Cargo et al v. Kansas City Southern Railway Co
Case Number: 5:2005cv02010
Filed: November 18, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Presiding Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 913 MEMORANDUM RULING re 898 MOTION in Limine To Exclude All Testimony, Evidence And Argument Regarding Comments, Events, Conduct Or Claims That Are Barred By the Statutes of Limitations filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 896 M OTION in Limine To Exclude All Testimony, Evidence, And Argument Regarding Plaintiff's Claims That Have Been Dismissed Or Conceded filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 894 MOTION in Limine Prohibiting All Testimony, Evidenc e and Argument Regarding Allegations, Lawsuits, Settlements or Charges Concerning Claims Other Than Those of The Group 18 Plaintiff Tammye Stinson filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 874 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims o f Group 18 Plaintiff, Tammye Stinson filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 893 MOTION in Limine Regarding Defendant's Net Worth, Gross Revenue and Assets filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 901 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Plaintiff And Her Counsel From Using Documents That Were Not Previously Produced Pursuant To Rule 26 And The Pretrial Scheduling Order Of The Court filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 902 MOTION in Limine To Exclud e All Testimony, Evidence, And Argument Regarding Locations And Departments Of KCSR Other Than The Customer Service Center filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 895 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Plaintiff and Her Counsel From Making A ny Reference To Or Discussing Punitive Damages During Voir Dire or Opening Statement filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 897 MOTION in Limine To Exclude All Testimony, Evidence, And Argument Regarding Alleged Discriminatory Commen ts, Conduct and Events About Which Plaintiff Lacks Personal Knowledge filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 900 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence And Arguments Regarding Alleged Discriminatory Actions That Are Not The Subject Of The Group 18 Plaintiff's Claims filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 899 MOTION in Limine Prohibiting All Testimony, Evidence, And Arguments Regarding Stray Remarks filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 903 MOTI ON in Limine To Preclude Plaintiff And His Counsel From Calling Any Individual Included In Plaintiff's Witness List Who Was Not Disclosed Pursuant To Law And The Court's Scheduling Order As To Group Eighteen filed by Kansas City So uthern Railway Co, 884 MOTION to Strike Exhibits 1, 4, 5, 6, and 7 attached to 882 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 904 MOTION in Limine To Exclude All Testimony, Evidence And Argument Regarding Individuals Who Are Not Similarly Situated To the Group 18 Plaintiff, Tammye Stinson filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 12/04/2014. (crt,McDonnell, D)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 867 MEMORANDUM RULING re 836 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Group 16 Plaintiff, Michelle Holmes filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co; 847 MOTION to Strike Certain Exhibits (2, 3, 4 and 7) Submitted by Group 16 Plaintiff, Michelle Holmes re 843 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co; [856-866] Motions in Limine.Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 06/02/2014. (crt,McDonnell, D)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 833 MEMORANDUM RULING granting 821 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Group 14 Plaintiff, Renee Caldwell filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 01/17/2014. (crt,Yocum, M)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 816 MEMORANDUM RULING re 797 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Group 13 Plaintiff, Kimberly Anderson filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 812 MOTION to Strike Certain Exhibits submitted with 807 Response to Motion and 808 Sealed Documents Particularly Exhibit 7 to Doc. 807 and All Exhibits Filed Under Seal in Doc. 808 filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 10/31/2013. (crt,McDonnell, D)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 782 MEMORANDUM RULING re 745 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Group 12 Plaintiff, Darren Stanley filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 10/01/2012. (crt,McDonnell, D)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 743 MEMORANDUM RULING re 731 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff, Willie Turner's Claims filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 6/25/12. (crt,McDonnell, D)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 737 MEMORANDUM RULING re 721 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Leo Tolbert's Claims filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 05/15/2012. (crt,McDonnell, D)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 733 MEMORANDUM RULING re 710 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Randall Corsentino's Claims filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 05/01/2012. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 723 MEMORANDUM RULING re 705 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff, Timothy Stanley's Claims filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 713 MOTION to Strike Certain Exhibits Submitted by Plaintiff in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment attached to 709 Response to Motion filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 03/22/2012. (crt,McDonnell, D)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 703 MEMORANDUM RULING re 686 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON PLAINTIFF DEREK LAMETTE'S CLAIMS filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 695 MOTION to Strike Exhibit attached to 692 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Exhibit to Plaintiff Derek Lamette's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 1/4/12. (crt,McDonnell, D)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 682 MEMORANDUM RULING re 674 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Eric Allums' Claims filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 10/26/2011. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 668 MEMORANDUM RULING re 621 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff, Leon Sterling's Claims filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 9/2/2011. (crt,McDonnell, D)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 600 MEMORANDUM RULING granting 499 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Jesse Frank's Remaining Claims filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 4/1/2011. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 563 MEMORANDUM RULING denying in part and granting insofar as it precludes Biermann from offering testimony on economic impact upon Plaintiffs 538 DAUBERT MOTION to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert, Leonard Biermann filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 3/18/2011. (crt,McDonnell, D)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 495 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 478 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Lamette's ADA claims, ADEA claims, and Title VII claim retaliation be and are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff Lamette's Title VII claimss of hostile work environment, failure to train, and discriminatory discipline remain. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 07/13/10. (crt,Yocum, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cargo et al v. Kansas City Southern Railway Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?