King v. Martin

Plaintiff: Richard B King
Defendant: Tammy R. Martin
Case Number: 5:2010cv01774
Filed: November 30, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2013 133 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 126 MOTION to Stay filed by Tammy R Martin, Amy L Carlisle. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 3/22/2013. (crt,Keifer, K)
December 6, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 91 Motion in Limine. A ruling on the Kings' motion is premature at this time. As Tooley-Knoblett has not yet been deposed, this court cannot ascertain the content of her proposed testimony, and therefore, cannot determine wh ether she will attempt to offer inadmissible legal opinions solely on the basis of her expert report. However, the Kings may reurge the motion in limine after Tooley-Knoblett has been desposed. IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion in limine is DENIED as premature. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 12/5/2012. (crt,Putch, A)
November 30, 2012 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: To ensure that this record is complete with respect to diversity jurisdiction, Plaintiffs are directed to file a motion for leave to amend their complaint and allege with specificity the state or foreign country in which each party is domiciled and, therefore, a citizen. If the necessary information has already been provided, Plaintiffs may, in the alternative, point to where the information is located in the record. The deadline for compliance with this order is 1/7/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/30/12. (crt,Putch, A)
October 16, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/16/12. (crt,Delgado, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard B King
Represented By: Richard B King, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy R. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?