Williams v. Richland Parish Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Samuel L Williams
Defendant: Richland Parish Detention Center, Allen Cupp, Tyler Wade and Killee Miller
Case Number: 3:2023cv01637
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER mooting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The undersigned has already issued an order allowing Plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/5/2024. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
December 27, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allen Cupp, Tyler Wade filed by Samuel L Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
December 20, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel L Williams. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope, #3 Proposed order)(crt,Devillier, W)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint within 30 days of the filing of this Order to cure the deficiencies outlined. Plaintiff shall dismiss any claims that he is unable to cure through amendment. Plaintiff shall also notify the Court of any change in his address. Pro Se Response due by 1/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 12/13/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 12/7/2023. (crt,Devillier, W)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Accounts Officer Page filed by Samuel L Williams regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Taylor, L)
December 1, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 1 MOTION Transfer to Another Facility. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/1/2023. (crt,Taylor, L)
December 1, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/1/2023. (crt,Taylor, L)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 12/21/2023). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 11/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(crt,Leday, A)
November 20, 2023 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/20/2023. (crt,Devillier, W)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel L Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Devillier, W) Motion/Application not on approved form.
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Transfer to Another Facility by Samuel L Williams. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture motion relief requested within pdf of Doc 1 Complaint (see Page 6). (crt,Devillier, W) Modified to assign document number on 11/20/2023 (Devillier, W).
November 16, 2023 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Devillier, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Richland Parish Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel L Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland Parish Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Killee Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?