Williams v. Chesapeake Operating Inc, et al

Plaintiff: Jewell Williams
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating Inc, Chesapeake Louisiana L P and Chesapeake Energy Corp
Case Number: 5:2010cv01906
Filed: December 28, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 100 Motion to Dismiss Ms. Williams' stipulation pour autrui claim. Ms. Williams' claim is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 6/16/2014. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 18, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part 100 Motion to Dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claim for intentional interference with her mineral lease is dismissed with prejudice. By 10/2/2013, both parties shall submit briefs on the issue of w hether there are any conflicts of law issues this Court must address before it can rule on the portion of the motion to dismiss directed towards the contractual claim premised on a stipulation pour autrui. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/18/2013. (crt,Keifer, K)
March 11, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 51 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Unjust Enrichment Cause of Action; granting 69 Motion to deny class certification; and denying 21 Plaintiff's Motion to certify class. Plaintiff's Unjust Enrichment Cause of Action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/11/2013. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Chesapeake Operating Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewell Williams
Represented By: Andre' P LaPlace
Represented By: Richard J Arsenault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating Inc
Represented By: Nicole N Duarte
Represented By: Michael B Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Louisiana L P
Represented By: Michael B Donald
Represented By: Nicole N Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Corp
Represented By: Michael B Donald
Represented By: Nicole N Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?