Landry-Bell v. Various Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Shelly Landry-Bell alleges that defendant Zach Wilhelm harassed her by posting plaintiff's photos with lewd and obscene text on defendant Various, Inc.'s websites.

Plaintiff: Shelly Landry-Bell
Defendant: Various Inc and Zach Wilhelm
Case Number: 5:2005cv01526
Filed: August 26, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: Tom Stagg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58
ORDER granting 57 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss claims against Various Inc with prejudice with each party bearing their respective costs. Signed by Judge Mark L Hornsby on September 17, 2007. (crt,Dean, S)
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56
90 DAY ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/22/07. (crt,Brown, A)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 52 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Mark L Hornsby on August 10, 2007. (crt,Dean, S)
August 9, 2007 Filing 54
PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Zach Wilhelm re 52 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. (aty,Odom, John)
August 7, 2007 Filing 51
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding 50 MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Sanctions. Motion day set for 9/4/2007 before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Smith, C)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/18/2008 09:30 AM before Judge Tom Stagg. Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2008 10:30 AM before Judge Tom Stagg. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 12/14/2007. Witness List due by 12/14/2007. Discovery due by 1/31/2008. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 1/31/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2008. Expert Depositions due by 2/29/2008. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 6/18/2008. Motions in Limine due by 7/3/2008. Pretrial Order due by 7/8/2008. Trial Depositions due by 7/28/2008. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 8/8/2008.. Signed by Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/30/07. (crt,Joffrion, B)
July 6, 2007 Filing 48
ANSWER to Complaint by Zach Wilhelm.(aty,Odom, John)
June 22, 2007 Filing 47
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelly Landry-Bell. Zach Wilhelm served on 6/19/2007, answer due 7/9/2007. (crt,Smith, C)
May 24, 2007 Filing 46
MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Mark L Hornsby : STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/24/2007. Magistrate Judge Status Conference set for 7/30/2007 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Smith, C)
May 10, 2007 Filing 45
SUMMONS REISSUED as to Zach Wilhelm. (crt,Smith, C)
December 6, 2006 Filing 44
MINUTES: A STATUS CONFERENCE was held before Magistrate Judge Mark Hornsby on 12/6/2006. A followup Status Conference is set for 5/24/2007 at 01:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Hornsby to review the status of the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Hornsby on December 6, 2006. (crt,Cassanova, M)
October 16, 2006 Filing 43
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMO TO THE COURT REGARDING STATUS filed by Shelly Landry-Bell in Response to 40 Minutes of Scheduling Conference. (crt,Wormser, C)
September 14, 2006 Filing 42
MINUTE ENTRY: Scheduling Conference RESCHEDULED for 12/6/2006 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Signed by Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/14/06. (crt,Brown, A)
September 13, 2006 Filing 41
MEMO TO THE COURT REGARDING STATUS filed by Shelly Landry-Bell in Response to 40 Minutes of Scheduling Conference (crt,Wormser, C)
June 29, 2006 Filing 40
MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Mark L Hornsby : SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/29/2006. Magistrate Judge Status Conference set for 9/28/2006 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Brown, A)
June 27, 2006 Filing 39
RESPONSE Memorandum by Various Inc re 35 Rule 26(f) Report. (aty,Rothken, Ira)
June 23, 2006 Filing 38
CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Signature page and Certificate of Service filed by Shelly Landry-Bell regarding 35 Rule 26(f) Report. (crt,Brown, A)
June 22, 2006 Filing 36
NOTICE of Deficiency to David A Szwak on behalf of Shelly Landry-Bell re: Rule 26 F Report submitted on 6/21/06. Reason: The memorandum did not contain an original signature and the document is not accompanied by a signed certificate of service. (crt,Brown, A)
June 21, 2006 Filing 37
MINUTE ENTRY: Scheduling Conference RESET for 6/29/2006 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Signed by Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/20/06. (crt,Brown, A)
June 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34
ORDER ADOPTING 32 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 26 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 6/9/06. (crt,Brown, A)
May 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33
ORDER Initial Disclosure due by 6/21/2006. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 6/7/2006. Rule 26 Report due by 6/21/2006. Scheduling Conference set for 6/28/2006 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby.Signed by Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/2/06. (crt,Brown, A) Modified on 5/5/2006 to correct file date(Brown, A).
April 24, 2006 Filing 32
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 26 MOTION to Strike 24 Answer to Complaint filed by Shelly Landry-Bell. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Motion to Strike Answers and defenses be denied. Objections to R&R due by 5/11/2006. Signed by Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/24/06. (crt,Brown, A)
March 28, 2006 Filing 31
REPLY to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's 26 MOTION to Strike 24 Answers and Defenses Asserted by Various Inc. filed by Shelly Landry-Bell. (crt,Brown, A)
March 22, 2006 Filing 30
AFFIDAVIT re 29 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion - Declaration of Ira P. Rothken by Various Inc. (aty,Rothken, Ira)
March 7, 2006 Filing 28
CORRECTED NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding 26 MOTION to Strike 24 Answer to Complaint. Motion day set for 4/17/2006 before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Brown, A)
February 23, 2006 Filing 25
NOTICE of Change of Address by David A Szwak (crt,Brown, A)
February 21, 2006 Filing 24
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Various Inc.(aty,Rothken, Ira)
February 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 23
MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING 4 Motion to Dismiss filed by Various Inc and rejecting 17 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 2/1/06. (crt,Brown, A)
January 26, 2006 Filing 22
RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Objection to the 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Various Inc, RESPONDING TO PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HORNSBY filed by Various Inc. (aty,Rothken, Ira) Modified on 1/26/2006 to modify text to correspond with actual pleading and to create docket entry relationship to 19 Objection to Report and Recommendation(Whidden, C).
January 24, 2006 Filing 21
CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Table of Authorities filed by Various Inc regarding 19 Objection to Report and Recommendations. (crt,Brown, A)
January 12, 2006 Filing 20
NOTICE of Deficiency to David A Szwak on behalf of Shelly Landry-Bell re: Objection to Report and Recommendation submitted on 1/11/06. Reason: A table of contents is required for a brief which exceeds ten pages. (crt,Brown, A)
January 5, 2006 Filing 18
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelly Landry-Bell. Zach Wilhelm served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006. (crt,Brown, A)
December 27, 2005 Filing 17
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Various Inc. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Motion to Dismiss be granted and that all claims against Various, Inc be dismissed with prejudice. The Evidentiary Objections and Request to Strike (Doc. 11) filed by Various should be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 1/17/2006. Signed by Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/27/05. (crt,Brown, A)
December 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 16
ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Summons and Complaint upon defendant Zach Wilhelm. Plaintiff is permitted until 1/9/2006 to effect service of summons and complaint upon defendant Zach Wilhelm. Signed by Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/9/05. (crt,Brown, A)
December 8, 2005 Filing 15
CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Statement of Consent filed by Shelly Landry-Bell regarding 13 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Effect Service of Summons and Complaint. (crt,Brown, A)
December 2, 2005 Filing 14
NOTICE of Deficiency to David A Szwak on behalf of Shelly Landry-Bell re: Motion for Enlargement of time to Effect Service of Summons upon Defendant submitted on 12/02/05. Reason: Needs statement of consent. (crt,Brown, A)
October 26, 2005 Filing 11
REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) -EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS filed by Various Inc. (aty,Rothken, Ira)
October 3, 2005 Filing 8
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Motion day set for 11/7/2005 before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Brown, A)
September 30, 2005 Filing 5
NOTICE of Deficiency to Ira P Rothken and Bennett L Politz on behalf of Various Inc re: Motion to Dismiss submitted on September 28, 2005. Reason: needs signature of local counsel. (Copy sent to Ira P Rothken via manual fax.) (crt,Whidden, C)
September 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 6
ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Ira P Rothken for Various Inc. Signed by Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/29/05. (crt,Whidden, C)
September 8, 2005 Filing 2
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Various Inc, Zach Wilhelm. (crt,Franklin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landry-Bell v. Various Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Landry-Bell
Represented By: David A Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various Inc
Represented By: Ira P Rothken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Wilhelm
Represented By: John S Odom, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?