Sampson et al v. GATX Corp et al

Plaintiff: Amy Avery Sampson, Kalei Alyssa Sampson and Tucker Lloyd Sampson
Defendant: GATX Corp., GATC Corp., Honeywell International Inc. and Kansas City Southern Railway Co.
Case Number: 5:2010cv01834
Filed: December 10, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Webster
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 4/18/2012. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 29, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Honeywell International Inc. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 3/29/2012. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 19, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Clifton Kirby, G A T X Corp. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 3/19/2012. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sampson et al v. GATX Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Avery Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalei Alyssa Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tucker Lloyd Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GATX Corp.
Represented By: Sessions Ault Hootsell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GATC Corp.
Represented By: Sessions Ault Hootsell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Southern Railway Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?