Lowman et al v. Whitaker et al

Plaintiff: Charles E Lowman, Robert A Lowman and Juanita Neal Lowman
Defendant: Jerry Whitaker Timber L L C, Michael Whitaker, Ricky Whitaker, Evergreen Timber Corp, Armistead Land & Timber Co, Brady Timber, International Paper Corp and Jerry Whitaker
Case Number: 5:2010cv01603
Filed: October 20, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donald E Walter
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2014 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 166 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert A Lowman, Juanita Neal Lowman, Charles E Lowman. The matter cannot remain on the court's docket indefinitely without resolution. Accordingly, Plaintiffs are ordered to advise the court, in writing on or before for 3/26/2014, whether they are prepared to appear at a jury trial set for April 21, 2014, to present their claims against Ricky Whitaker, or whether they will voluntarily dismiss their claims against Ricky Whitaker with prejudice. Failure to choose either of these options will result in the dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims against Ricky Whitaker with prejudice due to lack of prosecution. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 03/06/2014. (crt,Yocum, M)
December 5, 2012 149 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 147 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. The trial date of 1/28/2013 is continued, along with the pretrial conference and deadline for filing a pretrial order. The period for discovery is reopened and will remain open until 2/28/2013. Once the time for discovery has passed, the Court will issue additional orders regarding a trial date, if needed, and related deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/5/2012. (crt,Keifer, K)
August 31, 2012 134 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Brady Timber Corp, 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Evergreen Timber Corp, and 111 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jerry Wh itaker are hereby GRANTED. 120 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims of the Plaintiffs filed by Brady Timber Corp, Evergreen Timber Corp, and 127 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiffs filed by Jerry Whitaker, are hereby GRANTED. For the reasons assigned herein, Plaintiffs claims against Brady Timber Corp., Evergreen Timber Corp., Jerry Whitaker Timber Contractor, LLC are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 8/31/2012. (crt,Joffrion, B)
February 16, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 5 DEFICIENT Answer to Complaint filed by Jerry Whitaker Timber L L C. The Answer is STRICKEN to the extent it purports to be on behalf of Jerry Whitaker Timber L L C, Jerry Whitaker Timber Contractor L L C, or any other entity. The answer remains valid as to Jerry Whitaker, individually. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/16/2011. (crt,Smith, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowman et al v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E Lowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A Lowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Neal Lowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Whitaker Timber L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen Timber Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armistead Land & Timber Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady Timber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?