Houck v. Creditors Financial Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tracy Houck
Defendant: Creditors Financial Group, LLC, FIA CSNA, TransUnion, Equifax Credit Information Services Inc and Experian
Case Number: 5:2010cv01268
Filed: August 11, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Lincoln
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:3001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 11/15/2011. (crt,Kennedy, T)
October 4, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 41 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint against FIA Card Services, N.A. filed by F I A Card Services N A, F I A C S N A, 41 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by F I A Card Services N A. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 10/4/2011. (crt,McDonnell, D)
September 13, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 29 Motion for Partial Dismissal. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 9/13/2011. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houck v. Creditors Financial Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Houck
Represented By: Jeananne Self
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creditors Financial Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIA CSNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?