Regan et al v. Starcraft Marine L L C et al
Case Number: |
5:2006cv01257 |
Filed: |
July 25, 2006 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana |
Office: |
P.I.: Other Office |
Presiding Judge: |
S Maurice Hicks |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark L Hornsby |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
U.S. Government Defendant |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 12, 2010 |
Filing
310
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying Starcraft's request for the jury to view the subject pontoon boat. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 10/12/2010. (crt,McDonnell, D)
|
July 16, 2010 |
Filing
271
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 247 Motion in Limine as to Homor deposition testimony and DENIED AS MOOT as to Homor expert report. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 07/16/2010. (crt,Williams, L)
|
June 24, 2010 |
Filing
227
MEMORANDUM RULING granting 198 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA and all of Starcraft's claim against the United States are dismissed. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 6/24/2010. (crt,McDonnell, D)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing
225
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 205 MOTION for Reconsideration re 170 MOTION in Limine filed by Francis Elwood Regan, Jr, Daniel J Regan. All evidence relating to the blood alcohol testing and/or results of that testing performed on Plaintiff Daniel J. Reagan is hereby EXCLUDED from trial. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 6/22/2010. (crt,Alexander, E)
|
March 18, 2010 |
Filing
192
MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge S Maurice Hicks: The Court orally ruled on the pending Daubert motions as follows: granting in part, denying in part and mooting in part 132 Daubert Motion to exclude Robert Warren; granting in part and denying in part 133 Daubert Motion to exclude John C. Hornor; granting in part, denying in part and mooting in part 137 Daubert Motion to exclude Robert J. Swint. The Court orally ruled on the pending motions in limine as follow s: deferring ruling on 165 Motion in Limine to exclude subsequent remedial measures; denying 166 Motion in Limine precluding the the use of the Limitation of Liability Act ; denying in part and deferring ruling on 168 Motion in Li mine to exclude evidence of inapplicable boat design standard; granting in part and denying in part 169 Motion in Limine to exclude photographs and video(s); denying in part and deferring ruling on 170 Motion in Limine; granting [17 1] Motion for Reconsideration re 167 Order on Motion in Limine ; denying 172 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Horizontal Gaze Nystagmus Test; granting in part and mooting in part 173 Motion in Limine to Exclude Photographs, Tes timony, re May 2009 Site Visit; FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 3/18/2010. Jury Trial reset for Monday, 7/26/2010 08:30 AM before Judge S Maurice Hicks. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 6/25/2010 10:00 AM before Judge S Maurice Hicks. Revised Joint Pretrial Order due by noon on Friday, 6/18/2010. Trial Depositions due by Monday, 7/5/2010. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 170 MOTION in Limine : United States' brief due by 6/4/2010. Responses due by 6/11/2010. (crt,Alexander, E)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?