Smith v. Humphrey et al

Plaintiff: Earton Lynn Smith
Defendant: Kevin Humphrey, Shane McWilliams and Richard McGee
Case Number: 5:2010cv01070
Filed: June 16, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: West Feliciana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 59 Report and Recommendations, denying Plaintiff's 50 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting Defendants' 47 Motion for Summary Judgment, dismissing all of Plaintiff's claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 5/31/2012. (crt,McDonnell, D)
January 4, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 49 Order on Motion to Compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's order of November 29, 2011 (Rec. Doc. 49) be and is hereby AFFIRMED in all respects. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 1/4/2012. (crt,Haik, K)
November 15, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER dismissing 41 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge; FURTHER ORDERED that 33 Order on Motion for Sanctions filed by Earton Lynn Smith be and is hereby affirmed. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 11/15/2011. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Humphrey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earton Lynn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?