Clifford v. Bryans Construction et al

Plaintiff: James Clifford
Defendant: L F I Fort Pierce Inc and Bryans Construction
Case Number: 5:2010cv01352
Filed: August 26, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: Tom Stagg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 88 Report and Recommendations; granting 66 Motion to Correct Name of Party; granting 81 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 83 Motion for Default Judgment. The Bryan Co and Bryan Construction are ordered to pay to James Clifford the amount of $12,500, plus legal interest thereon from date of entry of judgment and all court costs associated with this action. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 1/31/2012. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 6, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: Bryan Construction Inc, represented by counsel, filed an answer. Doc. 49. To comply with the notice requirement, Bryan is advised that it must enroll counsel to represent it in this case no later than 9/19/2011. If Bryan does not do so, the court will strike its answer and order the Clerk of Court to enter a default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/6/2011. (crt,Keifer, K)
June 9, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; adopting Report and Recommendations re 46 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 6/8/2011. (crt,Keifer, K)
January 31, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 29 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by L F I Fort Pierce Inc, denying 29 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 28 USCA Section 1406 filed by L F I Fort Pierce Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter be transferred to the Shreveport Division of the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 1/28/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford v. Bryans Construction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L F I Fort Pierce Inc
Represented By: Catherine Saba Giering
Represented By: Keely Y Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryans Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?