Adams et al v. B P America Production Company

Plaintiff: Benjamin Adams, Joe Adams, Roosevelt Adams and Fred Adams
Defendant: B P America Production Company
Case Number: 5:2010cv01607
Filed: October 21, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 41 Cross-MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joe Adams, Roosevelt Adams, Benjamin Adams, Fred Adams and 52 Cross-MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by B P America Production Co, Stacy Hanna. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 3/26/2012. (crt,Keifer, K)
August 30, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 57 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 8/29/2011. (crt,Keifer, K)
April 14, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 29 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/14/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. B P America Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B P America Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?