Magnum Gas Pipeline L L C v. Silver Oak Operating L L C et al

Plaintiff: Magnum Gas Pipeline L L C
Defendant: Silver Oak Operating L L C, Red Rock Energy Partners Ltd, Moon Operating Inc, Twojo Inc and Chesapeake Louisiana L P
Case Number: 5:2011cv00056
Filed: January 19, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: DeSoto
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 76 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Magnum Gas Pipeline L L C. Insofar as it seeks the Court to order Chesapeake to tender damages pursuant to award number 2 of the arbitration award, M agnum's motion is GRANTED. Insofar as it seeks the Court to order Chesapeake to deliver gas to Magnum pursuant to the arbitration award, Magnum's motion is DENIED until such time as additional arbitration clarifies Chesapeake's obligat ions regarding delivery of gas. Insofar as it seeks the Court to order Chesapeake to tender additional damages for Chesapeake's failure to comply with the Court's judgment, Magnum's motion is DENIED. IT IS ORDERED that unless the parti es otherwise agree, by 4/23/2016, Chesapeake shall tender payment to Magnum consistent with award number 2 of the arbitration award and this opinion. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to return to arbitration within a reasonable time period. A telephone status conference is set for 5/25/2016 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/24/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
April 24, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 57 MOTION to Vacate or Modify Arbitration Award, 58 MOTION To Correct Computational Error in Arbitration Award and Otherwise Enter Judgment on Arbitration Award, and 49 MOTION to Confirm and Enter Arbitration Award. A judgment consistent with this ruling shall be issued herewith. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 4/24/2015. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 15, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting 12 Motion to Stay; granting 12 Motion to Compel Arbitration/Mediation; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims asserted by Plaintiff in this matter aga inst Defendants Silver Oak Operating L L C, Twojo Inc, Moon Operating Inc, Red Rock Energy Partners Ltd, and Chesapeake Louisiana L P shall be resolved by arbitration and/or mediation in accordance with the 2000 and 2000 Agreements referenced herei n, and that this matter be and is hereby STAYED pending the outcome of such proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively terminate this action on his records, without prejudice to the right of the parties to file a joint motion to reopen this proceeding within 30 days of the arbitration proceedings.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/15/2011. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magnum Gas Pipeline L L C v. Silver Oak Operating L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnum Gas Pipeline L L C
Represented By: Kristina Brown Gustavson
Represented By: Bernard S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Oak Operating L L C
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Kay Cowden Medlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Rock Energy Partners Ltd
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Kay Cowden Medlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moon Operating Inc
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Kay Cowden Medlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twojo Inc
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Kay Cowden Medlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Louisiana L P
Represented By: Laurie D Clark
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Beatriz Quintana Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?