Clement et al v. Lumen Health Care Benefit Plan et al
Plaintiff: James and Corrine Clement, James Clement and Corrine Clement
Defendant: United HealthCare Services Inc, Lumen Health Care Benefit Plan and Lumen Employee Benefits Committee
Case Number: 3:2024cv00104
Filed: January 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Lumen Employee Benefits Committee, Lumen Health Care Benefit Plan.(aty,King, Errol)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent , #1 Notice of Removal,. Lumen Employee Benefits Committee answer due 3/8/2024; Lumen Health Care Benefit Plan answer due 3/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/6/2024. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
March 6, 2024 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lumen Employee Benefits Committee, Lumen Health Care Benefit Plan identifying other affiliate, Lumen Technologies Inc for Lumen Employee Benefits Committee, Lumen Health Care Benefit Plan. (aty,King, Errol) Modified on 3/6/2024 to add other affiliate and modify docket text.(Crick, S).
March 4, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Errol J King, Jr on behalf of Lumen Employee Benefits Committee, Lumen Health Care Benefit Plan. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/18/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
March 4, 2024 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent by Lumen Employee Benefits Committee, Lumen Health Care Benefit Plan. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Errol J King, Jr added to party Lumen Employee Benefits Committee(pty:dft), Attorney Errol J King, Jr added to party Lumen Health Care Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(aty,King, Errol)
February 22, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lumen Employee Benefits Committee, Lumen Health Care Benefit Plan. (crt,Crick, S)
February 21, 2024 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Lumen Employee Benefits Committee answer due 2/28/2024; Lumen Health Care Benefit Plan answer due 2/28/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #1 to #7 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Crick, S)
February 21, 2024 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by United HealthCare Services Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Additional State Court Records)(aty,Crousillac, Taylor)
February 21, 2024 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lumen Health Care Benefit Plan, requested by James Clement. (aty,Street, Daniel)
February 21, 2024 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lumen Employee Benefits Committee, requested by James Clement. (aty,Street, Daniel)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 2/1/2024. (crt,Leday, A)
February 1, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United HealthCare Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Inc for United HealthCare Services Inc. (aty,King, Errol)
February 1, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by United HealthCare Services Inc.(aty,King, Errol)
January 26, 2024 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/26/2024. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 26, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Kevin William Welsh on behalf of United HealthCare Services Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/9/2024. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 25, 2024 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. United HealthCare Services Inc answer due 2/1/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 25, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 25, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC Ouachita, Case Number C-20234497-CV2 (Filing fee $405, receipt number CLAWDC-5836842) filed by United HealthCare Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 4th JDC Petition, #3 Exhibit B - United Healthcare Services, Inc Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff's Counsel)(Attorney Kevin William Welsh added to party United HealthCare Services Inc(pty:selreq))(aty,Welsh, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clement et al v. Lumen Health Care Benefit Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services Inc
Represented By: Kevin William Welsh
Represented By: Errol J King, Jr
Represented By: Taylor James Crousillac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumen Health Care Benefit Plan
Represented By: Errol J King, Jr
Represented By: Taylor James Crousillac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumen Employee Benefits Committee
Represented By: Errol J King, Jr
Represented By: Taylor James Crousillac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James and Corrine Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Clement
Represented By: Daniel Randolph Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corrine Clement
Represented By: Daniel Randolph Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?