SGC Land, L.L.C. v. Louisiana Midstream Gas Services, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: SGC Land, L.L.C.
Defendant: Louisiana Midstream Gas Services, L.L.C. and Chesapeake Louisiana, L.P.
Case Number: 5:2010cv01778
Filed: November 30, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2013 133 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: Before this Court is a Motion for Reconsideration filed on behalf of S G C Land L L C and Smithburg Inc. Plaintiffs move for reconsideration of the Court's 3/28/2013 Memorandum Ruling and Order which granted Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and denied Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Specifically, Plaintiffs seek a ruling from this Court reconsidering its Memorandum Order based on their belief that the Court committed errors of fact and law in holding that Defendants were not in bad faith. Plaintiffs also contend that the Court expanded the rights of the Defendants by granting greater rights to Midstream than originally granted by Plaintiffs in the Easement and Right of Way Agreement. For the rea sons stated herein, Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. This Courts 127 Memorandum Ruling and 128 Order are AMENDED to hold that Midstream, the original holder of the Easement and Right of Way Agreement, i s entitled to the same type of servitude over the land now occupied by the pipeline as was granted in the Easement and Right of Way Agreement. However Midstream and/or Defendants are obligated to pay fair compensation for the value of this servitude in addition to any actual damages suffered from the deviation. The Court further declines to withdraw or amend allother aspects of the Ruling and Order. An Order consistent with the terms of the instant Memorandum Ruling shall issue herewith. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 8/3/2013. (crt,Putch, A)
March 28, 2013 127 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Chesapeake Operating Inc, Chesapeake Louisiana L P, Louisiana Midstream Gas Services L L C, 113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by S G C Land L L C, Smithburg Inc. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 03/28/2013. (crt,McDonnell, D)
September 29, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth E Foote: ORAL ARGUMENT held on 9/26/2011 re 48 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Chesapeake Operating Inc, Chesapeake Louisiana L P, Louisiana Midstream Gas Services L L C. For reasons stated orally on the record and summarized herein, the Court denied 48 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Court Reporter: Barbara Simpson) (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SGC Land, L.L.C. v. Louisiana Midstream Gas Services, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SGC Land, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Midstream Gas Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael B Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Louisiana, L.P.
Represented By: Michael B Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?