International Paper Co et al v. Deep South Equipment Co et al

Plaintiff: International Paper Co and Factory Mutual Insurance Co
Defendant: Deep South Equipment Co, Nacco Materials Handling Group Inc, Osram Sylvania Inc, R S T Insurance Co, U V W Insurance Co and X Y Z Insurance Co
Case Number: 5:2011cv00017
Filed: January 7, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Red River
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: Tom Stagg
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2017 327 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 317 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 320 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties are directed to submit a proposed judgment to the court within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/11/2017. (crt,Roaix, G)
March 19, 2015 197 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 133 Deep South's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 131 Motion for Summary Judgment on Depreciation of Sprinkler System; granting 120 Deep South's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Rekindle Issue; Plaintif fs' claims for damages caused by the second fire are dismissed; granting 129 NACCO's Motion for Summary Judgment. All of Plaintiffs' remaining claims against NACCO are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/19/2015. (crt,Keifer, K)
October 22, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Osram Sylvania Inc. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 10/22/12. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Paper Co et al v. Deep South Equipment Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Paper Co
Represented By: Brian D Landry
Represented By: Robert H Shemwell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Factory Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: Brian D Landry
Represented By: Robert H Shemwell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deep South Equipment Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nacco Materials Handling Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osram Sylvania Inc
Represented By: McDonald G Provosty
Represented By: Quentin F Urquhart, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R S T Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U V W Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?