Allen et al v. C & H Distributors L L C et al

Plaintiff: Helen C Allen and Robert E Allen
Defendant: C & H Distributors L L C, K K America Corp, Ergocraft Inc and Travelers Property Casualty Co of America
Case Number: 5:2010cv01604
Filed: October 21, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Bossier
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2017 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 200 Report and Recommendations,granting 192 Motion to Dismiss; denying 194 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 01/31/2017. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 26, 2015 180 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 152 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by C & H Distributors L L C, Ergocraft Contract Solutions, Travelers Property Casualty Co of America, K K America Corp, Great American Insurance Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 03/26/2015. (crt,McDonnell, D)
June 10, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: Before the Court, 117 Appeal of the Magistrate Judge's Decision filed by Defendants. Defendants appeal from Magistrate Judge Hornsbys 113 Electronic Order of 5/6/2014, allowing limited video depositions of Michael Snapper and Steve Makovec. The Court finds that Magistrate Judge Hornsbys Electronic Order permitting the video trial depositions of Michael Snapper and Steve Makovec was neither clearly erroneous nor contrary to law. Such order is hereby AFFIRMED in its en tirety. The depositions of Michael Snapper and Steve Makovec shall proceed as scheduled and shall be limited as outlined in Magistrate Judge Hornsbys order. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants 117 Appeal of the Magistrate Judge's Decision be and is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 6/10/2014. (crt,Putch, A)
August 22, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 71 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by C & H Distributors L L C, Travelers Property Casualty Co of America, K K America Corp, 72 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Ergocraft Contract Solutions, Great American Insurance Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 08/22/2013. (crt,McDonnell, D)
November 1, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: Tung Dah Enterprise is notified that its answer may be stricken and a default entered against it without further notice if Tung Dah Enterprise does not file an answer or motion to dismiss that is signed by a licensed attorney admitted to practice in the Western District of Louisiana. The deadline for making such a filing is 11/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/1/2012. (crt,Putch, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. C & H Distributors L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen C Allen
Represented By: David C Turansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Allen
Represented By: David C Turansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & H Distributors L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K K America Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ergocraft Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Co of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?