G B Sciences Louisiana L L C v. Airgas U S A L L C et al
Plaintiff: GB SCIENCES LOUISIANA, LLC and G B Sciences Louisiana L L C
Defendant: AIRGAS USA, LLC, Airgas U S A L L C and Midsouth Airgas USA L L C
Case Number: 3:2023cv01523
Filed: October 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond #22 Counterclaim. G B Sciences Louisiana L L C answer due 1/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 12/22/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 20, 2023 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Airgas U S A L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibt A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit A3, #5 Exhibit B)(crt,Leday, A)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 12/20/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
December 20, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by G B Sciences Louisiana L L C. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Woodard, Russell) Modified to correct event type on 12/20/2023 (Thomas, T).
December 18, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Airgas U S A L L C. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Opposition in Excess of Page Limit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading: Opposition to Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit A-1, #6 Exhibit A-2, #7 Exhibit A-3, #8 Exhibit B)(aty,Balhoff, John) Modified to remove duplicate text on 12/19/2023 (Thomas, T).
December 18, 2023 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against G B Sciences Louisiana L L C by Airgas U S A L L C.(aty,Balhoff, John) Modified on 12/19/2023 (Thomas, T).
November 30, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE Certificate of Complete State Court Recor by Airgas U S A L L C re #6 Removal Order . (aty,Balhoff, John)
November 27, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #15 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 12/18/2023.(crt,Thomas, T)
November 27, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by G B Sciences Louisiana L L C. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Exhibit)(aty,Woodard, Russell). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 11/27/2023 (Thomas, T).
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Airgas U S A L L C answer due 12/18/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 11/21/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
November 20, 2023 Filing 20 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth E Foote: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/20/2023. A Status Conference is SET for 1/8/2024 at 1:00 PM by phone before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. The dial in instructions will be emailed to each participant. (crt,Enkey, R)
November 17, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Airgas U S A L L C. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion for Extension)(aty,Balhoff, John) Modified on 11/17/2023 (Thomas, T).
November 16, 2023 Filing 18 WAIVER of Disqualification by Airgas U S A L L C re #16 Notice Concerning Waiver of Judicial Disqualification. (crt,Kiper, C)
November 15, 2023 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Status Conference previously set for 11/15/2023 is RESET for 11/20/2023 at 10:30 AM and will be held by video conference before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Instructions have been emailed to all participants. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 11/15/2023. (crt,Enkey, R)
November 14, 2023 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: With consent by both parties the Status Conference is RESET for 11/15/2023 at 11:30 AM and will be held by video conference before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Instructions have been provided to all parties. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 11/14/2023. (crt,Enkey, R)
November 14, 2023 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The Status Conference previously set for 11/13/2023 is RESET for 11/15/2023 at 10:30 AM and will be held by video conference before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Instructions will be emailed to each participant. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 11/14/2023. (crt,Enkey, R)
November 13, 2023 Filing 9 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Airgas U S A L L C. (aty,Balhoff, John)
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Airgas U S A L L C identifying Corporate Parent Airgas, Inc., Other Affiliate L'Air Liquide S.A. for Airgas U S A L L C. (aty,Balhoff, John)
November 3, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE ENTRY: A Status Conference is SET for 11/13/2023 at 10:00 AM by video conference before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Instructions will be emailed to each participant. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 11/3/2023. (crt,Enkey, R)
November 2, 2023 Filing 17 WAIVER of Disqualification by G B Sciences Louisiana L L C re #16 Notice Concerning Waiver of Judicial Disqualification. (crt,Kiper, C)
November 2, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE Concerning Waiver of Judicial Disqualification sent to all counsel of record. (crt,Kiper, C)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 10/31/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
October 30, 2023 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/30/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 30, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to John T Balhoff, II, on behalf of Airgas U S A L L C, and Russell A Woodard, Jr on behalf of G B Sciences Louisiana L L C. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 11/13/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 30, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to John T Balhoff, II on behalf of Airgas U S A L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/13/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 30, 2023 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 26, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of List of Parties and Pleadings Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(b) by Airgas U S A L L C re #1 Notice of Removal. (aty,Balhoff, John) Modified on 10/30/2023 (Thomas, T).
October 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Lincoln, Case Number C-63379 A (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5739446) filed by Airgas U S A L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Petition for TRO, Injunction & Ordinary Claims, #3 Exhibit B - Order granting Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit C - Temporary Restraining Order to Airgas, #5 Exhibit D - Temporary Restraining Order to Midsouth, #6 Exhibit E - Rule to Show Cause to Airgas, #7 Exhibit F - Rule to Show Cause to Midsouth, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Hearing, #9 Exhibit H - Deposit Receipt for Bond Deposit)(Attorney John T Balhoff, II added to party AIRGAS USA, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Balhoff, John) Modified on 10/30/2023 (Thomas, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G B Sciences Louisiana L L C v. Airgas U S A L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GB SCIENCES LOUISIANA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G B Sciences Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Russell A Woodard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRGAS USA, LLC
Represented By: John T Balhoff, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airgas U S A L L C
Represented By: John T Balhoff, II
Represented By: Curtis James Case
Represented By: James M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midsouth Airgas USA L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?