Lauren Protentis, Jen Easterly, Michael Murray, Courtney Rowe, Dept of Homeland Security, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Anthony Fauci, Benjamin Wakana, Carol Crawford, Dana Remus, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Geoffrey Hale, Aisha Shah, Samantha Vinograd, Janell Muhammed, Erica Jefferson, Kim Wyman, Mark A Robbins, U S Census Bureau, Mina Hsiang, U S Food & Drug Administration, Karine Jean-Pierre, Matthew Masterson, U S Dept of Treasury, Dept of Health & Human Services, Xavier Becerra, Jennifer Rene Psaki. Plaintiffs' response is due by 12/20/2022. Defendants may file a reply seven days thereafter. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/6/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 6, 2022 Filing 146 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY to #142 Supplemental Briefing to Address Fifth Circuit's NonDispositive Order, by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(crt,Crawford, A)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #144 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/6/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 5, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #144 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Reply Brief Addressing Fifth Circuit's Nondispositive Order. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 5, 2022 Filing 144 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Reply Brief Addressing Fifth Circuit's Nondispositive Order by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Plaintiffs' Reply Brief, #2 Proposed Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Exhibit C, #5 Proposed order)(aty,Sauer, Dean) Modified to reflect attachments are proposed on 12/6/2022 (Thomas, T).
December 5, 2022 Filing 143 MINUTE ENTRY: re #118 MOTION to Intervene with opposition. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #118 MOTION to Intervene with opposition: ( Responses due by 12/9/2022, Replies due by 12/16/2022.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 12/5/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
December 5, 2022 Filing 142 Supplemental Briefing to Address Fifth Circuit's NonDispositive Order by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #138 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/5/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 2, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #140 MOTION for Clarification of #117 Memorandum Order. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 2, 2022 Filing 140 MOTION for Clarification of #117 Memorandum Order by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Snow, Kyla) Modified on 12/5/2022 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text (Miletello, A).
December 2, 2022 Filing 139 PROPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE re #124 Motion for adjournment of nonparty deposition re #120 Order by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. (aty,Kirschner, Adam) Modified docket text on 12/5/2022 (Miletello, A).
December 2, 2022 Filing 138 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Chuzi, Amanda) Modified on 12/5/2022 to indicate #139 Proposed pleading submitted separately (Miletello, A).
December 2, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #138 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 1, 2022 Filing 137 Supplemental Brief Addressing Fifth Circuit's Nondispositive Order by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(crt,Crawford, A)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #134 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/30/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 29, 2022 Filing 135 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT Granting Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit for Their Supplemental Brief Addressing Fifth Circuit's Nondispositive Order by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri re #134 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,,. (aty,Sauer, Dean)
November 29, 2022 Filing 134 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for their Supplemental Brief by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief, #2 Proposed Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Exhibit F)(aty,Sauer, Dean) Modified on 11/29/2022 (Thomas, T).
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #124 Motion for adjournment of nonparty deposition; Extending the deadlines for completion of expedited discovery depositions to 12/30/22; and setting deadline if the deposition of Psaki has to be rescheduled. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/29/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 29, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #134 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for their Supplemental Brief. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 28, 2022 Filing 132 REPLY to Response to Motion re #124 MOTION for adjournment of nonparty deposition re #120 Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion to Expedite filed by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. (aty,Snow, Kyla)
November 25, 2022 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #124 MOTION for adjournment of nonparty deposition re #120 Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion to Expedite filed by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nov. 18 Transcript)(aty,Sauer, Dean)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MINUTE ENTRY: re #124 MOTION for adjournment of nonparty deposition re #120 Order on Motion to Quash. Responses due by 11/25/2022. Replies due by 11/28/2022. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/23/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 23, 2022 Filing 129 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Responses due by 12/29/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 23, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 12/29/2022. Replies due by 1/18/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 22, 2022 Filing 128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in support, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Snow, Kyla)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #125 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing to Address Fifth Circuits Nondispositive Order. Plaintiffs' brief due by 11/29/22; Defendants' response due by 12/2/22; Plaintiffs may file a reply by 12/5/22. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/22/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 22, 2022 Filing 126 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri re #125 Motion for Leave to File,. (aty,Sauer, Dean)
November 22, 2022 Filing 125 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing to Address Fifth Circuit's NonDispositive Order with consent by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/22/2022. (aty,Sauer, Dean)
November 22, 2022 Filing 124 MOTION for adjournment of nonparty deposition re #120 Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion to Expedite by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Wally Adeyemo(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Leah Bray(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Yolanda Byrd(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Elvis M Chan(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Subhan Cheema(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Christy Choi(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Laura Dehmlow(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Jay Dempsey(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party U S Election Assistance Commission(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Rob Flaherty(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party U S Food & Drug Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Alexis Frisbie(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Kate Galatas(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Kristin Galemore(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Geoffrey Hale(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Mina Hsiang(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Clarke Humphrey(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Erica Jefferson(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Brad Kimberly(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Daniel Kimmage(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Tericka Lambert(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Timothy W Manning(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Matthew Masterson(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Lorena Molina-Irizarry(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Janell Muhammed(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Michael Murray(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Kristen Muthig(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Joshua Peck(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Lauren Protentis(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Dana Remus(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Mark A Robbins(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Laura Rosenberger(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Courtney Rowe(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Dori Salcido(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Zachary Henry Schwartz(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Brian Scully(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Aisha Shah(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Andrew Slavitt(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Allison Snell(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party U S Dept of State(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Samaruddin K Stewart(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party U S Dept of Treasury(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Benjamin Wakana(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Eric Waldo(pty:dft), Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Kim Wyman(pty:dft))(aty,Sur, Indraneel) Modified on 11/22/2022 (Thomas, T).
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #122 Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess Pages Limit. Defendants are granted leave to file a brief of up to 80 pages in support of their Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/22/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 22, 2022 Filing 122 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Snow, Kyla)
November 22, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #122 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 22, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #124 MOTION for adjournment of nonparty deposition re #120 Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion to Expedite , #125 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing to Address Fifth Circuit's NonDispositive Order with consent . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 21, 2022 Filing 121 USCA MEMORANDUM ORDER that the district court enter an order that addresses the issues of the availability of suitable alternative sources for the evidence sought in the proposed depositions and whether further discovery should be paused until a ruling on a timely-filed motion by the Government to dismiss. (USCA #22-30697)IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the depositions are stayed pending further order of this court. The motion for a stay pending disposition of the Government's mandamus petition is DENIED. We make no ruling on the petition for a writ of mandamus at this time. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #119 Motion to Expedite Ruling; denying #119 Motion to Quash and the Alternative Request to Stay the Deposition. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/21/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 18, 2022 Filing 119 MOTION to Quash filed as a NOTICE by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman REGARDING RULE 45(f) TRANSFER OF MOTIONS TO QUASH AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING ON MOTIONS TO QUASH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Psaki Motion to Quash, #2 Exhibit U.S. Motion to Quash, #3 Exhibit Respondents' Combined Opposition, #4 Exhibit U.S. Reply, #5 Exhibit Psaki Reply, #6 Exhibit EDVA Transfer, #7 Proposed order)(aty,Kirschner, Adam) Modified on 11/21/2022 (Bunting, M). Added MOTION to Expedite on 11/21/2022 (Bunting, M). Modified event and to add additional relief requested on 11/21/2022 (Bunting, M).
November 17, 2022 Filing 118 MOTION to Intervene with opposition by Charlene Bollinger, Robert F Kennedy, Jr., Joseph Mercola. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Exhibit Declaration, #4 Exhibit Declaration, #5 Proposed order Proposed Order)(Attorney Glynn Shelly Maturin, II added to party Charlene Bollinger(pty:mov), Attorney Glynn Shelly Maturin, II added to party Robert F Kennedy, Jr.(pty:mov), Attorney Glynn Shelly Maturin, II added to party Joseph Mercola(pty:mov))(aty,Maturin, Glynn)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part #110 Motion for Protective Order. It Is Further Ordered that #111 Memorandum Order is Vacated. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/17/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 17, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #118 MOTION to Intervene with opposition . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 17, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #118 MOTION to Intervene with opposition . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 15, 2022 Filing 116 REPLY to Response to Motion re #110 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Audiovisual Recordings of Depositions and Personally Identifiable Information in Deposition Transcripts and Request for Expedited Consideration, MOTION to Expedite filed by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Revised Proposed Order Exhibit A (Revised Proposed Protective Order))(aty,Chuzi, Amanda)
November 15, 2022 Filing 115 USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE (certified copy) as to #63 Notice of Appeal, #65 Amended Notice of Appeal and #66 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Mike Webb that under 5th Cir. R. 42.3, the appeal is DISMISSED as of November 15, 2022, for want of prosecution. The appellant failed to timely file the appellants brief. (USCA #22-30531) (crt,WalkerSld, B)
November 14, 2022 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #110 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Audiovisual Recordings of Depositions and Personally Identifiable Information in Deposition Transcripts and Request for Expedited Consideration, MOTION to Expedite filed by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Sauer, Dean)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #95 Motion for Reconsideration re #90 Memorandum Order, Regarding the Deposition of Elvis Chan. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/14/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 10, 2022 Filing 112 REPLY to Response to Motion re #95 Motion for Reconsideration re #90 Memorandum Order, Regarding the Deposition of Elvis Chan filed by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. (aty,Sur, Indraneel)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Motion to Expedite temporarily to allow briefing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a response to the Motion on Monday, November 14, 2022, before 12:00 p.m. Defendants may file a reply no later than November 15, 2022, at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/10/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 10, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #110 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Audiovisual Recordings of Depositions and Personally Identifiable Information in Deposition Transcripts and Request for Expedited Consideration. Responses due by 11/14/2022. Replies due by 11/15/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 9, 2022 Filing 110 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Audiovisual Recordings of Depositions and Personally Identifiable Information in Deposition Transcripts and Request for Expedited Consideration by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order Exhibit A (Proposed Protective Order))(aty,Chuzi, Amanda). Added MOTION to Expedite on 11/9/2022 (Miletello, A).
November 9, 2022 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Chuzi on behalf of Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman (Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Wally Adeyemo(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Leah Bray(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Yolanda Byrd(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party U S Census Bureau(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Elvis M Chan(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Subhan Cheema(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Christy Choi(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party U S Dept of Commerce(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Carol Crawford(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Laura Dehmlow(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Jay Dempsey(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Jen Easterly(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party U S Election Assistance Commission(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Anthony Fauci(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Rob Flaherty(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party U S Food & Drug Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Alexis Frisbie(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Kate Galatas(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Kristin Galemore(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Geoffrey Hale(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Mina Hsiang(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Clarke Humphrey(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Nina Jankowicz(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Karine Jean-Pierre(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Erica Jefferson(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Brad Kimberly(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Daniel Kimmage(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Tericka Lambert(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Timothy W Manning(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Matthew Masterson(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Gina McCarthy(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Lorena Molina-Irizarry(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Janell Muhammed(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Michael Murray(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Vivek H Murthy(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Kristen Muthig(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Joshua Peck(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Lauren Protentis(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Jennifer Rene Psaki(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Dana Remus(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Mark A Robbins(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Laura Rosenberger(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Courtney Rowe(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Dori Salcido(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Zachary Henry Schwartz(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Brian Scully(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Aisha Shah(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Jennifer Shopkorn(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Robert Silvers(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Andrew Slavitt(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Allison Snell(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party U S Dept of State(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Samaruddin K Stewart(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party U S Dept of Treasury(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Samantha Vinograd(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Benjamin Wakana(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Eric Waldo(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Chuzi added to party Kim Wyman(pty:dft)) (aty,Chuzi, Amanda)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Extension. Defendants shall file Motion to Dismiss by November 22, 2022. Plaintiffs shall file their response by December 29, 2022. Defendants shall file their reply in support by January 18, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 11/9/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
November 9, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #110 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Audiovisual Recordings of Depositions and Personally Identifiable Information in Deposition Transcripts and Request for Expedited Consideration, MOTION to Expedite. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 8, 2022 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Kirschner on behalf of Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman (Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Wally Adeyemo(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Leah Bray(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Yolanda Byrd(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party U S Census Bureau(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Elvis M Chan(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Subhan Cheema(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Christy Choi(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party U S Dept of Commerce(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Carol Crawford(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Laura Dehmlow(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Jay Dempsey(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Jen Easterly(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party U S Election Assistance Commission(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Anthony Fauci(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Rob Flaherty(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party U S Food & Drug Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Alexis Frisbie(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Kate Galatas(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Kristin Galemore(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Geoffrey Hale(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Mina Hsiang(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Clarke Humphrey(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Nina Jankowicz(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Karine Jean-Pierre(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Erica Jefferson(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Brad Kimberly(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Daniel Kimmage(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Tericka Lambert(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Timothy W Manning(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Matthew Masterson(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Gina McCarthy(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Lorena Molina-Irizarry(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Janell Muhammed(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Michael Murray(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Vivek H Murthy(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Kristen Muthig(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Joshua Peck(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Lauren Protentis(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Jennifer Rene Psaki(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Dana Remus(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Mark A Robbins(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Laura Rosenberger(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Courtney Rowe(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Dori Salcido(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Zachary Henry Schwartz(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Brian Scully(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Aisha Shah(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Jennifer Shopkorn(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Robert Silvers(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Andrew Slavitt(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Allison Snell(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party U S Dept of State(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Samaruddin K Stewart(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party U S Dept of Treasury(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Samantha Vinograd(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Benjamin Wakana(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Eric Waldo(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Kirschner added to party Kim Wyman(pty:dft)) (aty,Kirschner, Adam)
November 7, 2022 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #95 Motion for Reconsideration re #90 Memorandum Order, Regarding the Deposition of Elvis Chan filed by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(aty,Sauer, Dean)
November 7, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #105 Motion for Extension (Other), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #105 Motion for Extension (Other).(Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/3/2022.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Whitener, M)
November 3, 2022 Filing 105 JOINT MOTION to Extend Motion to Dismiss Deadline by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman, Jayanta Bhattacharya,Martin Kulldorff, Aaron Kheriaty, Jill Hines, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (aty,Cholera, Kuntal) Modified to add filers on 11/3/2022 (Thomas, T). Modified to more accurately capture pleading on 11/7/2022 (Whitener, M).
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #92 Corrected Motion for Partial Stay of October 21, 2022 Order Pending Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/2/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 1, 2022 Filing 103 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT re #100 Memorandum in Opposition, entitled Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Depositions Pending Writ of Mandamus filed by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri . (aty,Sauer, Dean) Modified to add docket entry relationship on 11/1/2022 (Thomas, T).
November 1, 2022 Filing 102 REPLY to Response to Motion re #92 CORRECTED MOTION to Stay re #90 Memorandum Order filed by Joseph R Biden, Jr. (aty,Sur, Indraneel)
October 31, 2022 Filing 101 NOTICE of Deficiency to Dean John Sauer on behalf of Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri regarding #100 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. Reason: A table of contents and table of cases, statutes and other authorities is required for a brief which exceeds ten pages. Please see LR7.8 for specific requirements regarding table of contents. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 31, 2022 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #92 CORRECTED MOTION to Stay re #90 Memorandum Order filed by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (aty,Sauer, Dean) Modified to reflect deficiency on 10/31/2022 (Thomas, T). Modified to indicate table of contents/table of authorities filed as document 1103 on 11/1/2022 (Thomas, T).
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Extension of Deadline. Plaintiffs shall take any authorized depositions by 12/9/22. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 10/31/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE ENTRY: re #95 Motion for Reconsideration re #90 Memorandum Order, Regarding the Deposition of Elvis Chan. Plaintiffs' Response due by 11/7/2022. Defendants may file a reply three days thereafter. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 10/31/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 31, 2022 Filing 97 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #95 Motion for Reconsideration re #90 Memorandum Order, Regarding the Deposition of Elvis Chan. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Responses due by 11/21/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 31, 2022 APPEAL REMARK: USCA Writ of Mandamus filed by Petitioners Ms. Jen Easterly, Mr. Rob Flaherty and Mr. Vivek H. Murthy. Date received in 5th Circuit: 10/28/2022. (USCA #22-30697) (crt,WalkerSld, B)
October 28, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #94 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Depositions Per Order with consent . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 28, 2022 Filing 96 EXHIBIT re #95 MOTION to Amend/Correct #90 Memorandum Order,,, with opposition Seeking Reconsideration Regarding the Deposition of Elvis Chan by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Cholera, Kuntal)
October 28, 2022 Filing 95 MOTION for Reconsideration re #90 Memorandum Order, Regarding the Deposition of Elvis Chan, with opposition by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Cholera, Kuntal) Modified to correct event type and edit docket text on 10/31/2022 (Thomas, T).
October 28, 2022 Filing 94 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Depositions Per Order with consent by Joseph R Biden, Jr. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Sur, Indraneel)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ENTRY: re #92 CORRECTED MOTION to Stay #90 Memorandum Order. Plaintiffs may file a response by 12:00 pm on 10/31/2022. Defendants may reply by 12:00 on 11/1/2022. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 10/28/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 27, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #92 CORRECTED MOTION to Stay re #90 Memorandum Order. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 27, 2022 Filing 92 CORRECTED MOTION to Stay re #90 Memorandum Order by Joseph R Biden, Jr, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Alejandro Mayorkas, Anthony Fauci, Carol Crawford, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Gina McCarthy, Jen Easterly, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Jennifer Shopkorn, Karine Jean-Pierre, Nina Jankowicz, Robert Silvers, Samantha Vinograd, U S Census Bureau, U S Dept of Commerce, ,Vivek H Murthy, Xavier Becerra. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Sur, Indraneel) Modified text and to add filers on 10/28/2022. (Alexander, E)
October 27, 2022 Filing 91 MOTION to Stay , In Part, October 21, 2022 Order Pending Resolution of Petition For Writ of Mandamus, and Memorandum in Support by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Wally Adeyemo(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Leah Bray(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Yolanda Byrd(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Elvis M Chan(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Subhan Cheema(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Christy Choi(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Laura Dehmlow(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Jay Dempsey(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party U S Election Assistance Commission(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Rob Flaherty(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party U S Food & Drug Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Alexis Frisbie(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Kate Galatas(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Kristin Galemore(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Geoffrey Hale(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Mina Hsiang(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Clarke Humphrey(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Erica Jefferson(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Brad Kimberly(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Daniel Kimmage(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Tericka Lambert(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Timothy W Manning(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Matthew Masterson(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Lorena Molina-Irizarry(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Janell Muhammed(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Michael Murray(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Kristen Muthig(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Joshua Peck(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Lauren Protentis(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Dana Remus(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Mark A Robbins(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Laura Rosenberger(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Courtney Rowe(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Dori Salcido(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Zachary Henry Schwartz(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Brian Scully(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Aisha Shah(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Andrew Slavitt(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Allison Snell(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party U S Dept of State(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Samaruddin K Stewart(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party U S Dept of Treasury(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Benjamin Wakana(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Eric Waldo(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Kim Wyman(pty:dft))(aty,Snow, Kyla)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM ORDER REGARDING WITNESS DEPOSITIONS: IT IS ORDERED that to the extent that Plaintiffs move to depose the following parties, the request is GRANTED: NIAID Director and White House Chief Medical Advisor Dr. Anthony Fauci; Deputy Assistant to the President and Director of White House Digital Strategy Rob Flaherty OR former White House Senior COVID-19 Advisory Andrew Slavitt; former White House Press Secretary Jennifer Psaki; FBI Supervisory Special Agent Elvis Chan; CISA Director Jen Easterly OR CISA official Lauren Protentis; Surgeon General Vivek Murthy; CDC Chief of the Digital Media Branch Carol Crawford; and Acting Coordinator of the State Departments Global Engagement Center Daniel Kimmage. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 10/21/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. Status Report due by 11/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 10/19/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
October 18, 2022 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (aty,Sauer, Dean)
October 18, 2022 Filing 87 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report with consent by Wally Adeyemo, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Leah Bray, Yolanda Byrd, U S Census Bureau, Elvis M Chan, Subhan Cheema, Christy Choi, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Laura Dehmlow, Jay Dempsey, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, U S Election Assistance Commission, Anthony Fauci, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Rob Flaherty, U S Food & Drug Administration, Alexis Frisbie, Kate Galatas, Kristin Galemore, Geoffrey Hale, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Mina Hsiang, Clarke Humphrey, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Erica Jefferson, U S Dept of Justice, Brad Kimberly, Daniel Kimmage, Tericka Lambert, Timothy W Manning, Matthew Masterson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Janell Muhammed, Michael Murray, Vivek H Murthy, Kristen Muthig, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Joshua Peck, Lauren Protentis, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Dana Remus, Mark A Robbins, Laura Rosenberger, Courtney Rowe, Dori Salcido, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Brian Scully, Aisha Shah, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Andrew Slavitt, Allison Snell, U S Dept of State, Samaruddin K Stewart, U S Dept of Treasury, Samantha Vinograd, Benjamin Wakana, Eric Waldo, Kim Wyman. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/18/2022. (Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Wally Adeyemo(pty:dft), Leah Bray(pty:dft), Yolanda Byrd(pty:dft), Elvis M Chan(pty:dft), Subhan Cheema(pty:dft), Christy Choi(pty:dft), Laura Dehmlow(pty:dft), Jay Dempsey(pty:dft), U S Election Assistance Commission(pty:dft), Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Rob Flaherty(pty:dft), U S Food & Drug Administration(pty:dft), Alexis Frisbie(pty:dft), Kate Galatas(pty:dft), Kristin Galemore(pty:dft), Geoffrey Hale(pty:dft), Mina Hsiang(pty:dft), Clarke Humphrey(pty:dft), Erica Jefferson(pty:dft), U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Brad Kimberly(pty:dft), Daniel Kimmage(pty:dft), Tericka Lambert(pty:dft), Timothy W Manning(pty:dft), Matthew Masterson(pty:dft), Lorena Molina-Irizarry(pty:dft), Janell Muhammed(pty:dft), Michael Murray(pty:dft), Kristen Muthig(pty:dft), Joshua Peck(pty:dft), Lauren Protentis(pty:dft), Dana Remus(pty:dft), Mark A Robbins(pty:dft), Laura Rosenberger(pty:dft), Courtney Rowe(pty:dft), Dori Salcido(pty:dft), Zachary Henry Schwartz(pty:dft), Brian Scully(pty:dft), Aisha Shah(pty:dft), Andrew Slavitt(pty:dft), Allison Snell(pty:dft), U S Dept of State(pty:dft), Samaruddin K Stewart(pty:dft), U S Dept of Treasury(pty:dft), Benjamin Wakana(pty:dft), Eric Waldo(pty:dft), Kim Wyman(pty:dft))(aty,Cholera, Kuntal) Modified on 10/19/2022 to modify docket text (Leday, A).
October 14, 2022 Filing 86 NOTICE of Joint Statement Regarding Witness Depositions by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Jim Hoft, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Census Bureau, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, Anthony Fauci, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Vivek H Murthy, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Samantha Vinograd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(aty,Sauer, Dean) Modified to add filers on 10/17/2022 (Chavis, J).
October 13, 2022 Filing 85 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Andrew Slavitt, Rob Flaherty, Courtney Rowe, Clarke Humphrey, Benjamin Wakana, Subhan Cheema, Dori Salcido, Timothy W Manning, Dana Remus, Aisha Shah, Laura Rosenberger, Mina Hsiang, U S Dept of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Laura Dehmlow, Elvis M Chan, Jay Dempsey, Kate Galatas, Eric Waldo, Yolanda Byrd, Christy Choi, Tericka Lambert, Joshua Peck, Janell Muhammed, Matthew Masterson, Lauren Protentis, Geoffrey Hale, Allison Snell, Kim Wyman, Brian Scully, Zachary Henry Schwartz, Lorena Molina-Irizarry, Kristin Galemore, U S Food & Drug Administration, Erica Jefferson, Michael Murray, Brad Kimberly, U S Dept of State, Leah Bray, Samaruddin K Stewart, Daniel Kimmage, Alexis Frisbie, U S Dept of Treasury, Wally Adeyemo, U S Election Assistance Commission, Mark A Robbins, Kristen Muthig. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 6, 2022 Filing 84 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Martin Kulldorff, State of Louisiana, Aaron Kheriaty, State of Missouri, Jill Hines, Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jim Hoft. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P, #2 Exhibit Q)(aty,Sauer, Dean) Modified on 10/13/2022 (Thomas, T).
September 30, 2022 ELECTRONICALLY CERTIFIED Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #63 Notice of Appeal, #65 Amended Notice of Appeal and #66 Amended Notice of Appeal is now available to Appellate Counsel via the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals website. See Instructions for Access and Use of the Electronic Record Download Feature of CM/ECF by clicking #here. (USCA #22-30531) If you do not have access to the Electronic Download Feature of CM/ECF, please submit your request for the certified record on appeal to the District Court. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
September 22, 2022 Filing 83 NOTICE of Claims and Liens upon Judgment by Judson Witham (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying #80 Motion for Demand of Equal Treatment and to Stop Discrimination; denying #80 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/16/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ELECTRONIC ORDER mooting #79 Motion. The information the movant seeks is already part of the public record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 9/16/2022. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
September 15, 2022 Filing 80 MOTION for Demand of Equal Treatment and to Stop Discrimination, MOTION for Recusal (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/15/2022.) by Judson Witham. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
September 15, 2022 Filing 79 MOTION for Demand of Equal Treatment and Equity by Judson Witham. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
September 15, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #80 MOTION for Demand of Equal Treatment and to Stop Discrimination MOTION for Recusal. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying #76 Motion for Divulgence of Judicial Conflicts of Interests. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/14/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/13/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 13, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #75 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
September 12, 2022 Filing 76 MOTION for Divulgence of Judicial Conflicts of Interests by Judson Witham. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
September 12, 2022 Filing 75 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal by Mike Webb. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,WalkerSld, B) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2022: #3 Proposed Order) (WalkerSld, B).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Motion to Stay Answer Deadlines. Defendants deadline to respond to the First Amended Complaint is STAYED. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs forthcoming Second Amended Complaint is also STAYED. The parties shall file, within fourteen days of the filing of the Second AmendedComplaint, a joint status report proposing a schedule for motion to dismiss briefing with respect to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 9/12/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 7, 2022 Filing 73 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Response Deadlines for Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint and Anticipated Second Amended Complaint by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Census Bureau, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, Anthony Fauci, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Vivek H Murthy, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Samantha Vinograd. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/7/2022. (aty,Cholera, Kuntal)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM RULING re #71 Joint Statement on Discovery Disputes. The discovery disputes contained in the Joint Statement herein are granted in part and denied in part. Any additional discovery ordered herein shall be provided within 21 days from the date of this order. It Is Further Ordered that within ten days after the production of any objected-to responses, Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants of any depositions they wish to take. It Is Further Ordered that Plaintiffs and Defendants continue to adhere to the remaining schedule for expedited discovery. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/6/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 31, 2022 Filing 71 JOINT STATEMENT on Discovery Disputes by All Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Defendants Interrogatory Responses, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Census-Treasury-State, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 White House, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 Facebook Executive, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 Text Messages, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 BOLO, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 Approval of Debunks, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 CISA and Flagging, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 Reporting Channels, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 KJP RFP Responses, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11 Fauci RFP Responses, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12 Aug 27 Email from DOJ, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13 HHS RFP Responses)(aty,Sauer, Dean) Modified on 8/31/2022 to add filers and modify docket text (Miletello, A).
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension. The parties' Joint Statement shall be filed by 3:00 pm on 8/31/22. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/29/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #45 Amended Complaint. Xavier Becerra answer due 9/13/2022; Joseph R Biden, Jr answer due 9/13/2022; U S Census Bureau answer due 9/13/2022; U S Dept of Commerce answer due 9/13/2022; Carol Crawford answer due 9/13/2022; Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency answer due 9/13/2022; Centers for Disease Control & Prevention answer due 9/13/2022; Jen Easterly answer due 9/13/2022; Anthony Fauci answer due 9/13/2022; Dept of Health & Human Services answer due 9/13/2022; Dept of Homeland Security answer due 9/13/2022; Nina Jankowicz answer due 9/13/2022; Karine Jean-Pierre answer due 9/13/2022; Alejandro Mayorkas answer due 9/13/2022; Gina McCarthy answer due 9/13/2022; Vivek H Murthy answer due 9/13/2022; National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases answer due 9/13/2022; Jennifer Shopkorn answer due 9/13/2022; Robert Silvers answer due 9/13/2022; Samantha Vinograd answer due 9/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 8/26/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
August 26, 2022 Filing 68 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Statement with consent by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Census Bureau, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, Anthony Fauci, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Vivek H Murthy, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, All Plaintiffs, Samantha Vinograd. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Snow, Kyla) Modified to add filers on 8/26/2022 (Thomas, T).
August 26, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #68 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Statement with consent . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 23, 2022 Filing 67 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Census Bureau, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, Anthony Fauci, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Vivek H Murthy, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Samantha Vinograd. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Snow, Kyla)
August 19, 2022 USCA Case Number 22-30531 for #63 Notice of Appeal, #65 Amended Notice of Appeal and #66 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Mike Webb. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
August 17, 2022 Filing 64 FEE LETTER requesting payment of appeal filing fee sent to Mike Webb re #63 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(crt,WalkerSld, B)
August 16, 2022 Filing 66 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #43 Order on Motion to Intervene, by Mike Webb, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,WalkerSld, B) (Main Document 66 replaced and Attachment 1 replaced on 8/17/2022) (WalkerSld, B).
August 16, 2022 Filing 65 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #43 Order on Motion to Intervene, by Mike Webb, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,WalkerSld, B) (Main Document 65 and Attachment 1 replaced on 8/17/2022) (WalkerSld, B).
August 16, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #43 Order on Motion to Intervene, by Mike Webb, pro se. FEE STATUS: NOT PAID (Attachments: #1 5th Circuit Transmittal Letter)(crt,WalkerSld, B)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of John J Vecchione for Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 8/15/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying #57 Motion for Reconsideration re #42 Order on Motion to Intervene filed by Judson Witham. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/12/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 12, 2022 Filing 59 MOTION for John J. Vecchione to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5212768) by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #57 MOTION for Reconsideration re #42 Order on Motion to Intervene. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Responses due by 9/1/2022 (crt,Whitener, M)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #45 Amended Complaint. Xavier Becerra answer due 8/30/2022; Joseph R Biden, Jr answer due 8/30/2022; U S Census Bureau answer due 8/30/2022; U S Dept of Commerce answer due 8/30/2022; Carol Crawford answer due 8/30/2022; Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency answer due 8/30/2022; Centers for Disease Control & Prevention answer due 8/30/2022; Jen Easterly answer due 8/30/2022; Anthony Fauci answer due 8/30/2022; Dept of Health & Human Services answer due 8/30/2022; Dept of Homeland Security answer due 8/30/2022; Nina Jankowicz answer due 8/30/2022; Karine Jean-Pierre answer due 8/30/2022; Alejandro Mayorkas answer due 8/30/2022; Gina McCarthy answer due 8/30/2022; Vivek H Murthy answer due 8/30/2022; National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases answer due 8/30/2022; Jennifer Rene Psaki answer due 8/30/2022; Jennifer Shopkorn answer due 8/30/2022; Robert Silvers answer due 8/30/2022; Samantha Vinograd answer due 8/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 8/9/2022. (crt,Whitener, M)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jenin Younes for Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 8/8/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
August 8, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Census Bureau, U S Dept of Commerce, Carol Crawford, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, Anthony Fauci, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Nina Jankowicz, Karine Jean-Pierre, Alejandro Mayorkas, Gina McCarthy, Vivek H Murthy, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Jennifer Shopkorn, Robert Silvers, Samantha Vinograd. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Kyla Snow added to party U S Census Bureau(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party U S Dept of Commerce(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Carol Crawford(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Karine Jean-Pierre(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Gina McCarthy(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Jennifer Shopkorn(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Robert Silvers(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Samantha Vinograd(pty:dft))(aty,Snow, Kyla) Modified docket text on 8/8/2022 (Whitener, M).
August 8, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, Anthony Fauci, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Nina Jankowicz, Alejandro Mayorkas, Vivek H Murthy, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Jennifer Rene Psaki (aty,Snow, Kyla)
August 4, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri of Corrected Proof of Service of First Amended Complaint (aty,Sauer, Dean)
August 4, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of Deficiency to Dean John Sauer on behalf of State of Missouri regarding #50 Notice (Other). Reason: For attorneys admitted pro hac vice, signature or endorsement of local counsel is required. Please refer to LR83.2.6 for more specific requirements. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 4, 2022 Filing 50 DEFICIENT NOTICE by State of Missouri of Proof of Service of First Amended Complaint (aty,Sauer, Dean) Modified to reflect deficiency on 8/4/2022 (Thomas, T).
August 3, 2022 Filing 49 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Proposed Order filed by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff regarding #48 MOTION for Jenin Younes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5201495) . (aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
August 3, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION for Jenin Younes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5201495) by Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) Modified filers on 8/3/2022 (Miletello, A).
August 2, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Joinder in Previously Filed Motion for Preliminary Injunction by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri (aty,Sauer, Dean)
August 2, 2022 Filing 46 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Karine Jean-Pierre, Carol Crawford, Jennifer Shopkorn, United States Census Bureau, U S Dept of Commerce, Robert Silvers, Samantha Vinograd, Gina McCarthy. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 2, 2022 Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, Anthony Fauci, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Nina Jankowicz, Alejandro Mayorkas, Vivek H Murthy, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Karine Jean-Pierre, Carol Crawford, Jennifer Shopkorn, United States Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce, Robert Silvers, Samantha Vinograd, Gina McCarthy filed by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, Aaron Kheriaty, Martin Kulldorff, Jim Hoft, Jayanta Bhattacharya, Jill Hines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CDC Emails, #2 Exhibit B - Decl. of Mark Senger, #3 Exhibit C- Decl. of Jay Bhattacharya, #4 Exhibit D - Decl. of Martin Kulldorff, #5 Exhibit E - Decl. of Jim Hoft, #6 Exhibit F - Decl. of Patrick Flesch, #7 Exhibit G - Decl. of Aaron Kheriaty, #8 Exhibit H - Decl. of Jeff Allen, #9 Exhibit I - Decl. of Mark Changizi, #10 Exhibit J - Decl. of Daniel Kotzin, #11 Exhibit K - Decl. of A.J. Kitchen, #12 Exhibit L - Decl. of Jill Hines, #13 Exhibit M - Decl. of Ashley Bosch, #14 Exhibit N - Decl. of Joshua McCollum, #15 Exhibit O - Decl. of Jessica Marie Gulmire)(Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Jayanta Bhattacharya(pty:pla), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Jill Hines(pty:pla), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Jim Hoft(pty:pla), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Aaron Kheriaty(pty:pla), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Martin Kulldorff(pty:pla))(aty,Sauer, Dean)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 8/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 8/2/2022. (crt,Leday, A) Modified on 8/2/2022 to add Reply date of 8/20/22 for same (Leday, A).
August 2, 2022 Per #44 Order - Set Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Complaint. Replies due by 8/20/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #39 and #40 Motions to Intervene. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/1/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #38 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/29/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 29, 2022 Filing 41 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim with consent < by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Sauer, Dean) Modified to add docket entry relationship and edit docket text on 8/1/2022 (Thomas, T).
July 29, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #39 MOTION to Intervene, #40 MOTION to Intervene. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 28, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION to Intervene by Mike Webb. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/28/2022. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 28, 2022 Filing 39 MOTION to Intervene by Kimberly D Hogan. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate, #4 Civil cover sheet, #5 Envelope)(crt,Bunting, M) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2022: #6 Exhibit) (Bunting, M).
July 28, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #38 MOTION to Intervene. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 25, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION to Intervene by Judson Witham. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Intervention, #2 Envelope)(crt,Bunting, M)
July 19, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Compliance with the Court's July 12, 2022 Order by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri (aty,Sauer, Dean)
July 13, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 8/3/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
July 12, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Complaint by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, Anthony Fauci, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Nina Jankowicz, Alejandro Mayorkas, Vivek H Murthy, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Jennifer Rene Psaki. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Snow, Kyla)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER granting #17 Motion to Expedite Preliminary Injunction-Related Discovery. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/12/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 12, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Indraneel Sur on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, Anthony Fauci, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Nina Jankowicz, Alejandro Mayorkas, Vivek H Murthy, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Jennifer Rene Psaki (Attorney Indraneel Sur added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft)) (aty,Sur, Indraneel) Modified to add filers on 7/12/2022 (Thomas, T).
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limitation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/11/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 8, 2022 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, Anthony Fauci, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Nina Jankowicz, Alejandro Mayorkas, Vivek H Murthy, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Jennifer Rene Psaki. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Snow, Kyla)
July 7, 2022 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to #17 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary-Injunction-Related Discovery, filed by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/7/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 6, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #28 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for their Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Expedited Preliminary-Injunction-Related Discovery. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Taylor, L)
July 6, 2022 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for their Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Expedited Preliminary-Injunction-Related Discovery by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Expedited Preliminary Injunction-Related Discovery, #2 Proposed order Proposed Order)(aty,Sauer, Dean)
July 1, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kuntal Cholera on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, Anthony Fauci, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Nina Jankowicz, Alejandro Mayorkas, Vivek H Murthy, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Jennifer Rene Psaki (Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Jen Easterly(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Anthony Fauci(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Nina Jankowicz(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Vivek H Murthy(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Jennifer Rene Psaki(pty:dft)) (aty,Cholera, Kuntal) (Main Document 27 modified to nonfillable form and replaced on 7/1/2022) (Thomas, T).
July 1, 2022 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary-Injunction-Related Discovery filed by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, Anthony Fauci, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Nina Jankowicz, Alejandro Mayorkas, Vivek H Murthy, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Jennifer Rene Psaki. (aty,Cholera, Kuntal)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Kenneth C Capps for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/27/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Todd A Scott for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/24/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
June 24, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Kenneth C. Capps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5152223) by State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
June 23, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Todd A. Scott to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5150235) by State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
June 22, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY: Defendants' Response as to #17 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary-Injunction-Related Discovery is due by 7/1/2022. Plaintiffs may file a reply no later than five days thereafter. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 6/22/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 21, 2022 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri re #17 Motion to Expedite,. (aty,Sauer, Dean)
June 21, 2022 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY continuing Defendants' deadline to file a response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction until after resolution of the pending discovery motion. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 6/21/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 17, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #17 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary-Injunction-Related Discovery. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 17, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary-Injunction-Related Discovery filed by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (aty,Sauer, Dean)
June 17, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary-Injunction-Related Discovery by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/17/2022. (Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party State of Louisiana(pty:pla))(aty,Sauer, Dean)
June 15, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyla Snow on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Jen Easterly, Anthony Fauci, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dept of Homeland Security, Nina Jankowicz, Alejandro Mayorkas, Vivek H Murthy, National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases, Jennifer Rene Psaki (Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Jen Easterly(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Anthony Fauci(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Nina Jankowicz(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Vivek H Murthy(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases(pty:dft), Attorney Kyla Snow added to party Jennifer Rene Psaki(pty:dft)) (aty,Snow, Kyla)
June 15, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 6/15/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 14, 2022 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri re #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,. (aty,Sauer, Dean)
June 14, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY: Defendants' Response as to #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is due by 6/28/2022. Plaintiffs may file a reply no later than seven days thereafter. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 6/14/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 14, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Overlength Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party State of Louisiana(pty:pla))(aty,Sauer, Dean) Modified on 6/14/2022 (Thomas, T).
June 14, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Decl. of Tammy Glenn, #2 Exhibit B-Decl. of Mark Senger, #3 Exhibit C-Decl. of Jay Bhattacharya, #4 Exhibit D-Decl. of Martin Kulldorff, #5 Exhibit E-Decl. of Jim Hoft, #6 Exhibit F-Decl. of Patrick Flesch, #7 Exhibit G-Decl. of Aaron Kheriaty, #8 Exhibit H-Decl. of Jeff Allen, #9 Exhibit I-Decl. of Mark Changizi, #10 Exhibit J-Decl. of Daniel Kotzin, #11 Exhibit K-Decl. of A.J. Kitchen, #12 Exhibit L-Decl. of Jill Hines, #13 Exhibit M-Decl. of Ashley Bosch, #14 Exhibit N-Decl. of Joshua McCollum, #15 Exhibit O-Decl. of Jessica Marie Gulmire)(Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party State of Louisiana(pty:pla))(aty,Sauer, Dean)
June 14, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #11 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Joseph R. Biden, Jr., in his official capacity as President of the United States, et al. on May 10, 2022 and May 27, 2022, filed by State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(aty,Sauer, Dean)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michael Talent for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/2/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of D John Sauer for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/2/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
June 1, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Michael Talent to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5124394) by State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for D. John Sauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5124378) by State of Missouri. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Joseph R Biden, Jr. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 6, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Jennifer Rene Psaki, Vivek H. Murthy, Xavier Becerra, Dept of Health & Human Services, Dr. Anthony Fauci, National Institute of Allergy and Infectious Diseases, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Alejandro Mayorkas, Dept of Homeland Security, Jen Easterly, Jen Easterly, Nina Jankowicz. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5093842) filed by State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Louisiana(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Missouri(pty:pla))(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Thomas, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Missouri et al v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Kenneth C Capps
Represented By: Michael E Talent
Represented By: Todd Scott
Represented By: Charles F Capps
Represented By: Joshua M Divine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Tracy L Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Kheriaty
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Jenin Younes
Represented By: John J Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Martin Kulldorff
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Hoft
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayanta Bhattacharya
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Jenin Younes
Represented By: John J Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Hines
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Jenin Younes
Represented By: John J Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Kulldorff
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Jenin Younes
Represented By: John J Vecchione
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R Biden, Jr
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Rene Psaki
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivek H. Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Health & Human Services
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Anthony Fauci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Institute of Allergy and Infectious Diseases
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Disease Control & Prevention
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Homeland Security
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jen Easterly
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Jankowicz
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivek H Murthy
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Fauci
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karine Jean-Pierre
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Crawford
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Shopkorn
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Census Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Silvers
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Vinograd
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina McCarthy
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Census Bureau
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Commerce
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Slavitt
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Flaherty
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Rowe
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarke Humphrey
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Wakana
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subhan Cheema
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dori Salcido
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy W Manning
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Remus
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aisha Shah
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Rosenberger
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mina Hsiang
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Justice
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Dehmlow
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvis M Chan
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Dempsey
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Galatas
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Waldo
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Byrd
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Choi
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tericka Lambert
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Peck
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janell Muhammed
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Masterson
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Protentis
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Hale
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Snell
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Wyman
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Scully
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Henry Schwartz
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorena Molina-Irizarry
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Galemore
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Food & Drug Administration
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Jefferson
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Murray
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Kimberly
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of State
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Bray
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samaruddin K Stewart
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Kimmage
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Frisbie
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Treasury
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wally Adeyemo
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Election Assistance Commission
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Robbins
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Muthig
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Kyla Snow
Represented By: Adam Kirschner
Represented By: Amanda Chuzi
Represented By: Indraneel Sur
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Judson Witham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kimberly D Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mike Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charlene Bollinger
Represented By: Glynn Shelly Maturin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert F Kennedy, Jr
Represented By: Glynn Shelly Maturin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Mercola
Represented By: Glynn Shelly Maturin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?